v. Aetna UCR Litigation

Miscellaneous: Blue Shield of California
Case Number: 3:2010mc80158
Filed: June 29, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/11/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
July 21, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE, ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER, AND VACATING MOTION HEARING OF AUGUST 13, 2010. Status Conference set for 8/13/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 07/21/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 14, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 18 Motion to Shorten Time (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 9, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/9/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 8, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard zimmerman granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Aetna UCR Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Blue Shield of California
Represented By: Edward D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?