Aviva Sports, Inc. v. Finderhut Direct Marketing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aviva Sports, Inc.
Defendant: Finderhut Direct Marketing, Inc., Menard, Inc., KMART Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. and Manley Toys, Ltd.
3rd_party_defendant: Brian Dubinsky, Aquawood, LLC and Wham-O, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010mc80249
Filed: October 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ON MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 1 Motion to Quash; granting 6 Motion for Joinder; granting 8 Motion for Joinder (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR JOINT FORM OF ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 28, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 13, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviva Sports, Inc. v. Finderhut Direct Marketing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aviva Sports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finderhut Direct Marketing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMART Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manley Toys, Ltd.
Represented By: Lewis Anten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Brian Dubinsky
Represented By: Stephen Louis Raucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Aquawood, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Louis Raucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Wham-O, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Victor Jablon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?