In Re: Optical Disk Drive Products Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., Alex Afanasyev, All Plaintiffs, Raymond F. Barbush, Bay Area Systems, LLC, Rokas Beresniovas, Alec Berezin, Mike Bishop, Alex Bissen, Cindy Booze, Aimee Brock, Mr. Cullen Byrne, CMP Consulting Services, Inc., Ann Carney, David Carney, Jr., Don Cheung, Jerred Cook, Gregg Cooper, Tina Corse, Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P., Aaron Deshaw, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Scott Druschke, EMW, Inc., Matthew Ence, Benjamin Faber, Ben Flaccus, Mary Jane Garland, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Barney Gooman, Jr., Douglas Hatfield, Warren S. Herman, Hewlett-Packard Company, Matthew Hosking, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Ingram Micro Inc, James P. Ito-Adler, JLK Systems Group, Inc., Evan Jacobson, Chris Johnson, Christopher Johnson, KI, Inc., Patrick Keyes, David Knight, Debra Knight, Goeffrey Korwan, Kyle Kovalchek, L.E. Hoover Co., Larson Group, Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP, John McKee, Benjamin Murray, Amber Nikkel, Beth O'Donnell, Brent Pickett, Patrick Piper, Sidney Plitnik, Benjamin Porter, Prisco Electronic Company, Inc., Angela Pritchard, Evan Ravenelle, Freud Reia, Mike Reilly, Diana Saed, Cynthia Saia, Gregory Sinigiani, Matthew Slavin, Christopher Smith, Vanessa Stark, State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs, Sandra Steffen, William Craig Stephenson, Synnex Corporation, Alireza Tabatabai, Technology Depot of La Mesa, The Stereo Shop, Heather Tremblay, Univisions-Crimson Holding Inc., Aaron Wagner, Frank Warner, Kim Wood, Charles Zakin, Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel and Barbara Cochran
Defendant: BenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation, Hitachi, Ltd., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc., Koninklijke Philips N.V., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Lite-On IT Corporation of Taiwan, Lite-On It Corporation, NEC Corporation, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of America, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Philips BenQ Digital Storage, Pioneer Corporation, Pioneer Digital Design & Manufacturing Company, Pioneer Electronics (USA) Inc., Pioneer High Fidelity Taiwan Co., Ltd., Pioneer North America, Inc., Quanta Storage America, Inc., Quanta Storage Inc, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony NEC Optiarc Inc., Sony Optiarc America, Inc., Sony Optiarc, Inc., Teac America, Inc., Teac Corporation, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corp. Korea, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, Lite-On Sales & Distribution Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corporation and HP Inc.
Petitioner: John Doe 1 and Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc.
Other: Christopher Andrews, Debbie Bosse, Mr. Stephen Field, Conner Erwin, Michael Ira Helfand and John W Davis
Not Yet Classified: All Parties, Amazon.com, Inc. and Apple Inc.
Intervenor: Fanshawe College of Applied Arts and Technology and U.S. Department of J Antitrust Division
Interested Party: Patrick S. Sweeney, Gregory Starrett and Newegg Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010md02143
Filed: April 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2906 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2902 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #1 Attachments 1 and 2) (cl, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 2905 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2019 re #2902 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds. Motion for Disbursement is Granted; Court to issue an order.Total Time in Court: 5 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas.Plaintiff Attorney: R. Alexander Saveri, Matthew Heaphy, Geoffrey Rushing. Defendant Attorney: No Appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2904 REPLY (re #2902 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlement Funds, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel Christman in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for an Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlement Funds)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2903 Letter dated August 7, 2019 from Alan Lansing. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2902 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlement Funds, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/16/2019. Replies due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel Christman re Claims Processing and Distribution of the Net Settlement Funds, #2 Exhibit A to Christman Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Christman Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Christman Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Christman Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Christman Declaration, #7 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2901 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Anthony C. Biagioli Withdrawal of Anthony Biagioli (Biagioli, Anthony) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2900 NOTICE of Filing of In Camera Submission by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 7/22/2019) Modified on 7/29/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2899 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2897 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Bandas. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2898 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2896 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Clore. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2897 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Bandas ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13535982.) filed by Conner Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Bandas, Christopher) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2896 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Robert Clore ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13535906.) filed by Conner Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Clore, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2895 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 7, 2019, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2019. (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2894 NOTICE by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America of the Withdrawal of Elizabeth A. Cate as Counsel. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2893 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/7/2019 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Conner Erwin, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2892 ORDER of USCA as to (141 in 3:13-cv-04991-RS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Gateway, Inc., Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Acer America Corporation, (2722 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Gateway, Inc., Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Acer America Corporation. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 2891 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Conner Erwin. Appeal of Order,, Terminate Motions, #2889 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-13172355 paid.) (Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 2890 NOTICE by JLK Systems Group, Inc. of Withdrawal of Attorney Jayne A. Peeters (Steyer, Allan) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2889 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANTS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., TOSHIBA CORPORATION, AND TOSHIBA SAMSUNG STORAGE TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES, AND DENYING OBJECTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/21/19. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2888 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Ivy Tabbara (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2887 NOTICE by NEC Corporation Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Cook-Milligan, Dana) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2886 Proposed Order re #2879 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement with Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation and Response to Objectors Corrected [Proposed] Order by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2885 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2019 re #2874 Third MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, #2879 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement with Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation and Response to Objectors filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motions taken under submission; Court to issue an order.Total Time in Court: 12 minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox.Plaintiff Attorney: Shana Scarlett, Benjamin Siegel.Defendant Attorney: Ian Simmons, Kurt Brown, Brendan McShane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/7/2019)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2884 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying #2858 Motion to Stay or Review of the Clerk's Taxation of Costs. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2883 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying #2857 Motion for Taxation of Costs.. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2882 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2874 Third MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses, #2879 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement with Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation and Response to Objectors ) filed byConner Erwin. (Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2881 NOTICE by Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc. of Withdrawal by Attorney Michelle L. Visser, with Certificate of Service (Visser, Michelle) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2880 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #2879 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Settlement with Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation and Response to Objectors. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2879 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlement with Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation and Response to Objectors filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 1/11/2019. Replies due by 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Declaration of Cameron R. Azari)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 12/28/2018) Modified on 12/31/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2018 Filing 2878 NOTICE by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation of Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1715(b) by Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2877 OBJECTIONS to re #2874 Third MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses by Conner Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2876 Letter from Barbara S. Cochran. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2875 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #2874 Third MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses. Motion Hearing previously set for 2/4/2019 has been continued to 2/7/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2874 Third MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 12/17/2018. Replies due by 12/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2873 ORDER of USCA as to #2723 Notice of Appeal, filed by Alfred H. Siegel. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2872 ORDER of USCA as to #2724 Notice of Appeal, filed by Peter Kravitz. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2871 Order, signed 11/16/18, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2870 Stipulation Regarding Production of Email Addresses by Non-Party Fry's Electronics to Claims Administrator.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2870 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Production of Email Addresses by Non-Party Fry's Electronics, Inc. to Claims Administrator filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2869 ORDER of USCA as to #2719 Notice of Appeal, filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2868 Order, signed 10/22/18, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2866 Stipulation Regarding Production of Email Addresses by Non-Party Office Depot to Claims Administrator.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2867 CLERK'S NOTICE THE MOTIONS [#2857, #2858] SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON OCTOBER 25, 2018 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2866 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Production of Email Addresses By Non-Party Office Depot, Inc. to Claims Administrator filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2865 REPLY (re #2857 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs ) filed byAcer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 8, 2018 Filing 2864 REPLY (re #2858 MOTION to Stay or Review of the Clerk's Taxation of Costs ) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 10/8/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2863 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeff D Friedman (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2862 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2857 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs ) re: #2859 Circuit City and RadioShack's Reservation of Rights and Joinder Regarding Clerk's Taxation of Costs filed byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitchell A. Froelich, #2 Exhibit 1)(McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2861 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2858 MOTION to Stay or Review of the Clerk's Taxation of Costs ) filed byBenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation. (Kaas, Lisa) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2860 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2852 Motion for Settlement AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2859 Statement re #2857 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs , #2855 Costs Taxed, #2854 Costs Taxed Circuit City's and RadioShack's Reservation of Rights and Joinder Regarding Clerk's Taxation of Costs by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Weiss, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2858 MOTION to Stay or Review of the Clerk's Taxation of Costs filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 10/1/2018. Replies due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2857 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by Acer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 10/1/2018. Replies due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2856 REPLY in Support (re #2852 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Defendants Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, and Dissemina ) and Statement of Non-Opposition filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2855 Costs Taxed in amount of $164,197.86 Re: #2749 Bill of Costs against Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2854 Costs Taxed in amount of $151,735.02 Re: #2775 Amended Bill of Costs against Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2853 Costs Taxed in amount of $43,771.13 Re: #2751 Bill of Costs against Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2852 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Defendants Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, and Dissemination of Class Notice filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 9/6/2018. Replies due by 9/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Declaration of Cameron R. Azari)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2851 ORDER of USCA as to #2719 Notice of Appeal, filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
June 12, 2018 Filing 2850 MANDATE of USCA as to appellee Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. only #2723 Notice of Appeal, filed by Alfred H. Siegel. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 2849 USCA Mandate as to appellee Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. only #2724 Notice of Appeal, filed by Peter Kravitz. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2848 ORDER of USCA as to #2719 Notice of Appeal, filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2847 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #2846 MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING SUPPORTING FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 62.1(a)(3) REGARDING THE COURTS WILLINGNESS TO ENTERTAIN MOTIONS FOR APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 2846 MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling Supporting Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62.1 (a)(3) Regarding the Court's Willingness to Entertain a Motion for Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 6/7/2018. Replies due by 6/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett, #3 Exhibit 1 (Settlement Agreement))(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 2845 Response to #2844 Order on Motion to Unseal Document, Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Christopher Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2844 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying #2303 Motion to Unseal Document ; finding as moot #2693 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018) Modified on 5/1/2018 (cl, COURT STAFF). The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 5/1/18 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.
April 11, 2018 Filing 2843 REDACTION to #2507 Document E-Filed Under Seal, / Declaration of Robert J. Pfister in Opposition to Defendants' Daubert Motion - Public Version Pursuant to Court Orders [Dkt. Nos. 2721 & 2773] by Alfred H. Siegel, Peter Kravitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23, #2 Exhibit 24, #3 Exhibit 25, #4 Exhibit 26, #5 Exhibit 27, #6 Exhibit 28, #7 Exhibit 29, #8 Exhibit 30)(Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 2842 REDACTION to #2504 Document E-Filed Under Seal / Trustees' Opposition to Defendants' Daubert Motion - Public Version Pursuant to Court Orders [Dkt. Nos. 2721 & 2773] by Alfred H. Siegel, Peter Kravitz. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 2841 REDACTION to #2467 Document E-Filed Under Seal, / Declaration of Alan S. Frankel, in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Circuit City Trust and RadioShack Trust - Public Version Pursuant to Court Orders [Dkt. Nos. 2721 & 2773] by Alfred H. Siegel, Peter Kravitz. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 2840 REDACTION to #2466 Document E-Filed Under Seal, / Declaration of James T. McClave in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Circuit City Trust and RadioShack Trust - Public Version Pursuant to Court Orders [Dkt. Nos. 2721 & 2773] by Alfred H. Siegel, Peter Kravitz. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 2839 REDACTION to #2465 Document E-Filed Under Seal, / Declaration of Adam K. Fontecchio in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment against Circuit City Trust and RadioShack Trust - Public Version Pursuant to Court Orders [Dkt. No. 2721 & 2773] by Alfred H. Siegel, Peter Kravitz. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 2838 REDACTION to #2464 Document E-Filed Under Seal, / Declaration of John B. Hayes in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Circuit City Trust and RadioShack Trust - Public Version Pursuant to Court Orders [Dkt. No. 2721 & 2773] by Alfred H. Siegel, Peter Kravitz. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 2837 REDACTION to #2463 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, / Declaration of Robert J. Pfister in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Circuit City Trust and RadioShack Trust - Public Version Pursuant to Court Orders [Dkt. Nos. 2721 & 2773] by Alfred H. Siegel, Peter Kravitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 [Redacted], #7 Exhibit 7 [Redacted], #8 Exhibit 8 [Redacted], #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 [Redacted], #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15 [Redacted], #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18 [Redacted], #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22 [Redacted])(Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 2836 REDACTION to #2462 Document E-Filed Under Seal, / Trustees' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Circuit City Trust and RadioShack Trust - Public Version Pursuant to Court Orders [Dkt. Nos. 2721 & 2773] by Alfred H. Siegel, Peter Kravitz. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 2835 OBJECTIONS to re #2775 Bill of Costs, / Circuity City's and RadioShack's Objections to Samsung's Amended Bill of Costs by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 2834 OBJECTIONS to re #2775 Bill of Costs, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Objections to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Amended Bill of Costs by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 2833 OBJECTIONS to re #2775 Bill of Costs, OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. AND SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA INC.'S AMENDED BILL OF COSTS by Acer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Ting, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2832 REDACTION to #2518 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendants' Joint Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Edward Snyder (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders Dated 1/11/18 and 3/12/18) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Exhibits 1-12 to the Declaration of Ian Simmons)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2831 REDACTION to #2613 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendants' Joint Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Luis Cabral (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders Dated 1/11/18 and 3/12/18) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Exhibit 10 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2830 REDACTION to #2406 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Luis Cabral (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders Dated 1/11/18 and 3/12/18) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of Defs.' Joint Motion to Exclude Testimony of IPPs' Expert Dr. Luis Cabral, #2 Exhibits 1-9 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2829 REDACTION to #2610 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendants' Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Flamm (Public Version Pursuant to Court Orders Dated 1/11/18 and 3/12/18) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Exhibit 15 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2828 REDACTION to #2415 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendants' Joint Motion and Notice of Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Flamm (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders Dated 1/11/18 and 3/12/18) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of Defs.' Joint Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Flamm, #2 Exhibits 1-3 to the Simmons Declaration, #3 Exhibits 4-14 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2827 REDACTION to #2347 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendants' Joint Motion and Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders Dated 1/11/18 and 3/12/18) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons, #2 Exhibits 1-49 to the Simmons Declaration, #3 Exhibits 50-79 to the Simmons Declaration, #4 Exhibits 80-100 to the Simmons Declaration, #5 Appendix A-G to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2826 REDACTION to #2574 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, Defendants' Joint Reply in Further Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under the Foreign Trade Antitrust Improvements Act (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders Dated 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Exhibits 24-28 to the Ian Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2825 REDACTION to #2343 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendants' Joint Motion and Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under the Foreign Trade Antitrust Improvements Act (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders Dated 1/11/18 and 3/12/18) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons, #2 Exhibits 1-9 to the Simmons Declaration, #3 Exhibits 10-23 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2824 REDACTION to #2573 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendants' Joint Reply in Further Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on Circuit City / RadioShack Claims (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders Dated 1/11/18 and 3/12/18) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Exhibits 1-7 to the Ian Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2823 REDACTION to #2392 Document E-Filed Under Seal, HP Inc.s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2822 REDACTION to #2618 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Strike Testimony of Alan S. Frankel, James T. McClave, Adam K. Fontecchio, and John B. Hayes (Public Version Pursuant to Court Orders Dated 1/11/18 and 3/12/18) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Exhibits 12-14 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2821 REDACTION to #2419 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, , Defendants' Joint Motion and Notice of Motion to Strike Testimony of Alan S. Frankel, James T. McClave, Adam K. Fontecchio, and John B. Hayes (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders Dated 1/11/18 and 3/12/18) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of Defs.' Joint Motion and Notice of Motion to Strike Testimony of Alan S. Frankel, James T. McClave, Adam K. Fontecchio, and John B. Hayes, #2 Exhibits 1-11 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2820 REDACTION to #2359 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, by Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Derr In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13)(Popofsky, Mark) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2819 REDACTION to #2564 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Reply in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders Dated 1/11/18 and 3/12/18) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2818 REDACTION to #2351 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.s And Samsung Electronics America, Inc.s Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2712 and 2773)) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons, #2 Exhibits 1-3 to the Simmons Declaration, #3 Exhibits 4-19 to the Simmons Declaration, #4 Exhibits 20-23 to the Simmons Declaration, #5 Exhibits 24-37 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2817 REDACTION to #2473 Document E-Filed Under Seal, HP Inc.s Opposition to #2358 Defendants Motion for Sanctions (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen in Support of HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Motion for Sanctions, #2 Redacted Exhibits 1 - 13)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2816 REDACTION to #2477 Document E-Filed Under Seal, HP Inc.s Opposition to #2353 Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen in Support of HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Redacted Exhibits 1 - 101)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2815 REDACTION to #2472 Document E-Filed Under Seal, HP Inc.s Opposition to #2324 Defendant NEC Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment Based Upon Insufficiency of the Evidence and Withdrawal (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen in Support of Plaintiff HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendant NEC Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Redacted Exhibits 1 - 76)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2814 REDACTION to #2476 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Exhibits 45 to 71, Part 2 of 2 to the #2475 Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen in Support of #2474 HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under The Foreign Trade Antitrust Improvements Act (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2813 REDACTION to #2475 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen in Support of #2474 HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under The Foreign Trade Antitrust Improvements Act (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibits 1 - 44, Part 1 of 2)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2812 REDACTION to #2474 Document E-Filed Under Seal, HP Inc.s Opposition to #2343 Defendants Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under The Foreign Trade Antitrust Improvements Act (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2811 REDACTION to #2604 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Supplemental Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen ISO HP Inc.s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 3)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2810 REDACTION to #2603 Document E-Filed Under Seal, HP Inc.s Reply ISO Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2809 REDACTION to #2393 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen ISO HP Inc.s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibits 1 - 6)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2808 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** REDACTION to #2392 Document E-Filed Under Seal, HP Inc.s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018) Modified on 3/23/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2018 Filing 2807 REDACTION to #2600 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Supplemental Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen ISO HP Inc.s Reply ISO Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony Of Designated Expert Michael Smith (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2806 REDACTION to #2599 Document E-Filed Under Seal, HP Inc.s Reply ISO Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony Of Designated Expert Michael Smith (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2805 REDACTION to #2386 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen In Support of HP Inc.s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony Of Designated Expert Michael Smith (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 6)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2804 REDACTION to #2384 Document E-Filed Under Seal, HP Inc.s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony Of Designated Expert Michael Smith (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2803 REDACTION Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen In Support of HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773))( by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibits 1 - 11)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2802 REDACTION to #2500 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declaration of Debra Aron, Ph.D. In Support of HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion to Strike (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2801 REDACTION to #2499 Document E-Filed Under Seal HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron (Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Orders (Dkt. 2721 and 2773)) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 2800 STIPULATION Regarding Designation of Record on Remand (Attachments A-E) filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 2799 REDACTION to #2470 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO #2332 DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Redacted Version) by Gateway, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hsiang ("James") H. Lin, #2 Exhibit Nos. 1-10, #3 Exhibit Nos. 11-20, #4 Exhibit Nos. 21-29, #5 Exhibit No. 30, #6 Exhibit Nos. 31-39, #7 Exhibit Nos. 40-45, #8 Exhibit Nos. 46-49, #9 Declaration of Gareth Macartney, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C)(Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 2798 REDACTION to #2356 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,,,,,, by Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Derr In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 17, #14 Exhibit 18, #15 Exhibit 19, #16 Exhibit 20, #17 Exhibit 21, #18 Exhibit 22, #19 Exhibit 23, #20 Exhibit 24, #21 Exhibit 25, #22 Exhibit 26, #23 Exhibit 27, #24 Exhibit 28, #25 Exhibit 29, #26 Exhibit 30, #27 Exhibit 31, #28 Exhibit 32, #29 Exhibit 33, #30 Exhibit 35, #31 Exhibit 36, #32 Exhibit 37, #33 Exhibit 38, #34 Exhibit 40, #35 Exhibit 42, #36 Exhibit 43, #37 Exhibit 44, #38 Exhibit 45, #39 Exhibit 46, #40 Exhibit 47, #41 Exhibit 48, #42 Exhibit 49, #43 Exhibit 50, #44 Exhibit 51, #45 Exhibit 55, #46 Exhibit 56, #47 Exhibit 58, #48 Exhibit 60, #49 Exhibit 61, #50 Exhibit 62, #51 Exhibit 63, #52 Exhibit 64, #53 Exhibit 65, #54 Exhibit 66, #55 Exhibit 67, #56 Exhibit 68, #57 Exhibit 69, #58 Exhibit 70, #59 Exhibit 71, #60 Exhibit 72, #61 Exhibit 73, #62 Exhibit 74, #63 Exhibit 75, #64 Exhibit 76, #65 Exhibit 77, #66 Exhibit 78, #67 Exhibit 79, #68 Exhibit 80, #69 Exhibit 81, #70 Exhibit 82)(Popofsky, Mark) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 2797 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pioneer's Redacted MSJ Pursuant to 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 Orders filed by Pioneer Corporation, Pioneer Digital Design & Manufacturing Company, Pioneer Electronics (USA) Inc., Pioneer High Fidelity Taiwan Co., Ltd., Pioneer North America, Inc.. Responses due by 4/3/2018. Replies due by 4/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Redacted Declaration of Matthew Accornero in Support of Pioneer's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 2796 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants' Joint Redacted) MSJ Pursuant to 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 Orders filed by Pioneer Corporation, Pioneer Digital Design & Manufacturing Company, Pioneer Electronics (USA) Inc., Pioneer High Fidelity Taiwan Co., Ltd., Pioneer North America, Inc.. Responses due by 4/3/2018. Replies due by 4/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Redacted Declaration of Matthew Accornero in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2795 ORDER of USCA as to #2692 Notice of Appeal, filed by Christopher Andrews. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2794 REDACTION to #2607 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron (Public Version Pursuant to 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 Orders) by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2793 REDACTION to #2561 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,, Exhibits 1-2, 5-21 to Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against HP (Redacted Version Pursuant to 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 Orders) by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19 [Redacted], #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21 [Redacted])(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2792 REDACTION to #2560 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against HP (Public Version Pursuant to 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 Orders) by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2791 REDACTION to #2559 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against HP (Redacted Version Pursuant to 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 Orders) by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2790 REDACTION to #2570 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, #2548 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, Exhibits 1 and 3 to Declaration of Brendan McShane in Support of Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Against HP (Public Version Pursuant to 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 Orders) by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2789 REDACTION to #2502 Document E-Filed Under Seal, by NEC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew R. DalSanto, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Pringle, Robert) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2788 REDACTION to #2547 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Against HP (Public Version Pursuant to 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 Orders) by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2787 REDACTION to #2546 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Against HP (Public Version Pursuant to 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 Orders) by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2786 REDACTION to #2553 Document E-Filed Under Seal, by NEC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian in Support, #2 Exhibit 36)(Pringle, Robert) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2785 REDACTION to #2510 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, Exhibits 1- 8 to Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of Defendants' Opposition to HP Inc.'s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy (Redacted Version Pursuant to 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 Orders) by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [Redacted], #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 [Redacted], #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2784 REDACTION to #2506 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendants' Opposition to HP Inc.'s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy (Redacted Version Pursuant to 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 Orders) by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2783 REDACTION to #2414 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declaration of Edward A. Snyder in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron (Public Version Pursuant to 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 Orders) by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2782 REDACTION to #2412 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, Exhibits 1-4 to Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron (Redacted Version Pursuant to 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 Orders) by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [Redacted], #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2781 REDACTION to #2409 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron (Public Version Pursuant to 1/11/18 and 3/12/18 Orders) by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2780 REDACTION to #2329 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, #2325 Declaration in Support, by NEC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35)(Pringle, Robert) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2779 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** REDACTION to #2356 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,,,,,, by Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Derr In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77, #79 Exhibit 78, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Exhibit 82)(Popofsky, Mark) (Filed on 3/19/2018) Modified on 3/20/2018 (wv, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2018 Filing 2778 REDACTION to #2552 Document E-Filed Under Seal, by Lite-On It Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Koninklijke Philips N.V.. (Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 2777 REDACTION to #2346 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,,, by Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Lite-On Sales & Distribution Inc., Lite-On It Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Koninklijke Philips N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gelott In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 12, 2018 Filing 2776 RESPONSE to #2759 , #2768 , #2769 Objections (Supplemental Statement and Response to Objections Filed in Connection with Toshiba Corp., TSST, TSSTK and TAIS' Bill of Costs Pursuant to Local Rule 54-4(a)) by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 12, 2018 Filing 2775 BILL OF COSTS (Amended) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Objections due by 3/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Amended Declaration of David J. Ribner In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Ribner, David) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 12, 2018 Filing 2774 RESPONSE to re #2750 Bill of Costs, #2769 Objection, #2768 Objection, #2759 Objection,, (Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.'s And Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Bills Of Costs) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Ribner, David) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2773 ORDER REGARDING AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 2772 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER by the MDL Panel. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 2771 Letter dated 3/5/2018 from Christopher Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2770 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting (2767) Stipulation Regarding Acer's Amended Objections to Bills of Costs in case 3:10-md-02143-RS; granting (153) Stipulation in case 3:13-cv-04991-RS. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 2769 OBJECTIONS to re #2750 Bill of Costs, #2749 Bill of Costs, / Circuit City's and RadioShack's Objections to Toshiba's and Samsung's Bills of Costs by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Pfister & Exhibits)(Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 2768 OBJECTIONS to re #2750 Bill of Costs, #2749 Bill of Costs, Amended Objections to the Toshiba and Samsung Defendants' Bills of Costs by Acer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Declaration of Michael C. Ting, #2 Exhibits A through K)(Ting, Michael) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 2767 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #2750 Bill of Costs, #2749 Bill of Costs, #2760 Objection, #2764 Exhibits, STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING ACER'S AMENDED OBJECTIONS TO BILLS OF COSTS filed by Acer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Redline Version of Acer's Amended Objections, #2 Exhibit A-2 Redline Version of Amended Declaration of Michael C. Ting)(Ting, Michael) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2766 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting Administrative Motion Remand.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 23, 2018 Filing 2765 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Acer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ting, Michael) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 23, 2018 Filing 2764 EXHIBITS re #2760 Objection, Exhibits "A" Through "K" with Corrected Exhibit "I" filed byAcer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Related document(s) #2760 ) (Ting, Michael) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 2763 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 2762 EXHIBITS re #2759 Objection,, [Corrected] Exhibit I filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #2759 ) (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2761 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Object to Bills of Costs. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/20/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 17, 2018 Filing 2760 OBJECTIONS to re #2750 Bill of Costs, #2749 Bill of Costs, by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Ting, #2 Exhibits A through M)(Ting, Michael) (Filed on 2/17/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 2759 OBJECTIONS to Toshiba Defendants' Bill of Costs, Samsung Defendants' Bill of Costs, and BenQ Defendants' Bill of Costs by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 2758 Declaration in Support of #2757 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #2750 Bill of Costs, #2749 Bill of Costs, / Stipulation to Extend Time to Object to Bills of Costs / Declaration of Robert J. Pfister in Support of Stipulation to Extend Time to Object to Bills of Costs filed byPeter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Related document(s) #2757 ) (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 2757 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #2750 Bill of Costs, #2749 Bill of Costs, / Stipulation to Extend Time to Object to Bills of Costs filed by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 2756 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 9/26/2017 before Judge Seeborg, re #2748 USCA Case Number, 18-15087 Transcript due by 3/19/2018. (Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 14, 2018 Filing 2755 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Certificate Regarding Transcripts (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 14, 2018 Filing 2754 NOTICE by Peter Kravitz re #2724 Notice of Appeal, #2746 USCA Case Number / Certificate Regarding Transcripts (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 14, 2018 Filing 2753 NOTICE by Alfred H. Siegel re #2747 USCA Case Number, #2723 Notice of Appeal, / Certificate Regarding Transcripts (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 9, 2018 Filing 2752 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Suggestion of Remand filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Responses due by 2/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 2, 2018 Filing 2751 BILL OF COSTS by BenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation. Objections due by 2/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Kaas, Lisa) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 2, 2018 Filing 2750 BILL OF COSTS by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Objections due by 2/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Ribner in Support of, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Ribner, David) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 2, 2018 Filing 2749 BILL OF COSTS by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. Objections due by 2/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew M.W. Bertolli, #2 Schedules A - F and Exhibits A - F)(McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 2748 USCA Case Number 18-15087 for (141 in 3:13-cv-04991-RS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Gateway, Inc., Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Acer America Corporation, (2722 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Gateway, Inc., Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Acer America Corporation. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 2747 USCA Case Number 18-15090 for (128 in 3:15-cv-03248-RS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Alfred H. Siegel, (2723 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Alfred H. Siegel. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 2746 USCA Case Number 18-15093 for (112 in 3:15-cv-06325-RS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Peter Kravitz, (2724 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) Notice of Appeal, filed by Peter Kravitz. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2745 STIPULATION AND ORDER (112 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) (2742 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS QUANTA STORAGE, INC. AND QUANTA STORAGE AMERICA, INC. filed by Ingram Micro Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/1/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2744 STIPULATION AND ORDER (113 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) (2743 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS QUANTA STORAGE, INC. AND QUANTA STORAGE AMERICA, INC. filed by Synnex Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/1/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2743 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS QUANTA STORAGE, INC. AND QUANTA STORAGE AMERICA, INC. filed by Synnex Corporation. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2742 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS QUANTA STORAGE, INC. AND QUANTA STORAGE AMERICA, INC. filed by Ingram Micro Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2741 ORDER RE STATUS OF HP CLAIMS AGAINST QUANTA. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/30/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 29, 2018 Filing 2740 FINAL JUDGMENT RE #2696 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PIONEER DEFENDANT FAMILY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/29/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 Filing 2739 FINAL JUDGMENT RE #2695 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLDS, PHILIPS AND LITE-ON DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/29/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 Filing 2738 FINAL JUDGMENT RE #2694 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO TEAC DEFENDANT FAMILY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/29/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 2737 USCA Case Number 18-15058 for #2719 Notice of Appeal, filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 2736 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal / Samsung's Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Proposed Order)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 2735 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Panasonic Corporation and Panasonic Corporation of North America's Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Materials Filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions, filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George E. Mastoris in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Mastoris, George) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 2734 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Materials Filed in Connection with Defendants' Consolidation Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class filed by Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc.. Responses due by 1/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Bonfig Declaration with Attachment A, #2 Proposed Order)(Lawson, Alyssa) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 2733 FINAL JUDGMENT RE #2728 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/18/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018) Modified on 1/19/2018 (cl, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2018 Filing 2732 FINAL JUDGMENT RE #2727 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/18/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018) Modified on 1/19/2018 (cl, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2018 Filing 2731 FINAL JUDGMENT RE #2726 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/18/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018) Modified on 1/19/2018 (cl, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2018 Filing 2730 FINAL JUDGMENT RE #2725 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/18/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018) Modified on 1/19/2018 (cl, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2018 Filing 2729 Statement Joint Statement Regarding the Status of the Remaining Actions by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2728 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2727 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2726 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2725 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 17, 2018 Filing 2724 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Peter Kravitz. Appeal of Order #2708 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-12032069 paid.) ***18-15093*** (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 1/17/2018) Modified on 2/2/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2018 Filing 2723 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Alfred H. Siegel. Appeal of Order #2708 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-12032052 paid.) ***18-15090*** (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 1/17/2018) Modified on 2/2/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2018 Filing 2722 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Acer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. Appeal of Order #2707 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-12026332 paid.) ***18-15087*** (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 1/16/2018) Modified on 2/2/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2721 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Regarding Outstanding Administrative Motions to Seal. Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal #2405 , #2625 , #2629 , #2636 and Granting Administrative Motions to File Under Seal #2627 , #2628 , #2630 , #2631 , #2634 , #2635 , #2637 , #2639 (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2720 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 9/14/17 (Lydia Zinn) before Judge Richard Seeborg. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2719 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-12000484 paid.) ***18-15058*** (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Representation Statement)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 1/5/2018) Modified on 1/26/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2018 Filing 2718 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 09/14/2017 before Judge Seeborg, (Attachments: #1 Supplement original order)(rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 3, 2018 Filing 2717 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/14/2017 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Christopher Andrews, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Attachments: #1 Supplement original order) (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 3, 2018 Filing 2716 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/14/2017, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #2713 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2018. (Related documents(s) #2713 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2715 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF LITE-ON IT CORPORATION; KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. (F/K/A KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.); PHILIPS & LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS CORPORATION; AND PHILIPS & LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS USA, INC. BY ACER AMERICA CORPORATION, GATEWAY, INC. AND GATEWAY U.S. RETAIL F/K/A EMACHINES, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/22/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 22, 2017 Filing 2714 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF LITE-ON IT CORPORATION; KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.; PHILIPS & LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS CORPORATION; AND PHILIPS & LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS USA, INC. filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 2713 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/14/2017 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Conner Erwin, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2712 ORDER RE STATUS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/19/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2711 ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/18/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2710 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO STRIKE OR EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/18/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2709 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg DENYING #2379 DECERTIFICATION OF THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2708 ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST TRUSTEES OF CIRCUIT CITY AND RADIOSHACK. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/18/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2707 ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST ACER PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/18/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2706 OMNIBUS ORDER REGARDING ISSUES PERTAINING TO SEVERAL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/18/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2705 ORDER SUMMARY OF RULINGS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/18/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 2704 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Christopher Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 12, 2017 Filing 2703 USCA Case Number 17-17439 for #2701 Notice of Appeal filed by Conner Erwin. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 Filing 2702 USCA Case Number 17-17436 for #2692 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Andrews. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 5, 2017 Filing 2701 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Conner Erwin. Appeal of Order on Motion for Settlement, #2691 (Appeal fee of $505.00, receipt number 0971-11927050 paid.) ***17-17439*** (Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2700 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE (109 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) (2698 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS PANASONIC CORPORATION AND PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA filed by Synnex Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/1/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2699 STIPULATION AND ORDER (108 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) (2697 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS PANASONIC CORPORATION AND PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA by Ingram Micro Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/1/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 Filing 2698 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS PANASONIC CORPORATION AND PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA filed by Synnex Corporation. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 Filing 2697 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS PANASONIC CORPORATION AND PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA filed by Ingram Micro Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2696 Proposed Order re #2435 Notice (Other) [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Pioneer Defendant Family by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2695 Proposed Order re #2435 Notice (Other) [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the PLDS, Philips and Lite-On Defendants by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 29, 2017 Filing 2694 Proposed Order re #2435 Notice (Other) [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to TEAC Defendant Family by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 27, 2017 Filing 2693 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Christopher Andrews. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2017: #1 Exhibit) (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
November 27, 2017 Filing 2692 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Christopher Andrews. Appeal of Order on Motion for Settlement, #2691 (Filing Fee IFPP). ***17-17436*** (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2691 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting #2432 Final Approval of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Settlements with PLDS, Pioneer, and TEAC Defendant Families, Granting Motion for Attorney Fees, Expenses and Service Awards, and Denying Objections. AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017) Modified on 11/7/2017 (cl, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2690 STIPULATION AND ORDER (225 in 3:13-cv-05370-RS) (2688 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/1/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2689 STIPULATION AND ORDER (224 in 3:13-cv-05370-RS) (2687 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/1/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 2688 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 2687 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 27, 2017 Filing 2686 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Expiration of the Class Action Fairness Act (CAFA) Government Notice Time Period (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2685 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #2684 Regarding Amended Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/24/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 17, 2017 Filing 2684 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Amended Case Management Order filed by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2683 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 26, 2017, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #2662 Transcript Order, #2671 Transcript Order, #2665 Transcript Order, #2663 Transcript Order, #2664 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2017. (Related documents(s) #2662 , #2671 , #2665 , #2663 , #2664 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2682 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/26/2017 before Judge Richard Seeborg by BenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Kaas, Lisa) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2681 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2680 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2680 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, [Highlighted] Reply in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Edward Snyder by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2679 Declaration in Support of #2606 Document E-Filed Under Seal, [Unredacted] Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman in Further Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Edward Snyder filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #2606 ) (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2678 REDACTION to #2606 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Reply in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Edward Snyder by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2677 REPLY (re #2459 Joint MOTION to Strike [REDACTED] #2322 #2406 ) filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Ian Simmons In Support, #2 Exhibit 10 (REDACTED))(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2676 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2675 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2675 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, (Exhibit 10 to Supplemental Declaration of Ian Simmons In Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Luis Cabral) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2674 REPLY (re #2457 Joint MOTION to Strike [REDACTED] #2322 #2415 ) filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Ian Simmons In Support, #2 Exhibit 15 (PUBLIC))(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2673 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2672 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2672 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, (Defendants' Reply In Support of Joint Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Flamm) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 28, 2017 Filing 2671 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/26/2017 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Steenland, Nicolas) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2670 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #2658 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF PHILIPS AND LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, PHILIPS & LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS U.S.A., INC., KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. (f/k/a KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.), P filed by Peter Kravitz. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/28/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2669 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #2657 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF PHILIPS AND LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, PHILIPS & LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS U.S.A., INC., KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. (f/k/a KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.), P filed by Alfred H. Siegel. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/28/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 Filing 2668 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/22/17, before Judge Spero. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #2661 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 10/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2017. (Related documents(s) #2661 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 Filing 2667 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/26/2017 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Esau, David) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 27, 2017 Filing 2666 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/26/2017 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 Filing 2665 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 26, 2017 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Lite-On It Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 Filing 2664 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 26, 2017 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 Filing 2663 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/26/2017 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 Filing 2662 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/26/2017 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 Filing 2661 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/22/2017 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 26, 2017 Filing 2660 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Motions for Summary Judgment Hearing held on 9/26/2017. Motions taken under submission; Court to issue an order. Total Time in Court: 6 hours 10 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Jeff Friedman, Shana Scarlett, Benjamin Siegel, Rio Pierce, David Esau.Defendant Attorney: Stephen McIntyre, Ian Simmons, Ben Bradshaw, James Pearl, Belinda Lee, Brendan McShane, Lisa Kaas, Jeffrey Johnson, John Taladay, Robert Pfister, Jonathan M. Weiss. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 Filing 2659 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Kristin Lisa Coveney of Natalie F. Wayne (Coveney, Kristin) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 25, 2017 Filing 2658 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF PHILIPS AND LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, PHILIPS & LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS U.S.A., INC., KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. (f/k/a KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.), PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC (f/k/a PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION), LITE-ON IT CORPORATION, AND LITE-ON SALES AND DISTRIBUTION INC. filed by Peter Kravitz. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 Filing 2657 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF PHILIPS AND LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, PHILIPS & LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS U.S.A., INC., KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. (f/k/a KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.), PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC (f/k/a PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION), LITE-ON IT CORPORATION, AND LITE-ON SALES AND DISTRIBUTION INC. filed by Alfred H. Siegel. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2656 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2383 MOTION for Summary Judgment REDACTED - Re-File per 2322, 2355 ) Opposition to #2632 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike New Translations filed byBenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation. (Kaas, Lisa) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2655 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Hearing held re: Motion to Compel #2299 on 9/22/2017. Motion DENIED.Total Time in Court: 7 M. Court Reporter: Pam Batalo. Plaintiff Attorney: Shana Scarlett - Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs (T)*. Defendant Attorney: Belinda Lee - TSST, TSST-K (T)*; Lisa Kaas - BenQ (T)*. Attachment: Minute Order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/22/2017) (T)* = telephonic appearance
September 22, 2017 Filing 2654 REPLY (re #2375 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED - Re-File per #2322 #2347 ) ) filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2653 REPLY (re #2373 MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED - Re-File per #2322 #2351 ) ) (REDACTED) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2652 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation re #2648 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, #2646 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2651 Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of #2649 Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [Redacted])(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2650 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2647 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2649 REPLY (re #2398 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Redacted] ) filed byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2648 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2647 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Reply In Further Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2646 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Reply in Support of #2336 Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2645 REPLY (re #2383 MOTION for Summary Judgment REDACTED - Re-File per 2322, 2355 ) In Support of BenQ Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment - Refile Per ECF No. 2322, 2550 - UNREDACTED filed byBenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of L. Kaas)(Johnson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2644 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation re #2640 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2641 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2643 Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of #2642 Defendants' Reply in Support of Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class filed byToshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 [Sealed], #3 Exhibit 3 [Redacted])(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2642 REPLY (re #2379 Joint MOTION for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class [Redacted] ) filed byToshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2641 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibits 2 and 3 to Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Class by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2640 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Defendants' Reply in Support of #2330 Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 2639 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLDS Defendants' Amended Admin. Motion to File Under Seal Materials Filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Lite-On It Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Andrew L. Lucarelli ISO the PLDS Defendants' Amended Admin. Motion to File Under Seal Materials Filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting PLDS Defendants Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 2638 STIPULATION Joint Statement and Stipulation of Plaintiff HP Inc. and Defendant NEC Corporation filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 2637 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Non-Party Apple's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Buckley, #2 Proposed Order)(Erickson, Ryan) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 2636 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Materials filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Proposed Order)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 2635 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Acer's Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Filed in Connection with Dispositive and Daubert Motions Pursuant to June 28, 2017 Court Order filed by Acer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Lin, #2 Exhibit A1 to A9, #3 Exhibit A10, #4 Exhibit A11 to A17, #5 Exhibit A18, #6 Exhibit A19, #7 Exhibit A20, #8 Exhibit A21 to A22, #9 Exhibit A23, #10 Exhibit A24 to A28, #11 Exhibit A29 to A34, #12 Exhibit B1 to B9, #13 Exhibit B10, #14 Exhibit B11 to B17, #15 Exhibit B18, #16 Exhibit B19, #17 Exhibit B20, #18 Exhibit B21 to B22, #19 Exhibit B23, #20 Exhibit B24 to B28, #21 Exhibit Nos. B29 to B34, #22 Proposed Order)(Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 2634 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Dkt. 2322] NEC Corporation's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Pursuant to Stipulation and Order Regarding Administrative Motions to Seal Filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions (Dkt. No. 2322) filed by NEC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian, #2 Exhibit 2 to Parsigian Declaration, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 5 to Parsigian Declaration, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 to Parsigian Declaration, #5 Exhibit 6 to Parsigian Declaration, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 10 to Parsigian Declaration, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10 to Parsigian Declaration, #8 Exhibit 11 to Parsigian Declaration, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 11 to Nguyen Declaration, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11 to Nguyen Declaration, #11 Exhibit 76 to Nguyen Declaration, #12 Proposed Order)(Parsigian, Jeanifer) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 2633 Statement Joint Statement and Stipulation of Plaintiff HP, Inc. and Certain Undersigned Defendants by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 2632 RESPONSE to re #2550 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2569 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2565 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Response to Evidentiary Objections and Motion to Strike New Translations Produced After the Close of Fact Discovery by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 2631 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Dkt. 2322] filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rodney J. Ganske, #2 Proposed Order)(Ganske, Rodney) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 2630 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Koninklijke Philips N.V., Lite-On IT Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, and Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions U.S.A., Inc.s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Lite-On It Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew L. Lucarelli ISO PLDS Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting PLDS Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions)(Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 2629 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Panasonic Corporation and Panasonic Corporation of North America's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Materials Filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions, filed by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Mastoris, George) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 2628 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen ISO Plaintiff HP Inc.s Administrative Motion to Seal Materials Filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal Materials Filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 2627 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Materials filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions filed by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brendan A. McShane, #2 Proposed Order)(McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 2626 Declaration of Jason Bonfig in Support of #2625 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Non-Party Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Materials Filed in Connection with Defendants' Consolidation Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Un filed byBest Buy Enterprise Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) #2625 ) (Lawson, Alyssa) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 2625 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST 2625-2. See document 2626. *** ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Non-Party Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Materials Filed in Connection with Defendants' Consolidation Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc.. Responses due by 9/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Lawson, Alyssa) (Filed on 9/19/2017) Modified on 9/19/2017 (wv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/19/2017 (wv, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2624 ORDER GUIDELINES FOR SEPTEMBER 26, 2017 DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS HEARING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/19/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 18, 2017 Filing 2623 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). Telephonic Discovery Hearing re: Motion to Compel Defendants' Amended Interrogatory Responses as to TSST, TSST-K and BenQ ECF #2299 is set for 9/22/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel shall make arrangements through CourtCall.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 2622 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Richard Seeborg: Motion Hearing held on 9/14/2017 re #2432 MOTION for Settlement, Motion for Final Approval of Settlements #2326 MOTION for Attorney Fees Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Motion For Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Service Awards. Court to issue an order.Total Time in Court 25 minutes. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorney: Shana Scarlett, Jeff Friedman.Defendant Attorney: John Taladay, Lily Chinn, Eric Enson.This is a text-only Minute Entry (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2017)
September 13, 2017 Filing 2621 STATUS REPORT Regarding September 26, 2017 Dispositive Motions Hearing by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/13/2017) Modified on 9/18/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2017 Filing 2620 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Hays Yandell as Counsel for Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. (Yandell, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2619 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2618 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2618 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Reply in Support of #2419 Joint Motion to Strike Testimony of Alan S. Frankel, James T. McClave, Adam K. Fontecchio, and John B. Hayes by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Exhibits 12-14 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2617 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2405 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Intention to Seal Documents ) [Redacted] Defendants' Joint Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Edward Snyder filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Exhibits 1-12 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2616 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2615 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2615 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Defendants' Joint Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Edward Snyder by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Exhibits 1-12 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2614 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2613 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2613 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Defendants' Joint Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Luis Cabral by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Exhibit 10 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2612 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2606 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2611 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2610 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2610 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Defendants' Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Exhibit 15 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2609 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation re #2607 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2608 Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of #2607 Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron filed byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2607 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Reply in Support of #2409 Defendants' Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2606 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Reply in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Edward Snyder by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 16)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2605 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hewlett-Packard Company re #2599 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2603 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2600 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2604 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2604 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Supplemental Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen ISO HP Inc.s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2603 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, HP Inc.s Reply ISO Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder And Kevin Murphy by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2602 CLERK'S NOTICE Set/Reset as to #2341 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Intention to Seal Documents. Motion Hearing previously set for 9/21/2017 continued to 9/26/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2601 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2598 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2600 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Supplemental Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen ISO HP Inc.s Reply ISO Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Michael Smith by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2599 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, HP Inc.s Reply ISO Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Michael Smith by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2598 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Flamm [Highlighted] by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman, #2 Exhibit J to Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2597 REDACTION to #2516 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motions to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Flamm and Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Luis Cabral by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-T)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2596 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2459 Joint MOTION to Strike [REDACTED] #2322 #2406 ) [Unredacted] Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Luis Cabral filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2595 REDACTION to #2514 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Strike the Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2594 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg DENYING #2495 INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE FTAIA ARGUMENT AND GRANTING ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO FILE OPPOSITION BRIEF. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017) Modified on 9/11/2017 (cl, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2593 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE (#2590 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) (#104 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) of Dismissal of Defendants Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. filed by Synnex Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/8/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2592 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE (#105 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) (#2589 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) of Dismissal of Defendants Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. filed by Ingram Micro Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/8/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2591 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2542 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 2590 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Defendants Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. filed by Synnex Corporation. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 2589 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Defendants Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. filed by Ingram Micro Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2588 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #2587 Dismissal of NEC Corporation filed by Gateway, Inc., Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Acer America Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/7/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 7, 2017 Filing 2587 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissal of NEC Corporation filed by Acer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2586 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #2581 of Dismissal of Defendants BenQ Corporation and BenQ America Corp. filed by Synnex Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/7/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2585 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #2580 of Dismissal of Defendants BenQ Corporation and BenQ America Corp. filed by Ingram Micro Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/7/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2584 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #2579 Dismissal of Pioneer Defendants filed by Gateway, Inc., Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Acer America Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/7/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2583 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #2578 of Dismissal of Defendants Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Koninklijke Philips N.V., and Lite-On IT Corporation of Taiwan filed by Synnex Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/7/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2582 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #2577 of Dismissal of Defendants Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Koninklijke Philips N.V., and Lite-On IT Corporation of Taiwan. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/7/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 5, 2017 Filing 2581 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Defendants BenQ Corporation and BenQ America Corp. filed by Synnex Corporation. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Filing 2580 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Defendants BenQ Corporation and BenQ America Corp. filed by Ingram Micro Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Filing 2579 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissal of Pioneer Defendants filed by Acer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Filing 2578 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Defendants Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Koninklijke Philips N.V., and Lite-On IT Corporation of Taiwan filed by Synnex Corporation. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Filing 2577 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Defendants Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Koninklijke Philips N.V., and Lite-On IT Corporation of Taiwan filed by Ingram Micro Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2576 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2574 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2575 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2573 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2574 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Defendants' Joint Reply in Further Support of #2343 Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under the Foreign Trade Antitrust Improvements Act re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Exhibits 24-28 to the Ian Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2573 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Defendants' Joint Reply in Further Support of Their #2346 Motion for Summary Judgment on Circuit City / RadioShack Claims re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Exhibits 1-7 to the Ian Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2572 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation re #2570 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2571 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2569 Document E-Filed Under Seal (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2570 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL CORRECTED Exhibits 1 and 3 to #2547 Declaration of Brendan McShane in Support of Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Against HP (Correction of #2548 re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2569 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Reply in Support of #2347 Joint Motion for Summary Judgment re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2568 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2564 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2567 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation re #2566 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2565 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2566 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of #2565 Reply in Support of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2565 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Reply in Support of #2336 Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2564 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Reply in Further Support of #2351 Motion for Summary Judgment re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2563 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation re #2559 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2561 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,, #2562 Exhibits, #2560 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2562 EXHIBITS 3 and 4 to #2560 Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against HP filed by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2561 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibits 1-2, 5-21 to #2560 Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against HP re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2560 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of #2559 Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against HP re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2559 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Reply in Support of #2353 Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against HP re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2558 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NEC Corporation re #2553 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Parsigian, Jeanifer) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2557 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation re #2555 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2556 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2556 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of #2555 Defendants' Reply in Support of Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2555 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Defendants' Reply in Support of #2330 Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2554 Certificate of Service of Defendants' Reply in support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc. re #2552 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2553 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Reply in Support of NEC Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Based Upon Insufficiency of the Evidence and Withdrawal re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal by NEC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian, #2 Exhibit 36)(Pringle, Robert) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2552 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc.. (Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2551 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation re #2549 Exhibits, #2548 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2546 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2547 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2550 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment [2355, 2383] re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by BenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kaas Declaration and Exhibits A-17 - A-20)(Kaas, Lisa) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2549 EXHIBITS 2 and 4 to #2547 Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Against HP filed byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 4)(McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2548 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Exhibits 1 and 3 to #2547 Declaration of Brendan McShane in Support of Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Against HP re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3)(McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2547 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of #2546 Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Against HP re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2546 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL Reply in Support of #2358 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Against HP re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2545 REPLY (re #2495 MOTION to Strike #2483 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Motion to Strike FTAIA Argument in Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, to Permit Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to File Stand-alone Opposition Brief ) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2544 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2543 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2543 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint and Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Class [Proposed Redactions - corrected] by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment [Proposed Redactions - corrected], #2 Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Samsung and Toshiba Defendants' Individual Motions for Summary Judgment [Proposed Redactions - corrected])(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2542 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
September 1, 2017 Filing 2541 REDACTED Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment to #2480 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2017 Filing 2540 REDACTED Opposition to Defendants' Joint and Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Class to #2479 Document E-Filed Under Seal by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/5/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2017 Filing 2539 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2538 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,,, (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 31, 2017 Filing 2538 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint and Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class [Proposed Redactions] by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment [Proposed Redactions], #2 Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Samsung and Toshiba Defendants' Individual Motions for Summary Judgment [Proposed Redactions], #3 Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike FTAIA Argument in Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, to Permit Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to File Stand-Alone Opposition Brief [Proposed Redactions], #4 Declaration Omnibus Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion for Decertification, #5 Exhibit 3, 29, 49, 51, 87, 96, 142, 161-164, 182, 212, 243, 250 [Proposed Redactions])(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 31, 2017 Filing 2537 REDACTED Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment to #2487 Document E-Filed Under Seal by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 152, #2 Exhibit 153, #3 Exhibit 154, #4 Exhibit 155, #5 Exhibit 156, #6 Exhibit 157, #7 Exhibit 158, #8 Exhibit 159, #9 Exhibit 160, #10 Exhibit 161, #11 Exhibit 162, #12 Exhibit 163, #13 Exhibit 164, #14 Exhibit 165, #15 Exhibit 166, #16 Exhibit 167-1, #17 Exhibit 167-2, #18 Exhibit 167-3)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/31/2017) Modified on 9/1/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2017 Filing 2536 REDACTED Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment to #2489 Document E-Filed Under Seal by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-13, #2 Exhibit 14-34, #3 Exhibit 35-39, #4 Exhibit 40-54, #5 Exhibit 55-69, #6 Exhibit 70-78, #7 Exhibit 79-87, #8 Exhibit 88-97, #9 Exhibit 98-119, #10 Exhibit 120-134, #11 Exhibit 135-146, #12 Exhibit 147-149, #13 Exhibit 150, #14 Exhibit 151)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/31/2017) Modified on 9/1/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2017 Filing 2535 REDACTED Omnibus Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion for Decertification to #2484 Document E-Filed Under Seal by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-45, #2 Exhibit 46-69, #3 Exhibit 70-89, #4 Exhibit 90-110, #5 Exhibit 111-127, #6 Exhibit 128-152, #7 Exhibit 153-161, #8 Exhibit 162-192, #9 Exhibit 193-207, #10 Exhibit 208-221, #11 Exhibit 222-248, #12 Exhibit 249-259, #13 Exhibit 260-281, #14 Exhibit 282-293)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/31/2017) Modified on 9/1/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2017 Filing 2534 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2383 MOTION for Summary Judgment REDACTED - Re-File per 2322, 2355 ) UNREDACTED Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to BenQ Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 31, 2017 Filing 2533 REDACTED Motion to Strike FTAIA Argument in Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, to Permit Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to File Stand-Alone Opposition Brief to #2483 Document E-Filed Under Seal by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/31/2017) Modified on 9/1/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2017 Filing 2532 REDACTED Consolidated Opposition to Samsung and Toshiba Defendants' Individual Motions for Summary Judgment to #2481 Document E-Filed Under Seal by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/31/2017) Modified on 9/1/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2017 Filing 2531 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** REDACTION to #2480 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/31/2017) Modified on 9/1/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 2531 replaced on 9/8/2017) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2017 Filing 2530 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** REDACTION to #2479 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint and Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/31/2017) Modified on 9/1/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 2530 replaced on 9/8/2017) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2017 Filing 2529 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2495 MOTION to Strike #2483 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Motion to Strike FTAIA Argument in Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, to Permit Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to File Stand-alone Opposition Brief) filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons, #2 Exhibit A to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 8/25/2017) Modified on 8/25/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2017 Filing 2528 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Ken K. Fung by Hsiang James H Lin (Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 8/25/2017) Modified on 8/25/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2527 STIPULATION AND ORDER (#2525 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) (#97 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) of Dismissal of Defendants Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Optiarc Inc. (formerly known as Sony NEC Optiarc Inc.), and Sony Optiarc America Inc. filed by Synnex Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2526 STIPULATION AND ORDER (#2524 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) (#96 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) of Dismissal of Defendants Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Optiarc Inc. (formerly known as Sony NEC Optiarc Inc.), and Sony Optiarc America Inc. filed by Ingram Micro Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 2525 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Defendants Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Optiarc Inc. (formerly known as Sony NEC Optiarc Inc.), and Sony Optiarc America Inc. filed by Synnex Corporation. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/24/2017) Modified on 8/24/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2017 Filing 2524 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Defendants Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Optiarc Inc. (formerly known as Sony NEC Optiarc Inc.), and Sony Optiarc America Inc. filed by Ingram Micro Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/24/2017) Modified on 8/24/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2523 STIPULATION AND ORDER (#94 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) (#2522 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) of Dismissal of Defendant NEC Corporation filed by Synnex Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/24/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 2522 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant NEC Corporation filed by Synnex Corporation. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2521 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice of Defendant NEC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/24/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 2520 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Defendant NEC Corporation filed by Ingram Micro Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2519 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2518 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2518 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Defendants' Joint Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Edward Snyder by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of, #2 Exhibits 1-12 to the Declaration of Ian Simmons)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2517 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2515 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2514 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2516 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2516 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motions to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Flamm and Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Luis Cabral by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-T)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2515 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Luis Cabral by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2514 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Strike the Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2513 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation re #2511 Exhibits,, #2510 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, #2506 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2509 Declaration in Support, (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2512 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel re #2504 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2507 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2511 EXHIBITS 9-16 to #2509 Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of #2506 Defendants' Opposition to HP Inc.'s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy filed byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2510 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibits 1- 8 to #2509 Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of #2506 Defendants' Opposition to HP Inc.'s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2509 Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of #2506 Defendants' Opposition to HP Inc.'s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy filed byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2508 Proposed Order Denying #2392 HP Inc.'s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2507 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Declaration of Robert J. Pfister in Opposition to Defendants' Daubert Motion by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23, #2 Exhibit 24, #3 Exhibit 25, #4 Exhibit 26, #5 Exhibit 27, #6 Exhibit 28, #7 Exhibit 29, #8 Exhibit 30)(Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2506 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Defendants' Opposition to #2392 HP Inc.'s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2505 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NEC Corporation re #2502 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Parsigian, Jeanifer) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2504 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Trustees' Opposition to Defendants' Daubert Motion by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2503 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hewlett-Packard Company re #2501 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2500 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2499 Document E-Filed Under Seal (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2502 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, NEC Corporation's Opposition to HP Inc.'s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Michael Smith by NEC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew R. DalSanto, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Pringle, Robert) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2501 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen in Support of HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2500 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Debra Aron, Ph.D. in Support of HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion to Strike by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2499 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2498 NOTICE to Remove Counsel A. Paul Victor from Service List by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America (Victor, A.) (Filed on 8/21/2017) Modified on 8/22/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2017 Filing 2497 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING THE MOTIONS RE [#2384], [#2392], [#2405], [#2419] CURRENTLY SET FOR OCTOBER 12, 2017 TO SEPTEMBER 26, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
August 18, 2017 Filing 2496 REPLY (re #2432 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with PLDS, Pioneer, and Teac Defendants ) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
August 16, 2017 Filing 2495 MOTION to Strike FTAIA Argument in Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, to Permit Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to File Stand-alone Opposition Brief #2483 Document E-Filed Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/25/2017. Replies due by 9/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - REDACTED VERSION)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/16/2017) Modified on 8/17/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2017 Filing 2494 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/16/2017) Modified on 8/17/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2493 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2490 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 15, 2017 Filing 2492 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2491 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 15, 2017 Filing 2491 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Corrected Exhibits to Omnibus Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman in Support of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Adjudication and Motion for Decertification by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 38, #3 Exhibit 40, #4 Exhibit 55, #5 Exhibit 95, #6 Exhibit 191, #7 Exhibit 291)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 14, 2017 Filing 2490 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 14, 2017 Filing 2489 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-13, #2 Exhibit 14-36, #3 Exhibit 37-41, #4 Exhibit 42-67, #5 Exhibit 68-81, #6 Exhibit 82-92, #7 Exhibit 93-115, #8 Exhibit 116-129, #9 Exhibit 130-145, #10 Exhibit 146-149, #11 Exhibit 150, #12 Exhibit 151)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2488 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2484 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, #2485 Notice (Other), #2486 Declaration in Opposition,, #2480 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2479 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2482 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2483 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2487 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2487 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 152, #2 Exhibit 153, #3 Exhibit 154, #4 Exhibit 155, #5 Exhibit 156, #6 Exhibit 157, #7 Exhibit 158, #8 Exhibit 159, #9 Exhibit 160, #10 Exhibit 161, #11 Exhibit 162, #12 Exhibit 163, #13 Exhibit 164, #14 Exhibit 165, #15 Exhibit 166, #16 Exhibit 167-1, #17 Exhibit 167-2, #18 Exhibit 167-3)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2486 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED, DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** DECLARATION of Shana E. Scarlett in Opposition to #2480 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion For Summary Judgment filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-13, # 2 Exhibit 14-36, # 3 Exhibit 37-41, # 4 Exhibit 42-67, # 5 Exhibit 68-81, # 6 Exhibit 82-92, # 7 Exhibit 93-115, # 8 Exhibit 116-129, # 9 Exhibit 130-145, # 10 Exhibit 146-149, # 11 Exhibit 150, # 12 Exhibit 151)(Related document(s) #2480 ) (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/11/2017) Modified on 8/14/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 2486 replaced on 8/15/2017) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2017 Filing 2485 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2484 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, Manual Filing Notification of Exhibit 121 to Friedman Declaration (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2484 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Omnibus Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman in Support of Indirct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion for Decertification by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20, #2 Exhibit 21-40, #3 Exhibit 41-63, #4 Exhibit 64-85, #5 Exhibit 86-90, #6 Exhibit 91-116, #7 Exhibit 117-126, #8 Exhibit 127-150, #9 Exhibit 151-160, #10 Exhibit 161-172, #11 Exhibit 173-194, #12 Exhibit 195-198, #13 Exhibit 199-213, #14 Exhibit 214-240, #15 Exhibit 241-255, #16 Exhibit 256-275, #17 Exhibit 276-293)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2483 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike FTAIA Argument in Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, or In the Alternative, to Permit Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to File Stand-Alone Opposition Brief by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2482 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to BenQ Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2481 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Samsung and Toshiba Defendants' Individual Motions for Summary Judgment by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2480 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2479 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint and Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Class by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2478 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hewlett-Packard Company re #2472 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2473 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2475 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2474 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2477 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2476 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2477 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Plaintiff HP Inc.s Opposition to #2353 Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Declaration Beatrice B. Nguyen in Support of Plaintiff HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit 1 to 101)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2476 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibits 45 to 71 Part 2 of 2 to the #2475 Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen in Support of #2474 Plaintiff HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under The Foreign Trade Antitrust Improvements Act by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2475 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen in Support of #2474 Plaintiff HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under The Foreign Trade Antitrust Improvements Act by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 44 Part 1 of 2)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2474 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Plaintiff HP Inc.s Opposition to #2343 Defendants Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under The Foreign Trade Antitrust Improvements Act by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2473 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Plaintiff HP Inc.s Opposition to #2358 Defendants Motion for Sanctions by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Beatrice B. Nguyen in Support of Plaintiff HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Motion for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit 1 to 13)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2472 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Plaintiff HP Inc.s Opposition to #2324 Defendant NEC Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment Based Upon Insufficiency of the Evidence and Withdrawal by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Beatrice B. Nguyen in Support of Plaintiff HP Inc.s Opposition to Defendant NEC Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1 to 76)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2471 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc. re #2470 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, (Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2470 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION [2332-2] FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Acer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hsiang ("James") H. Lin") In Support of Response, #2 Exhibit Nos. 1-10, #3 Exhibit Nos. 11-20, #4 Exhibit Nos. 21-29, #5 Exhibit No. 30, #6 Exhibit Nos. 31-39, #7 Exhibit Nos. 40-45, #8 Exhibit Nos. 46-49, #9 Declaration of Gareth Macartney, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C)(Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2469 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2432 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with PLDS, Pioneer, and Teac Defendants ) filed byConner Erwin. (Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2468 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel re #2465 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2463 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, #2467 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2462 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2466 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2464 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2467 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Declaration of Alan S. Frankel, in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Circuit City Trust and RadioShack Trust by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2466 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Declaration of James T. McClave in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Circuit City Trust and RadioShack Trust by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2465 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Declaration of Adam K. Fontecchio in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment against Circuit City Trust and RadioShack Trust by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2464 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Declaration of John B. Hayes in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Circuit City Trust and RadioShack Trust by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2463 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Declaration of Robert J. Pfister in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Circuit City Trust and RadioShack Trust by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 2462 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Trustees' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Circuit City Trust and RadioShack Trust by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 10, 2017 Filing 2461 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2458 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2460 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 10, 2017 Filing 2460 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, (Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Luis Cabral #2322 #2406 ) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons, #2 Exhibits 1-9 to the Declaration of Ian Simmons)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 10, 2017 Filing 2459 Joint MOTION to Exclude Certain Testimony of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Luis Cabral [REDACTED] #2322 #2406 filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 8/24/2017. Replies due by 8/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons, #2 Exhibits 1-9 to the Declaration of Ian Simmons)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 8/10/2017) Modified on 8/11/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2017 Filing 2458 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, (Defendants' Joint Motion and Notice of Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Flamm #2322 #2415 ) by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons, #2 Exhibits 1-3 to the Declaration of Ian Simmons, #3 Exhibits 4-14 to the Declaration of Ian Simmons)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 10, 2017 Filing 2457 Joint MOTION to Strike [REDACTED] #2322 #2415 filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 8/24/2017. Replies due by 8/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons, #2 Exhibits 1-3 to the Declaration of Ian Simmons, #3 Exhibits 4-14 to the Declaration of Ian Simmons)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2456 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2455 to consolidate briefing and reduce page length of indirect purchaser and direct action plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' individual motions for summary judgment. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 10, 2017 Filing 2455 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Briefing and Reduce Page Length of Indirect Purchaser and Direct Action Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Individual Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 9, 2017 Filing 2454 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2452 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
August 9, 2017 Filing 2453 REDACTION to #2405 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Intention to Seal Documents Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Edward Snyder by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman, #2 Exhibit 1-14)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
August 9, 2017 Filing 2452 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Edward Snyder by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman, #2 Exhibit 1 and 9)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2451 CORRECTED ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting (2450) in case 3:10-md-02143-RS; granting (108) in case 3:13-cv-04991-RS regarding modification of briefing schedule as to Pioneer Defendants and Acer. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 2450 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #2342 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE MODIFICATION OF THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AS TO PIONEER AND ACER filed by Acer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2449 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #2451 . *** ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting (2446) in case 3:10-md-02143-RS; granting (106) in case 3:13-cv-04991-RS modification of briefing schedule as to Pioneer Defendants and Acer. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017) Modified on 8/7/2017 (cl, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2448 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting (2445) in case 3:10-md-02143-RS; granting (164) in case 3:13-cv-05370-RS of Dismissal without prejudice.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 2447 NOTICE by LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. re #2327 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,,, Notice of Withdrawal of LG Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Eimer, Nathan) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 2446 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #2332 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Modification of Briefing Schedule as to Pioneer Defendants and Acer filed by Acer America Corporation, Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Lin, Hsiang) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 2445 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE) filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 2444 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #2326 MOTION for Attorney Fees Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Motion For Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Service Awards, #2432 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with PLDS, Pioneer, and Teac Defendants. Motion Hearing previously set for 9/15/2017 moved to 9/14/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 2443 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #2326 MOTION for Attorney Fees Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Motion For Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Service Awards, #2432 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with PLDS, Pioneer, and Teac Defendants. Motion Hearing previously set for 9/7/2017 continued to 9/15/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2442 Order by Hon. Richard Seeborg granting #2428 Administrative Motion to Amend Schedule for Claims from Settlement Funds.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 2441 NOTICE Regarding Submitted Matters Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-13 by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2299 Redacted Document (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/3/2017) Modified on 8/9/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2017 Filing 2440 NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2428 Administration Motion to Amend Schedule for Claims from Settlement Funds (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/3/2017) Modified on 8/9/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2017 Filing 2439 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Aharon Shaul Kaye of Firm Affiliation (Kaye, Aharon) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2438 Order by Hon. Richard Seeborg granting (2436) Stipulation of Dismissal of Toshiba and Samsung Defendants in case 3:10-md-02143-RS and 3:13-cv-03350-RS(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2437 Order by Hon. Richard Seeborg granting (2433) Stipulation of Dismissal of BenQ Defendants in case 3:10-md-02143-RS and 3:13-cv-03350-RS(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
August 1, 2017 Filing 2436 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Toshiba and Samsung Defendants filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bernstein, Debra) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
August 1, 2017 Filing 2435 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2432 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with PLDS, Pioneer, and Teac Defendants (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
August 1, 2017 Filing 2434 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2326 MOTION for Attorney Fees Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Motion For Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Service Awards (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
July 31, 2017 Filing 2433 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of BenQ Defendants filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ganske, Rodney) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 28, 2017 Filing 2432 MOTION for Final Approval of Settlements with PLDS, Pioneer, and Teac Defendants filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/11/2017. Replies due by 8/18/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Declaration of Alan Vasquez, #6 Declaration of Jonathan Mendelson)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 7/28/2017) Modified on 8/7/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2017 Filing 2431 NOTICE by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Lite-On It Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc. of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1715(b) (Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 27, 2017 Filing 2430 NOTICE by Teac America, Inc., Teac Corporation of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1715(b) (Kaye, Aharon) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 27, 2017 Filing 2429 NOTICE by Pioneer Corporation, Pioneer Electronics (USA) Inc., Pioneer High Fidelity Taiwan Co., Ltd., Pioneer North America, Inc. of Compliance (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 27, 2017 Filing 2428 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Amend Schedule for Claims from Settlement Funds filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Responses due by 7/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2427 STIPULATION AND ORDER (#2424 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) (#80 in 3:15-cv-06325-RS) OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF SONY CORPORATION, SONY ELECTRONICS INC., SONY OPTIARC INC. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS SONY NEC OPTIARC INC.) AND SONY OPTIARC AMERICA INC. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS SONY NEC OPTIARC AMERIC filed by Peter Kravitz. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2426 STIPULATION AND ORDER (#2423 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) (#96 in 3:15-cv-03248-RS) OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF SONY CORPORATION, SONY ELECTRONICS INC., SONY OPTIARC INC. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS SONY NEC OPTIARC INC.) AND SONY OPTIARC AMERICA INC. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS SONY NEC OPTIARC AMERIC filed by Alfred H. Siegel. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2425 STIPULATION AND ORDER (#2422 in 3:10-md-02143-RS)(#90 in 3:13-cv-03350-RS) RE Dismissal of Defendants Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corp., Philips Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Lite-On IT Corp. of Taiwan, and Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. By Dell Inc. and Dell Products L filed by Dell Products L.P., Dell Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 24, 2017 Filing 2424 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF SONY CORPORATION, SONY ELECTRONICS INC., SONY OPTIARC INC. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS SONY NEC OPTIARC INC.) AND SONY OPTIARC AMERICA INC. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS SONY NEC OPTIARC AMERICA INC.) filed by Peter Kravitz. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 24, 2017 Filing 2423 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF SONY CORPORATION, SONY ELECTRONICS INC., SONY OPTIARC INC. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS SONY NEC OPTIARC INC.) AND SONY OPTIARC AMERICA INC. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS SONY NEC OPTIARC AMERICA INC.) filed by Alfred H. Siegel. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 24, 2017 Filing 2422 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE Dismissal of Defendants Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corp., Philips Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Lite-On IT Corp. of Taiwan, and Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. By Dell Inc. and Dell Products L.P. filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ganske, Rodney) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2421 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2419 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, #2420 Proposed Order, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2420 Proposed Order re #2419 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, / Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Joint Motion and Notice of Motion to Strike Testimony of Alan S. Frankel, James T. McClave, Adam K. Fontecchio, and John B. Hayes by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2419 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Defendants' Joint Motion and Notice of Motion to Strike Testimony of Alan S. Frankel, James T. McClave, Adam K. Fontecchio, and John B. Hayes by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of Defs.' Joint Motion and Notice of Motion to Strike Testimony of Alan S. Frankel, James T. McClave, Adam K. Fontecchio, and John B. Hayes, #2 Exhibits 1-11 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2418 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2417 Proposed Order, #2415 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2417 Proposed Order re #2415 Document E-Filed Under Seal, / Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2416 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation re #2409 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2412 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, #2414 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2415 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Defendants' Joint Motion and Notice of Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Flamm by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of Defs.' Joint Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Kenneth Flamm, #2 Exhibits 1-3 to the Simmons Declaration, #3 Exhibits 4-14 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2414 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Edward A. Snyder in Support of #2409 Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2413 EXHIBITS 5-8 to the #2411 Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of #2409 Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron filed byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2412 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibits 1-4 to the #2411 Declaration of Belinda S Lee in support of #2409 Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2411 Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of #2409 Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron filed byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2410 Proposed Order Granting #2409 Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2409 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Testimony of Dr. Debra Aron by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2408 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2406 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, #2407 Proposed Order, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2407 Proposed Order re #2406 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, / Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Luis Cabral by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2406 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, / Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Luis Cabral by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of Defs.' Joint Motion to Exclude Testimony of IPPs' Expert Dr. Luis Cabral, #2 Exhibits 1-9 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2405 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Intention to Seal Documents filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude Cetain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Edward Snyder, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman, #4 Exhibit 1-14 [Sealed], #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2404 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #2402 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2403 REDACTION to #2341 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Intention to Seal Documents Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Quanta Storage, Inc. by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett, #2 Exhibit 1-64)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2402 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Quanta Storage, Inc. by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett, #2 Exhibit 1, 3, 53, 56)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2401 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation re #2397 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2396 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, #2390 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2400 Declaration of Hiroshi Suzuki in Support of #2398 Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Sealed])(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2399 Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of #2398 Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [Sealed], #2 Exhibit 2 [Redacted], #3 Exhibit 3 [Redacted], #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 [Redacted], #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25 [Sealed], #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27 [Redacted], #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29 [Sealed], #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48 [Redacted], #49 Exhibit 49 [Redacted], #50 Exhibit 50 [Redacted], #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53 [Redacted])(McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2398 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Redacted] filed by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/11/2017. Replies due by 9/1/2017. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2397 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibit A to the Declaration of Hiroshi Suzuki in Support of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2396 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibits 1-3, 5, 25, 27, 29, 48-50, 53 to the Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 27, #7 Exhibit 29, #8 Exhibit 48, #9 Exhibit 49, #10 Exhibit 50, #11 Exhibit 53)(McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2395 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hewlett-Packard Company re #2394 Proposed Order, #2393 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2392 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2394 Proposed Order re #2393 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2392 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Granting HP Inc.s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2393 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen ISO of HP Inc.s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2392 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, HP Inc.s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Experts Edward Snyder and Kevin Murphy by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2391 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation re #2387 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Kaas, Lisa) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2390 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2389 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hewlett-Packard Company re #2384 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2386 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2388 Proposed Order (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2388 Proposed Order re #2384 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Granting HP Inc.s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Michael Smith by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2387 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Defendants BenQ America Corp. and BenQ Corporation Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment re 2355, 2383 by BenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Kaas, Lisa) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2386 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Beatrice B. Nguyen In Support of HP Inc.s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Designated Expert Michael Smith by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2385 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2374 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2384 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, HP Inc.s Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony Of Designated Expert Michael Smith by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2383 MOTION for Summary Judgment REDACTED - Re-File per 2322, 2355 filed by BenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation. Responses due by 8/4/2017. Replies due by 8/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Kaas, Lisa) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2382 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation re #2377 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2378 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2381 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2376 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2380 Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of #2379 Defendants' Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class filed byToshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 [Sealed], #3 Exhibit 3 [Sealed], #4 Exhibit 4 [Sealed], #5 Exhibit 5 [Sealed], #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 [Redacted], #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 [Redacted], #11 Exhibit 11 [Redacted], #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13 [Redacted], #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15 [Sealed], #16 Exhibit 16 [Redacted], #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18 [Sealed], #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20 [Sealed], #21 Exhibit 21 [Sealed], #22 Exhibit 22)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2379 Joint MOTION for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class [Redacted] filed by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/11/2017. Replies due by 9/1/2017. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2378 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibits 2-5, 7, 10-11, 13, 15-16, 18, 20 and 21 to Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of Defendants' Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Class by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 11, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 20, #13 Exhibit 21)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2377 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2376 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, (Defendants' Joint Motion and Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment #2347 #2375 ) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support, #2 Appendix A-G, #3 Exhibit 1-6, #4 Exhibit 7-49, #5 Exhibit 50-79, #6 Exhibit 80-100)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2375 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED - Re-File per #2322 #2347 ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/4/2017. Replies due by 8/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support, #2 Appendix A-G, #3 Exhibit 1-49, #4 Exhibit 50-79, #5 Exhibit 80-100)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2374 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, (Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.'s And Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment re #2351 #2373 ) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-3, #3 Exhibit 4-19, #4 Exhibit 20-23, #5 Exhibit 24-37)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 2373 MOTION for Summary Judgment (REDACTED - Re-File per #2322 #2351 ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/4/2017. Replies due by 8/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-3, #3 Exhibit 4-19, #4 Exhibit 20-23, #5 Exhibit 24-37)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2372 STIPULATION AND ORDER (#84 in 3:15-cv-03248-RS) (#2371 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) (#68 in 3:15-cv-06325-RS) REGARDING MODIFICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SPECIFIC TO THE CIRCUIT CITY AND RADIOSHACK ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/20/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 19, 2017 Filing 2371 JOINT Stipulation with Proposed Order regarding Modification of Briefing Schedule for Dispositive and Daubert Motions Specific to the Circuit City and RadioShack Actions filed by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Weiss, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/19/2017) Modified on 7/19/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2017 Filing 2370 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion WITHDRAWAL OF JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER AT DOCKET NO. 2369 (Weiss, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
July 19, 2017 Filing 2369 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING MODIFICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SPECIFIC TO THE CIRCUIT CITY AND RADIOSHACK ACTIONS filed by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Weiss, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 2368 STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding the Need for Any Briefing Schedule for Dispositive Motions Specific to the Dell Action by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 2367 OBJECTIONS to Settlement and Attorney's Fees by Conner Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 12, 2017 Filing 2366 OBJECTIONS to the Settlement by Stephen Field. (Creamer, Michael) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2365 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE (#90 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) (#2323 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) Regarding Modification of Briefing Schedule for Dispositive Motions Specific to the Ingram and Synnex Action. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/7/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 2364 NOTICE by Alfred H. Siegel / Notice Concerning Intent to Destroy Obsolete Records Pursuant to Bankruptcy Court Order (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 5, 2017 Filing 2363 Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of #2330 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Regarding Local Rule 5-1(i)(3) filed byToshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Related document(s) #2330 ) (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
July 2, 2017 Filing 2362 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of #2343 Document E-Filed Under Seal, / Regarding Local Rule 5-1(I)(3) filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #2343 ) (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/2/2017)
July 2, 2017 Filing 2361 Declaration of Ian Simmons in Support of #2347 Document E-Filed Under Seal, / Regarding Local Rule 5-1(I)(3) filed bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #2347 ) (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 7/2/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2360 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc. re #2358 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2353 Document E-Filed Under Seal, for Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against HP, and Motion for Sanctions Against HP (Popofsky, Mark) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2359 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Emily J. Derr ISO Motion for Sanctions Against HP by Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Popofsky, Mark) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2358 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Against HP by Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc.. (Popofsky, Mark) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2357 Proposed Order re #2353 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against HP by Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc.. (Popofsky, Mark) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2356 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Emily J. Derr ISO Motion for Summary Judgment Against HP by Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82)(Popofsky, Mark) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2355 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, by BenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lisa M. Kaas, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-1 through A-16, #3 Declaration Declaration of Duncon Wu, #4 Proposed Order)(Kaas, Lisa) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2354 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2351 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2353 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Against HP by Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc.. (Popofsky, Mark) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2352 Proposed Order re #2351 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, GRANTING DEFENDANTS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.S AND SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2351 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, DEFENDANTS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.S AND SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons, #2 Exhibits 1-3 to the Simmons Declaration, #3 Exhibits 4-19 to the Simmons Declaration, #4 Exhibits 20-23 to the Simmons Declaration, #5 Exhibits 24-37 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2350 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NEC Corporation re #2329 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, (Parsigian, Jeanifer) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2349 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2347 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2348 Proposed Order re #2347 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Granting Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2347 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Defendants' Joint Motion and Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 of Ian Simmons, #2 Exhibits 1-49 to the Simmons Declaration, #3 Exhibits 50-79 to the Simmons Declaration, #4 Exhibits 80-100 to the Simmons Declaration, #5 Appendix A-G to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2346 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment Against Circuit City Trust and Radioshack Trust by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Lite-On It Corporation, Lite-On Sales & Distribution Inc., Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gelott, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Proposed Order, #29 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2345 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. re #2343 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2344 Proposed Order re #2343 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Granting Defendants' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under the Foreign Trade Antitrust Improvements Act by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2343 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Defendants' Joint Motion and Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under the Foreign Trade Antitrust Improvements Act by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Simmons, #2 Exhibits 1-9 to the Simmons Declaration, #3 Exhibits 10-23 to the Simmons Declaration)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2342 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Pioneer Corporation, Pioneer Digital Design & Manufacturing Company, Pioneer Electronics (USA) Inc., Pioneer High Fidelity Taiwan Co., Ltd., Pioneer North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of E. Enson in Support of Pioneer's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pioneer's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Pioneer's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgmen, #4 Declaration Declaration of M. Accornero in Support of Pioneer's Motion for Summary Judgment., #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Poineer's Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2341 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Intention to Seal Documents filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 [Sealed] Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Quanta Storage Inc., #2 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett, #3 Exhibit 1-3 [Sealed], #4 Exhibit 4-5, #5 Exhibit 6-33 [Sealed], #6 Exhibit 34, #7 Exhibit 35-62 [Sealed], #8 Exhibit 63, #9 Exhibit 64 [Sealed], #10 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2340 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation re #2339 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2338 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,,,, #2336 Document E-Filed Under Seal, (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2339 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Hiroshi Suzuki in Support of #2336 Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2338 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of #2336 Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53)(McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2337 Proposed Order Granting #2336 Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2336 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2335 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation re #2330 Document E-Filed Under Seal, #2334 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,, (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2334 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Belinda S Lee in Support of #2330 Defendants' Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2333 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lite-On Sales & Distribution Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/11/2017. Replies due by 9/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2332 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Pioneer Corporation, Pioneer Digital Design & Manufacturing Company, Pioneer Electronics (USA) Inc., Pioneer High Fidelity Taiwan Co., Ltd., Pioneer North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of E. Enson in Support of Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion, #3 Defendants' Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Declaration Declaration of M. Accornero in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Enson, Eric) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2331 Proposed Order Granting #2330 Defendants' Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2330 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Consolidated Motion for Decertification of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2329 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, NEC Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion For Summary Judgment Based Upon Insufficiency of the Evidence and Withdrawal; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by NEC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 24, #13 Exhibit 27, #14 Exhibit 28, #15 Exhibit 29, #16 Exhibit 31, #17 Exhibit 32, #18 Exhibit 33, #19 Exhibit 34, #20 Exhibit 35)(Pringle, Robert) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2328 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. re #2327 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,,, (Eimer, Nathan) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2327 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #2322 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, LG Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment by LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heung Jung Ko, #2 Declaration of Jacob M. Hamann, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Proposed Order)(Eimer, Nathan) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2326 MOTION for Attorney Fees Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Motion For Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Service Awards filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 7/14/2017. Replies due by 7/21/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman, #2 Exhibit 1-25)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2325 Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian in Support of #2324 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian in Support of NEC Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Based Upon Insufficiency of the Evidence and Withdrawal filed byNEC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 35)(Related document(s) #2324 ) (Pringle, Robert) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2324 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NEC Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/11/2017. Replies due by 9/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pringle, Robert) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2323 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Modification of Briefing Schedule for Dispositive Motions Specific to the Ingram and Synnex Action filed by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2322 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #2316 Regarding Administrative Motions to Seal Materials Filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/28/17. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2321 STIPULATION AND ORDER (2319 in 3:10-md-02143-RS), (84 in 3:13-cv-03350-RS) RE MODIFICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SPECIFIC TO THE DELL ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/28/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2320 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE DOCKET NO. #2322 *** STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #2316 Regarding Administrative Motions to Seal Materials Filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/28/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017) Modified on 6/28/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2017 Filing 2319 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE MODIFICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SPECIFIC TO THE DELL ACTION filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Ganske, Rodney) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2318 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE (82 in 3:13-cv-03350-RS) (2317 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) OF DISMISSAL OF HLDS AND HITACHI DEFENDANTS BY DELL INC. AND DELL PRODUCTS L.P. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/23/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 22, 2017 Filing 2317 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF HLDS AND HITACHI DEFENDANTS BY DELL INC. AND DELL PRODUCTS L.P filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ganske, Rodney) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 22, 2017 Filing 2316 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Administrative Motions to Seal Materials Filed in Connection with Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions filed by Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 22, 2017 Filing 2315 NOTICE by Philips Electronics North America Corporation (N/K/A Philips North America LLC) Notice of Name Change and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7-1 and Civil Local Rule 3-16 (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2314 ORDER DEYING MOTION TO COMPEL re [2309-2] Redacted Joint Letter Brief re IPPs' Motion to Compel Production of Charles River and Analysis Group Documents and [2309-3] Sealed Joint Letter Brief re IPPs' Motion to Compel Production of Charles River and Analysis Group Documents filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/21/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2313 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #2309 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs shall file documents in the public record as stated herein. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 2312 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs of Withdrawal of Attorney Aaron Sheanin (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 2311 REQUEST to appear by telephone by Christopher Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 2310 NOTICE of Appearance by Rio Shaye Pierce (Pierce, Rio) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 2309 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re IPPs' Motion to Compel Production of Charles River and Analysis Group Documents filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 REDACTED Version - Joint Letter Brief, #3 SEALED Version - Joint Letter Brief, #4 Declaration or Rio S. Pierce, #5 Exhibit 1- SEALED, #6 Exhibit 2- SEALED, #7 Exhibit 3- SEALED, #8 Exhibit 4- SEALED, #9 Declaration of Benjamin G. Bradshaw, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
May 30, 2017 Filing 2308 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2303 MOTION to Unseal Document ) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 2307 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 2306 USCA ORDER AND MANDATE as to #2188 Notice of Appeal, filed by Patrick S. Sweeney. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2305 ORDER of USCA as to #2191 Notice of Appeal, filed by Conner Erwin. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 24, 2017 Filing 2304 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of #2303 MOTION to Unseal Records filed by Christopher Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Part 1) (Related document(s) #2303 ) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 24, 2017 Filing 2303 MOTION to Unseal Records filed by Christopher Andrews. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 22, 2017 Filing 2302 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Moore Johnson (Johnson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2301 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2300 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey M. Johnson. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 2300 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey M. Johnson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11408575.) filed by BenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation. (Johnson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 2299 REDACTION to #2291 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, [Unredacted] Joint Letter Brief re Motion to Compel Defendants' Amended Interrogatory Responses by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 2298 REDACTION to #2297 Order, Plaintiffs' Supplemental Statement Regarding Joint Letter Brief re Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corp. Depositions by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2297 ORDER regarding improper redactions. Plaintiffs shall file a public version of their supplemental statement with redactions conforming to the Court's May 11, 2017 #2291 order no later than May 23, 2017. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 19, 2017. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 18, 2017 Filing 2296 REDACTION to #2291 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Plaintiffs' Supplemental Statement Regarding Joint Letter Brief re Toashiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corp. Depositions by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2295 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2280 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2294 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2277 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2293 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2292 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2231 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2291 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero regarding #2097 , #2121 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs shall file public versions as stated in this order. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2290 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice - Pioneer (2289 in 3:10-md-02143-RS), (90 in 3:13-cv-01877-RS). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/8/17. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
May 5, 2017 Filing 2289 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice-Pioneer filed by State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs. (Brady, Liz) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2288 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal-Quanta (88 in 3:13-cv-01877-RS) (2287 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/24/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 21, 2017 Filing 2287 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal-Quanta filed by State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs. (Brady, Liz) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2286 ORDER VACATING HEARINGS ON MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL re #2246 MOTION for Settlement, #2260 MOTION for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/17/17. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2285 ORDER GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH TEAC DEFENDANTS AND DISSEMINATION OF CLASS NOTICE by Judge Richard Seeborg, granting #2260 Motion for Settlement. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2284 ORDER GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENTS WITH PLDS AND PIONEER DEFENDANTS AND DISSEMINATION OF CLASS NOTICE by Judge Richard Seeborg, granting #2246 Motion for Settlement. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
April 14, 2017 Filing 2283 NOTICE by Hitachi, Ltd. for Withdrawal of Counsel - Vincent van Panhuys (van Panhuys, Vincent) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 10, 2017 Filing 2282 Letter dated 4/5/2017 from Christopher Andrews. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
April 7, 2017 Filing 2281 NOTICE by LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Arin C. Aragona as Counsel (Aragona, Arin) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 2280 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James M. Pearl In Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Answer to Dell Inc.'s and Dell Products L.P.'s First Amended Complaint, #4 REDACTED Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Dell Inc.'s and Dell Products L.P.'s First Amended Complaint, #5 SEALED UNREDACTED Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Answer to Dell Inc.'s and Dell Products L.P.'s First Amended Complaint, #6 SEALED UNREDACTED Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Dell Inc.'s and Dell Products L.P.'s First Amended Complaint)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 2279 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Dell Inc. and Dell Products L.P. byBenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation. (Kaas, Lisa) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 2278 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc. COS for HLDS Defs. Answer to Dell First Amended Complaint (Popofsky, Mark) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 2277 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of HLDS Defs. Answer to Dell's First Amended Complaint, #4 Unredacted version of HLDS Defs. Answer to Dell's First Amended Complaint)(Popofsky, Mark) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 2276 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation's Supplemental Answer to Certain Allegations in Plaintiff Dell Inc. and Dell Products L.P.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 2275 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Supplemental Answer to Certain Allegations in Plaintiff Dell Inc. and Dell Products L.P.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 2274 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s Supplemental Answer to Certain Allegations in Plaintiff Dell Inc. and Dell Products L.P.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 2273 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Corporation's Supplemental Answer to Certain Allegations in Plaintiff Dell Inc. and Dell Products L.P.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2272 STIPULATION AND ORDER (84 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS) (2271 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) of Dismissal re HLDS and LG. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/6/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 2271 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (of Dismissal re HLDS and LG) filed by Synnex Corporation. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2270 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (83 in 3:13-cv-05372-RS), (2269 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) of Dismissal re HLDS and LG. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/6/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 2269 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (of Dismissal re HLDS and LG) filed by Ingram Micro Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 2268 Hitachi, Ltd.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Dell Inc. et al byHitachi, Ltd.. (Seebald, Craig) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2267 STIPULATION AND ORDER (2266 in 3:10-md-02143-RS), (68 in 3:13-cv-03350-RS) REGARDING THE PLDS DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO DELLS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/5/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
April 4, 2017 Filing 2266 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING THE PLDS DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO DELLS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Lite-On It Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc.. (Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 2265 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation's Supplemental Answer To Certain Allegations In Plaintiff HP Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint byToshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 2264 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Supplemental Answer To Certain Allegations In Plaintiff HP Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint byToshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 2263 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s Supplemental Answer To Certain Allegations In Plaintiff HP Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 2262 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Corporation's Supplemental Answer To Certain Allegations In Plaintiff HP Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint byToshiba Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 2261 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #2260 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Unopposed Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Teac Defendants and Dissemination of Class Notice Regarding Expedited Hearing filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 2260 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Unopposed Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Teac Defendants and Dissemination of Class Notice filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 4/17/2017. Replies due by 4/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman, #3 Exhibit A - IPP-Teac Settlement Agreement, #4 Declaration of Alan Vasquez)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 2259 ANSWER to Complaint HLDS Defendants' Answer to Hewlett-Packard Company's Second Amended Complaint byHitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Popofsky, Mark) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 2258 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to HP Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint byLG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Eimer, Nathan) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 2257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James M. Pearl In Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Answer to HP Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint, #4 SEALED UNREDACTED Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Answer to HP Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint, #5 REDACTED Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.'s Answer to HP Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint, #6 SEALED UNREDACTED Samung Electronics Co., Ltd.'s Answer to HP Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint)(Pearl, James) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
April 3, 2017 Filing 2256 ANSWER to Complaint NEC CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT byNEC Corporation. (Pringle, Robert) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
March 31, 2017 Filing 2255 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byQuanta Storage Inc. (Hanna, Paul) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2250 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2247 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kristin L. Coveney. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2249 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/21/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 21, 2017 Filing 2248 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 20, 2017 Filing 2254 Letter dated 3/14/2017 from Patrick S. Sweeney. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 20, 2017 Filing 2253 Transcript Designation Form submitted by Patrick S. Sweeney. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 20, 2017 Filing 2252 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #2251 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Appellant Filing Fee filed by Patrick S. Sweeney. (Related document(s) #2251 ) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 20, 2017 Filing 2251 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Appellant Filing Fee for Notice of Appeal filed by Patrick S. Sweeney. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 20, 2017 Filing 2247 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kristin L. Coveney ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11243986.) filed by Teac America, Inc., Teac Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Admission to the Bar of illinois)(Coveney, Kristin) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 13, 2017 Filing 2246 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Unopposed Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements with PLDS and Pioneer Defendants and Dissemination of Class Notice filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 3/27/2017. Replies due by 4/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jeff D. Friedman, #3 Exhibit A - IPP-PLDS Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit B- IPP-Pioneer Settlement Agreement, #5 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Alan Vasquez)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 9, 2017 Filing 2245 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. AT THE REQUEST OF THE PARTIES THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MARCH 24, 2017 IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2244 ORDER of USCA as to #2188 Notice of Appeal, filed by Patrick S. Sweeney. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2243 STIPULATION AND ORDER (86 in 3:13-cv-01877-RS) (2242 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) of Dismissal - TSST. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/3/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
March 2, 2017 Filing 2242 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal - TSST filed by State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs. (Brady, Liz) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2241 STIPULATION AND ORDER (#2240 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) (#84 in 3:13-cv-01877-RS) of Dismissal with Prejudice - PLDS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/1/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 2240 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice - PLDS filed by State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs. (Brady, Liz) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 24, 2017 Filing 2239 Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of #2231 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byToshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #2231 ) (McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2238 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2196 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2237 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF NEC CORPORATION BY DELL INC. AND DELL PRODUCTS (#2236 in 3:10-md-02143-RS), (#65 in 3:13-cv-03350-RS). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/22/17. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 22, 2017 Filing 2236 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF NEC CORPORATION BY DELL INC. AND DELL PRODUCTS L.P. filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ganske, Rodney) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2235 STIPULATION AND ORDER (#2233 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) (#82 in 3:13-cv-01877-RS) of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/22/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2234 Order, signed 2/21/17, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2230 Further Stipulation Regarding Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Quanta Storage.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 21, 2017 Filing 2233 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice Ben Q filed by State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs. (Brady, Liz) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 20, 2017 Filing 2232 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation, Hitachi, Ltd., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Inc., Hitachi-LG Data Storage, Korea, Inc., Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. Filed byDell Inc.. (Ganske, Rodney) (Filed on 2/20/2017)
February 20, 2017 Filing 2231 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Amended Complaint, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ganske, Rodney) (Filed on 2/20/2017)
February 20, 2017 Filing 2230 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Further Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Quanta Storage, Inc. filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 2/20/2017)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2229 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Amended Complaint of HP Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/15/17. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2228 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Amended Complaint of Dell Inc. and Dell Products L.P. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/15/17. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2227 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 2226 Transcript Designation Form re #2206 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 3/20/2017. (Cochran, George) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 3, 2017 Filing 2225 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Richard Alexander Saveri (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
February 2, 2017 Filing 2223 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw (Bradshaw, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
February 1, 2017 Filing 2224 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 34611121884 re #2206 Notice of Appeal, filed by Barbara Cochran (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
January 31, 2017 Filing 2222 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Lisa Marie Kaas (Kaas, Lisa) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2221 Order, signed 1/30/17, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2218 Stipulation Regarding Defendant Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corp.'s Responses to Plaintiffs Dell and Dell Products Requests for Admission.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2220 ORDER Granting #2209 Stipulation re: Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/30/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 27, 2017 Filing 2219 USCA Case Number 17-15143 for #2206 Notice of Appeal, filed by Barbara Cochran. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 27, 2017 Filing 2218 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dell's Requests for Admission to Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corp. filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Tuck, Andrew) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 26, 2017 Filing 2217 USCA Case Number 17-15067 for #2196 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Andrews. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
January 26, 2017 Filing 2216 USCA Case Number 17-15065 for #2191 Notice of Appeal filed by Conner Erwin. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
January 26, 2017 Filing 2215 USCA Case Number 17-15064 for #2188 Notice of Appeal filed by Patrick S. Sweeney. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
January 26, 2017 Filing 2214 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/08/2016 before Hon. Richard Seeborg by Teac America, Inc., Teac Corporation, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Hennessy, Mary Ellen) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
January 26, 2017 Filing 2213 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/08/16, before Judge Seeborg. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2017. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
January 25, 2017 Filing 2212 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2211 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re #2021 Proposed Order filed by Toshiba Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 24, 2017 Filing 2210 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/08/2016 before Hon. Richard Seeborg by Conner Erwin, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 24, 2017 Filing 2209 STIPULATION Re Initial Disclosures filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 23, 2017 Filing 2208 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ryan Christopher Wong Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Wong, Ryan) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2207 Order, signed 1/20/17, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2205 Further Stipulation Regarding Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Quanta Storage.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 2205 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Further Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Quanta Storage, Inc. filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 2204 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Amended Complaint of HP Inc. filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 18, 2017 Filing 2206 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Barbara Cochran. Appeal of Order on Motion for Settlement, #2133 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) ***17-15143*** (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2017: #1 Envelope) (hdjS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/27/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2203 Order, signed 1/18/17, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2200 Stipulation Regarding Requests for Admission.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2202 Order, signed 1/18/17, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2198 Stipulation Regarding Dell, Inc. and Dell Products LP's First Set of Requests for Admission to BenQ Corp and BenQ America Corp.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2201 Order, signed 1/17/127, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2192 Stipulation Regarding Requests for Admission.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 13, 2017 Filing 2200 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Requests for Admission filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
January 13, 2017 Filing 2199 Notice of Withdrawal of #2080 Motion / Notice of Withdrawal of Trustees' Joint Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 1/13/2017) Modified on 1/18/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2017 Filing 2198 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dell's Requests for Admission to BenQ filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Tuck, Andrew) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
January 13, 2017 Filing 2195 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stuart Christopher Plunkett (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
January 13, 2017 Filing 2194 AMENDED ANSWER to #2159 Amended Complaint,, bySony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Optiarc America, Inc., Sony Optiarc, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2017) Modified on 1/18/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2017 Filing 2193 AMENDED ANSWER to #2158 Amended Complaint, bySony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Optiarc America, Inc., Sony Optiarc, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2017) Modified on 1/18/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2017 Filing 2197 AFFIDAVIT re #2196 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Christopher Andrews. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 2196 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Christopher Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 2192 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Requests for Admission filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 11, 2017 Filing 2191 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Conner Erwin. Appeal of Order on Motion for Settlement, #2133 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11067739 paid.) ***17-15065*** (Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 1/11/2017) Modified on 1/26/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2017 Filing 2190 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 16, 2016 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Ribner, David) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2189 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant re #2188 Notice of Appeal (cc to USCA). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2188 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Patrick S. Sweeney. Appeal of Order on Motion for Settlement #2133 ***17-15064*** (Filing Fee Not Paid). (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017) Modified on 1/26/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2017 Filing 2187 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/08/2016 before Hon. Richard Seeborg by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2186 ANSWER to Amended Complaint DEFENDANTS SONY CORPORATION, SONY ELECTRONICS INC., SONY OPTIARC INC., AND SONY OPTIARC AMERICA INC.S ANSWER TO THE CIRCUIT CITY TRUSTS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT bySony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Optiarc America, Inc., Sony Optiarc, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2185 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants PLDS and PLDS USAs Answer to Radio Shacks First Amended Complaint byPhilips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc.. (Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2184 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants Lite-On IT Corporation and Lite-On Sales & Distribution, Inc.s Answer to Radio Shacks First Amended Complaint byLite-On It Corporation, Lite-On Sales & Distribution Inc.. (Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2183 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants Koninklijke Philips N.V. and Philips Electronics North America Corporations Answer to Radio Shacks First Amended Complaint byKoninklijke Philips N.V., Philips Electronics North America Corporation. (Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2182 ANSWER to Amended Complaint DEFENDANTS SONY CORPORATION, SONY ELECTRONICS INC., SONY OPTIARC INC., AND SONY OPTIARC AMERICA INC.S ANSWER TO THE RSH LIQUIDATING TRUSTS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT bySony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Optiarc America, Inc., Sony Optiarc, Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2181 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants PLDS and PLDS USAs Answer to Circuit Citys Second Amended Complaint byPhilips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc.. (Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2180 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants Lite-On IT Corporation and Lite-On Sales & Distribution, Inc.s Answer to Circuit Citys Second Amended Complaint byLite-On It Corporation, Lite-On Sales & Distribution Inc.. (Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2179 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants Koninklijke Philips N.V. and Philips Electronics North America Corporations Answer to Circuit Citys Second Amended Complaint byKoninklijke Philips N.V., Philips Electronics North America Corporation. (Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2178 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation's Answer to Radio Shack's First Amended Complaint byToshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2177 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Answer to Radio Shack's First Amended Complaint byToshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2176 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Corporation's Answer to Radio Shack's First Amended Complaint byToshiba Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2175 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s Answer to Radio Shack's First Amended Complaint byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2174 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation's Answer to Circuit City's Second Amended Complaint byToshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2173 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Answer to Circuit City's Second Amended Complaint byToshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2172 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Corporation's Answer to Circuit City's Second Amended Complaint byToshiba Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2171 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s Answer to Circuit City's Second Amended Complaint byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2170 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Peter Kravitz's, as Trustee for the RSH Liquidating Trust, First Amended Complaint) bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2169 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Answer to Peter Kravitz's, as Trustee for the RSH Liquidating Trust, First Amended Complaint) bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2168 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Alfred H. Siegel's, as Trustee for The Circuit City Stores, Inc. Liquidating Trust, Second Amended Complaint) bySamsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2167 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Answer to Alfred H. Siegel's, as Trustee for the Circuit City Stores, Inc. Liquidating Trust, Second Amended Complaint) bySamsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2166 Order, signed 1/6/17, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2100 Stipulation Regarding Samsung's Responses to HP's First Set of Discovery Requests.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
December 30, 2016 Filing 2165 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2080 Joint MOTION to Strike #2027 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2023 Answer to Complaint, #2031 Answer to Complaint, #2028 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2071 Answer to Complaint, #2018 Answer to Complaint, #2013 Answer to Complaint, #2011 A / Declaration of Robert J. Pfister in Further Support of Trustees' Joint Motion to Strike; Exhibit A filed byPeter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Related document(s) #2080 ) (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
December 30, 2016 Filing 2164 REPLY (re #2080 Joint MOTION to Strike #2027 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2023 Answer to Complaint, #2031 Answer to Complaint, #2028 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2071 Answer to Complaint, #2018 Answer to Complaint, #2013 Answer to Complaint, #2011 A ) / Reply in Further Support of Trustees' Joint Motion to Strike filed byPeter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2163 Order, signed 12/28/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2054 Discovery Letter Brief To Compel Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea, Corp., Depositions.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 27, 2016 Filing 2162 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #2080 Joint MOTION to Strike #2027 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2023 Answer to Complaint, #2031 Answer to Complaint, #2028 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2071 Answer to Complaint, #2018 Answer to Complaint, #2013 Answer to Complaint, #2011 A. Motion Hearing previously set for 1/19/2017 Continued to 1/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
December 27, 2016 Filing 2161 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 2162 . *** CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #2080 Joint MOTION to Strike #2027 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2023 Answer to Complaint, #2031 Answer to Complaint, #2028 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2071 Answer to Complaint, #2018 Answer to Complaint, #2013 Answer to Complaint, #2011 A. Motion Hearing previously set for 1/19/2017 Continued to 1/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016) Modified on 12/27/2016 (cl, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2016 Filing 2160 NOTICE by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P. re #2149 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dkt. 2036-5, #2 Exhibit Dkt. 2036-7, #3 Exhibit Dkt. 2053-4)(Tuck, Andrew) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
December 23, 2016 Filing 2159 AMENDED COMPLAINT / First Amended Complaint for Damages against Koninklijke Philips N.V., Lite-On It Corporation, Lite-On Sales & Distribution Inc., Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony NEC Optiarc Inc., Sony Optiarc America, Inc., Sony Optiarc, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. Filed byPeter Kravitz. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
December 23, 2016 Filing 2158 AMENDED COMPLAINT / Second Amended Complaint for Damages against Koninklijke Philips N.V., Lite-On It Corporation, Lite-On Sales & Distribution Inc., Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony NEC Optiarc Inc., Sony Optiarc America, Inc., Sony Optiarc, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. Filed byAlfred H. Siegel. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
December 23, 2016 Filing 2157 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2080 Joint MOTION to Strike #2027 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2023 Answer to Complaint, #2031 Answer to Complaint, #2028 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2071 Answer to Complaint, #2018 Answer to Complaint, #2013 Answer to Complaint, #2011 A ) / Defendant's Joint Memorandum in Opposition to Trustees' Joint Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2156 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting (2034) Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; granting (2068) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:10-md-02143-RS; granting (42) Motion to Amend/Correct ; in case 3:15-cv-03248-RS; granting (27) Motion to Amend/Correct ; in case 3:15-cv-06325-RS.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
December 23, 2016 Filing 2155 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Amended Complaint filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Ganske, Rodney) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
December 22, 2016 Filing 2154 CLERK'S NOTICE THE MOTION SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON DECEMBER 29, 2016 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 21, 2016 Filing 2153 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Bertolli as Counsel for Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation, and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. (Bertolli, Andrew) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 21, 2016 Filing 2152 Proposed Order re #2054 Discovery Letter Brief by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Moon, Micah) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 21, 2016 Filing 2151 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ingram Micro Inc identifying Corporate Parent GCL Investment Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate HNA Group, Other Affiliate Tianjin Tianhai Investment Co., Ltd. for Ingram Micro Inc. (Plaintiff Ingram Micro Inc.s Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2150 Order, signed 12/21/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2134 Stipulation Re: Certain Ingram Micro, Synnex Corp., and Panasonic Discovery Requests.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2149 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero regarding #2036 and #2053 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. Dell shall file documents in the public record consistent with this Order no later than December 27, 2016.. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2148 Order, signed as modified on 12/20/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2044 Discovery Letter Brief to Compel Production of Documents from Verizon.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 20, 2016 Filing 2147 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO SONY DEFENDANT FAMILY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/19/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 20, 2016 Filing 2146 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PANANSONIC DEFENDANT FAMILY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/19/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 20, 2016 Filing 2145 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT NEC CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/19/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 20, 2016 Filing 2144 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO HLDS, HITACHI, AND LG DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/19/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2143 ORDER, signed 12/19/16, by Chief Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part #2116 Discovery Letter Brief to Compel the Production of Settlement Agreements. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 2142 Answer to Amended Complaint Answer to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Class Action Complaint byPioneer Corporation, Pioneer Electronics (USA) Inc., Pioneer High Fidelity Taiwan Co., Ltd., Pioneer North America, Inc.. (Enson, Eric) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 2141 ANSWER to Complaint Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Class Action Complaint byBenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation. (Kaas, Lisa) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 2140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James M. Pearl, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of Answer to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Class Action Complaint, #4***UNDER SEAL*** Unredacted version of Answer to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Class Action Complaint)(Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 12/19/2016) Modified on 12/20/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2016 Filing 2139 Answer to Amended Complaint Answer to the Sixth Amended Indirect Purchaser Class Action Complaint byTeac America, Inc., Teac Corporation. (Wayne, Natalie) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 2138 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation's Answer to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Class Action Complaint byToshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 2137 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation's Answer to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Class Action Complaint byToshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 2136 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Corporation's Answer to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Class Action Complaint byToshiba Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 2135 Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of #2097 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byToshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 2134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Regarding Certain Ingram Micro, Synnex Corporation, and Panasonic Discovery Requests) filed by Ingram Micro Inc, Synnex Corporation. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2133 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #1994 FINAL APPROVAL OF INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS SETTLEMENTS WITH PANASONIC, NEC, SONY AND HLDS DEFENDANT FAMILIES, GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES, EXPENSES AND SERVICE AWARDS, AND OVERRULING OBJECTIONS AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 2132 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Hearing re: Motion to Compel Quanta's Amended Interrogatory Responses #2110 held on 12/19/2016. Motion Granted. FTR Time FTR 11:06-11:11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 2131 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 12/16/16, before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 9:35 - 9:44. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #2115 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2017. (Related documents(s) #2115 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2130 Order, signed 12/19/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2114 Stipulation Regarding Various Parties' Requests for Admission.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2129 Order, signed 12/19/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2113 Stipulation Regarding HLDS-Related Court Filings.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2128 Order, signed 12/19/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2112 Stipulation Regarding Foreign Investigation Documents.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2127 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2104 Stipulation Regarding HLDS' Responses to HP's First Set of Discovery Requests.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2126 Order, signed 12/19/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2103 Stipulation Regarding Supplemental Responses of Ingram Micro and Synnex Corp., to the Benq Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2125 Order, signed 12/19/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2102 Stipulation - Amended Order Regarding Deposition of Former HP Inc., Employee and Regarding HP Inc. Interrogatory Responses.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2124 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting re #2106 Acer's responses to Samsung's discovery.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2123 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting re #2098 HP's responses to Samsung's discovery.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2122 Declaration of Natalie F. Wayne in Support of #2121 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Motion to Compel Defendants' Amended Interrogatory Responses filed byTeac America, Inc., Teac Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Transcript of Proceedings)(Related document(s) #2121 ) (Wayne, Natalie) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2121 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Motion to Compel Defendants' Amended Interrogatory Responses filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 SEALED Joint Letter Brief re Motion to Compel Defendants' Amended Interrogatory Responses, #3 REDACTED Joint Letter Brief re Motion to Compel Defendants' Amended Interrogatory Responses, #4 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2120 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/16/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2119 Declaration of Andrew J. Tuck in Support of #2116 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents Regarding Settlement Agreements filed byDell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #2116 ) (Tuck, Andrew) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2118 Declaration of James M. Pearl in Support of #2116 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents Regarding Settlement Agreements filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #2116 ) (Pearl, James) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2117 Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of #2116 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents Regarding Settlement Agreements filed byToshiba Corporation. (Related document(s) #2116 ) (McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2116 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Requests for Production of Documents Regarding Settlement Agreements filed by Toshiba Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2115 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/16/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Toshiba Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2114 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Various Parties' Requests for Admission filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Tuck, Andrew) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding HLDS-Related Court Filings filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Tuck, Andrew) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2112 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Foreign Investigation Documents filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Tuck, Andrew) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND THE PLDS DEFENDANTS PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Lite-On It Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc.. (Werbel, Evan) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2110 Discovery Letter Brief re Motion to Compel Quanta Amended Interrogatory Responses filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2109 Order, signed 12/16/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2101 Stipulation Regarding Defendant Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corp.'s Responses to Plaintiff's Dell, Inc., Dell Products LP and HP Inc.'s 12/2/16 Discovery(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2108 Order, signed 12/16/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2099 Stipulation Regarding Dell's Supplemental Responses to Toshiba's First Set of Interrogatories.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2107 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/16/2016 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2106 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Acer's Responses to Samsung's Discovery filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Pearl, James) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2105 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Hearing held re: Joint Letter [dkt 2054] on 12/16/2016. Defendant to prepare Order.FTR Time FTR 9:35-9:44. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2016) Modified on 12/19/2016: Matter transcribed by Tara Bauer (ECHO Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2016 Filing 2104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding HLDS' Responses to HP's First Set of Discovery Requests filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2103 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Responses of Ingram Micro Inc. and Synnex Corporation to BenQ Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by BenQ America Corp., BenQ Corporation. (Kaas, Lisa) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2102 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deposition of Former HP Inc. Employee and Regarding HP Inc. Interrogatory Responses filed by LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Eimer, Nathan) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 2101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning TSSTK's Discovery Responses filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Tuck, Andrew) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Samsung's Responses to HP's First Set of Discovery Requests filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2099 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dell's Supplemental Responses to Toshiba Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Toshiba Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2098 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding HP's Responses to Samsung's Discovery filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Pearl, James) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2097 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Update re Joint Letter Brief re Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corp. Depositions filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 SEALED Supplemental Statement, #3 REDACTED Supplemental Statement, #4 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett, #5 SEALED Exhibit A)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2096 ORDER GRANTING re #2094 Letter filed by Hewlett-Packard Company for Matthew McBurney to appear by phone on 12/16/16 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/15/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2095 Letter Update re #2038 Joint Letter. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2094 Letter from Matthew J. McBurney Requesting Leave to Appear Telephonically. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2093 Order, signed 12/14/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2085 Stipulation Regarding Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Quanta Storage.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 14, 2016 Filing 2092 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2034 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #1780 Amended Complaint,, / Trustees' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof / Declaration of Robert J. Pfister in Support of Trustees' Joint Motion to Amend filed byPeter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit J, #4 Exhibit K, #5 Exhibit L, #6 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) #2034 ) (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 14, 2016 Filing 2091 REPLY (re #2034 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #1780 Amended Complaint,, / Trustees' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) / Reply in Further Support of Trustees' Joint Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints filed byPeter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2090 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice HLDS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/14/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2089 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding HP and Sony Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/14/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 13, 2016 Filing 2088 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Chen as counsel for Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc., and Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., f/k/a eMachines, Inc. (Chen, Jerry) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 13, 2016 Filing 2087 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Christopher Jones as counsel for Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc., and Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc., f/k/a eMachines, Inc. (Jones, Kevin) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 13, 2016 Filing 2086 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice-HLDS filed by State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs. (Brady, Liz) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 12, 2016 Filing 2085 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Quanta Storage Inc. filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2084 Order, signed 12/12/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2079 Stipulation Regarding Deposition of Toshiba Corp., and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corp.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2083 Order, signed 12/12/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2078 Stipulation Regarding Deposition of Dae Soo (Dante) Kim.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2082 Order, signed 12/12/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2076 Stipulation for Deadlines REGARDING KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., LITE-ON, IT CORPORATION, PHILIPS & LITE-ONDIGITAL SOLUTIONS CORPORATION,AND PHILIPS & LITE-ON DIGITALSOLUTIONS U.S.A., INC.S 30(b)(6)WITNESS DEPOSITIONS ANDSUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TOREQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 9, 2016 Filing 2081 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2080 Joint MOTION to Strike #2027 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2023 Answer to Complaint, #2031 Answer to Complaint, #2028 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2071 Answer to Complaint, #2018 Answer to Complaint, #2013 Answer to Complaint, #2011 A / Declaration of Robert J. Pfister in Support of Trustees' Joint Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses filed byPeter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #2080 ) (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 9, 2016 Filing 2080 Joint MOTION to Strike #2027 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2023 Answer to Complaint, #2031 Answer to Complaint, #2028 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2071 Answer to Complaint, #2018 Answer to Complaint, #2013 Answer to Complaint, #2011 Answer to Complaint, #2017 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2019 Answer to Complaint, #2029 Answer to Complaint, #2015 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2020 Answer to Complaint, #2024 Answer to Complaint, #2026 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2070 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2014 Answer to Complaint, #2016 Answer to Amended Complaint, #2012 Answer to Complaint, #2030 Answer to Complaint / Trustees' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Peter Kravitz, Alfred H. Siegel. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 12/23/2016. Replies due by 12/30/2016. (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 9, 2016 Filing 2079 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deposition of Toshiba Corp. and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corp. filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 9, 2016 Filing 2078 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deposition of Dae Soo (Dante) Kim filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Tuck, Andrew) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 9, 2016 Filing 2077 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding HP and Sony Discovery filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 9, 2016 Filing 2076 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DEADLINES REGARDING KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., LITE-ON IT CORPORATION, PHILIPS & LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, AND PHILIPS & LITE-ON DIGITAL SOLUTIONS U.S.A., INC.S 30(b)(6) WITNESS DEPOSITIONS AND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by Ingram Micro Inc, Synnex Corporation. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 8, 2016 Filing 2075 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Richard Seeborg: Motion Hearing held on 12/8/2016. Matter taken under submission. Court to issue an order re #1963 MOTION for Attorney Fees, Expenses, and Service Awards #1994 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Panasonic, NEC, Sony and HLDS Defendant Families.Total Time in Court 30 minutes. Court Reporter:Pam Batalo.Plaintiff Attorney: Jeff Friedman, Shana ScarlettDefendant Attorney: Christopher James, Michelle Visser, Robert Pringle, Nathan Eimer, George Mastoris This is a text only Minute Entry (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/8/2016)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2074 STIPULATION AND ORDER (2045 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) re: Deadlines for Ingram Micro. Inc's and Synnex Corp.'s Final Production of Documents and Supplemental Responses to Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2073 Order, signed 12/8/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2066 Stipulation for Deadlines re: NEC's 30(b)(6) Witness Deposition and Supplemental Responses to Requests for Production of Documents.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2072 Order, signed 12/7/16, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2063 Stipulation Regarding Depositions of Former HP Employees.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 8, 2016 Filing 2071 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation's Answer to Radio Shack's Complaint byToshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 8, 2016 Filing 2070 Answer to Amended Complaint Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation's Answer to Circuit City's First Amended Complaint byToshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 7, 2016 Filing 2069 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #2034 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #1780 Amended Complaint,, / Trustees' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) [JOINT OPPOSITION] filed bySony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Optiarc America, Inc., Sony Optiarc, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kaitlyn Murphy, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 7, 2016 Filing 2068 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints filed by Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Optiarc America, Inc., Sony Optiarc, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kaitlyn Murphy, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 7, 2016 Filing 2067 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Pfister Notice of Appearance and Association of Counsel (Pfister, Robert) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 7, 2016 Filing 2066 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER NEC Corporation's and Plaintiffs Ingram Micro Inc.'s and Synnex Corp.'s Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Deadlines Regarding NEC Corporation's 30(b)(6) Witness Deposition and Supplemental Responses to Requests for Production of Documents filed by NEC Corporation. (Pringle, Robert) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 7, 2016 Filing 2065 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Discovery Hearing re: Updated Joint Letter Brief re: Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corp. Depositions set for 12/16/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 7, 2016 Filing 2064 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Walter James on behalf of Hitachi, Ltd. (James, Christopher) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 7, 2016 Filing 2063 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Depositions of Former HP Employees filed by LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Hamann, Jacob) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 6, 2016 Filing 2062 NOTICE of Change of Address by Beatrice B. Nguyen (Nguyen, Beatrice) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
December 5, 2016 Filing 2061 Declaration of Brendan A. McShane in Support of #2053 Dell Inc.'s and Dell Products L.P.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Updated] filed byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McShane, Brendan) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
December 5, 2016 Filing 2060 Declaration of James M. Pearl in Support of #2053 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #2053 ) (Pearl, James) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
November 30, 2016 Filing 2059 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/21/16, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #2058 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2017. (Related documents(s) #2058 ) (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 30, 2016 Filing 2058 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/21/2016 before Hon. Richard Seeborg by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Nardi, Marissa) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2057 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Re (#77 in 3:13-cv-01877-RS) Stipulation filed by State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/30/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2056 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2055 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Lucarelli. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 29, 2016 Filing 2055 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice (Andrew Lucarelli) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10965266.) filed by Koninklijke Philips N.V., Lite-On It Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc.. (Lucarelli, Andrew) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 29, 2016 Filing 2054 Discovery Letter from Joint Defendants (Updated). (Ganske, Rodney) (Filed on 11/29/2016) Modified on 12/7/2016 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2016 Filing 2053 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Updated Joint Letter Brief, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Updated Joint Letter Brief)(Ganske, Rodney) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 28, 2016