United States of America et al v. JMR Construction Corp. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and Blocka Construction, Inc.
Defendant: JMR Construction Corp. and Great American Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv00024
Filed: January 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/14/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT and PRETRIAL ORDER. A further case management conference is set for 09/28/2012 at 1:30 pm. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 07/02/2012. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Attorney Carl Patrick Stoll terminated. George R. Gore substituted as attorney of record in place of C. Patrick Stoll. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/8/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION. Mediation deadline currently set for 7/21/11, continued 30 days pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/19/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING re 15 Proposed Order filed by JMR Construction Corp., To Appear by Telephone at the Case Management Conference. Counsel shall be on phone standby beginning at 1:30 PM and await the Court's call. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/18/11.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. JMR Construction Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blocka Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick James Northrop
Represented By: William Cornelius Last, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMR Construction Corp.
Represented By: Carl Patrick Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Carl Patrick Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?