Deane v. Fastenal Company
Plaintiff: Kristopher Deane
Defendant: Fastenal Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv00042
Filed: January 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING RENEWED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 144 Motion.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER ENTERING TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL AND JUDGMENT AS ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying without prejudice 138 Joint Motion. Renewed Joint Motion for Settlement Approval and Judgmentto be submitted by 11/26/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING ON JOINT MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/14/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDERING FILING OF JOINT MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/15/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. ***Deadlines terminated. 132 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Michael Romano, Lisa Johnson, Kristopher Deane, Fastenal Company. Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2013 is CONTINUED to 7/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Court VACATES the Order to Show Cause Hearing set 6/17/2013. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/11/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE TIMELY JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/17/2013 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 6/10/2013.The Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday 6/17/13 at 2:00pm. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/3/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/15/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/8/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Granting 94 re MOTION to Decertify Collective Action filed by Fastenal Company. Case Management Conference is set for Monday, 4/1/2013 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 5. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/25/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DECERTIFY PLAINTIFF'S CONDITIONALLY CERTIFIED COLLECTIVE ACTION TO OCTOBER 2, 2012. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/29/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE SUBMITTED CONSENT-TO-JOIN FORMS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/8/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER REGARDING PERSONAL APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. The personal appearance of counsel to meet and confer on 5/1/12 at the Federal Courthouse is no longer required. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/30/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REQUIRING PERSONAL APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/27/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF CONTACT INFORMATION FOR FLSA CLASS MEMBERS [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] re 63 Proposed Order filed by Kristopher Deane. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/12/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE BRIEFING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION Motions for Class Certification due by 4/27/2012. Responses due by 5/18/2012. Replies due by 6/1/2012.. Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 6/15/2012 10:00 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/15/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER approving recommendation as to form of Opt-in members (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING CONDITIONAL COLLECTIVE ACTION CERTIFICATION; ORDER RE: DISCOVERY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deane v. Fastenal Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Deane
Represented By: Molly Ann DeSario
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Represented By: Hannah R Salassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fastenal Company
Represented By: A. Graig Cleland
Represented By: John George Lee
Represented By: Danielle Ochs-Tillotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?