M.B.L., Inc. v. Nationwide Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: M.B.L., Inc.
Defendant: Nationwide Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv00044
Filed: January 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Compliance Hearing is set for 6/15/2012 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/30/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (JUDGE BEELER, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 DISCOVERY ORDER re 90 Objection To Production by Insured filed by Nationwide Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/16/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 PRETRIAL ORDER: Case Management Conference re-set for 4/16/2012 02:00 PM. Dispositive Motions heard by 12/11/2012. Case Management Conference re-set for 4/16/2012 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 2/11/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rog ers. Jury Trial set for 2/11/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/14/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART re 95 Letter filed by M.B.L., Inc., for Raymond Hamrick and/or Joseph Anderson to appear via Court Call. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/6/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012) Modified on 2/6/2012 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 DISCOVERY ORDER re 78 Letter filed by M.B.L., Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/22/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE ON DISCOVERY HEARING. Telephonic Discovery Hearing re-set for 12/21/2011 AT 10:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/15/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING DATE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/5/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF/COUNTER DEFENDANT MBL, INC'S MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE INDEMNITY COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/13/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DISCOVERY ORDER re 46 Letter Brief, filed by M.B.L., Inc., Nationwide Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/1/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.B.L., Inc. v. Nationwide Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.B.L., Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Greene
Represented By: William Joseph Anderson
Represented By: Alpheus Raymond Hamrick, III
Represented By: Kenneth Adrian Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Indemnity Company
Represented By: Bryan M. Barber
Represented By: Valarie Hastings Jonas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?