Walsh v. Kindred Healthcare, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs, Smith Ranch Care Center, Arlene Bettencourt and Harry Harrison
Defendant: Golden Gate Healthcare Center, Hacienda Care Center, Nineteenth Avenue Healthcare Center, Orange Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC, Santa Cruz Healthcare Center, Smith Ranch Care Center, LLC, Valley Gardens Healthcare & Rehabilitation Center, Victorian Healthcare Center, Care Center of Rossmoor, Care Center of Rossmoor, LLC, Fifth Avenue Health Care Center, Canyonwood Nursing and Rehab Center, Alta Vista Healthcare & Wellness Centre, Bay View Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Kindred Healthcare, Inc., Kindred Healthcare Operating, Inc., California Nursing Centers, L.L.C., Kindred Nursing Centers West L.L.C., Riverside Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC and Hillhaven-MSC Partnership
Case Number: 3:2011cv00050
Filed: January 5, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING 147 STIPULATED INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 16, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER re Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 6, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Requiring Supplemental Submissions on Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 7, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, 129 Joint Motion to Hear Motion for Preliminary Approval 128 on Shortened Time; VACATING Hearing on 128 Motion for Preliminary Approval; and ORDERING Supplemental Briefing by August 23, 2013. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 15, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT. Joint status report due by 5/21/2013.Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 05/15/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING 121 STIPULATION to Continue Stay of Action Until March 18, 2013. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/26/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING 117 STIPULATION to Continue Stay of Action to Permit Parties to Attend Mediation Until January 31, 2013. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/2/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING 114 STIPULATION for 90-Day Stay of Action to Permit Parties to Attend Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/24/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING 111 STIPULATION Lifting Stay on Alter Ego Discovery and Jurisdictional Challenges under FRCP Rule 12(b)(2). Responses due by 12/6/2012. Replies due by 12/20/2012. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/12/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 100 STIPULATION Regarding Alter Ego Discovery and Jurisdictional Challenges Under FRCP 12(B)(2). Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/31/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING 95 STIPULATION regarding additional plaintiffs and amendment to class definition. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/24/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER REGARDING ROSSMOOR'S MOTION TO DISMISS.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/26/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING 83 Stipulation TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDNAT CARE CENTER OF ROSSMORR,LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS CONSUMER LEGAL REMEDIES ACT CAUSE OF ACTION IN SECOND AMENDED COMLAINT PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)6); CIVIL L.R.6-2, 7-12. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/23/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011) Modified on 12/23/2011 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING 71 REGARDING ALTER EGO DISCOVERY AND PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/14/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 08/30/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 39 Motion to Dismiss; AND GRANTING 42 Motion to Dismiss. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 9, 2011. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 33 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference to June 24, 2011 and Set Briefing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Civil L.R. 6-2, 7-12. Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2011. Case Mana gement Conference set for 7/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/24/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Kindred Healthcare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate Healthcare Center
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Represented By: Brad W. Seiling
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hacienda Care Center
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nineteenth Avenue Healthcare Center
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange Healthcare and Wellness Centre, LLC
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Cruz Healthcare Center
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Ranch Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Gardens Healthcare & Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victorian Healthcare Center
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center of Rossmoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Center of Rossmoor, LLC
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Avenue Health Care Center
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyonwood Nursing and Rehab Center
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alta Vista Healthcare & Wellness Centre
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay View Nursing and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindred Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindred Healthcare Operating, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Represented By: Jessica J Slusser
Represented By: David Shapiro
Represented By: Brad W. Seiling
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Represented By: Christian Edward Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Nursing Centers, L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindred Nursing Centers West L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillhaven-MSC Partnership
Represented By: Andrew Hardenbrook Struve
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs
Represented By: Lexi Joy Hazam, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Ranch Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Bettencourt
Represented By: Sarah Colby
Represented By: Lexi Joy Hazam, Esq.
Represented By: Robert Jay Nelson
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Stebner
Represented By: Michael D Thamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Harrison
Represented By: Sarah Colby
Represented By: Lexi Joy Hazam, Esq.
Represented By: Robert Jay Nelson
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Stebner
Represented By: Michael D Thamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?