Reed et al v. Wells Fargo Bank et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin F. Reed, Sr. and Irma M. Reed
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank and NDEx West, LLC.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00194
Filed: January 13, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/21/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER to File Updated Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/03/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause. Status Report due 10/2/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/18/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/12/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/05/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER to Submit Status Report by 8/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/13/13. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Vacating Dates. Status Report due by 8/9/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/09/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference. Status report due by June 28, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/04/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER To Submit Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/15/13. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER to Submit Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/05/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 109 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/7/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 9/14/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Regarding Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/07/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER re 96 Letter Brief and Setting Phone Conference. Telephone Conference set for 9/7/2012 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/31/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND STANDING ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE DONNA M. RYU. Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/25/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/10/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Setting Hearing on Discovery Dispute. Discovery Hearing set for 7/26/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/6/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/3/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT PROPOSED DATES. Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/18/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 62 Motion to Dismiss filed by NDEx West, LLC.; DENYING 37 Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction filed by Wells Fargo Bank; and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 64 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank. 73 Motion to Appear by Telephone Terminated As Moot. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 7, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/16/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER OF ADMONISHMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DISCHARGING THIRD ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2012. Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Responses due by 10/31/2011. Replies due by 11/7/2011. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 THIRD ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/20/2011.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 34 AND 42 Motion to Dismiss and Joinder; terminating as moot 44 MOTION to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 11, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 9/16/2011.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/9/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 3/31/2011. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/9/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed et al v. Wells Fargo Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin F. Reed, Sr.
Represented By: Ralph Albert Kerstetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma M. Reed
Represented By: Ralph Albert Kerstetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Viddell Lee Heard, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Alan Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEx West, LLC.
Represented By: Deepika Singh Saluja
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?