Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund et al v. Fitzpatrick Chevrolet Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, James H. Beno, Bill Brunelli, Stephen J. Mack, Chris Christophersen, Don Crosatto, Mark Hollibush, Jon Roselle, Doug Cornford and James V. Canterbury
Defendant: Fitzpatrick Chevrolet Inc. and Fitzpatrick Family LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00195
Filed: January 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1451
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, Order by Hon. William Alsup denying 35 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE REGARDING JUNE 16 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 16, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 29 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund et al v. Fitzpatrick Chevrolet Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Michelle Lee Sicula
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Beno
Represented By: Michelle Lee Sicula
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Brunelli
Represented By: Michelle Lee Sicula
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Mack
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Michelle Lee Sicula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Christophersen
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Michelle Lee Sicula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Crosatto
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Michelle Lee Sicula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hollibush
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Michelle Lee Sicula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Roselle
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Michelle Lee Sicula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Cornford
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Michelle Lee Sicula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James V. Canterbury
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Michelle Lee Sicula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitzpatrick Chevrolet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitzpatrick Family LLC
Represented By: Stephen Alan McKae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?