Bradley et al v. Continental Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Richard L. Bradley and West Coast Scrap Producers, Inc.
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv00292
Filed: January 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley et al v. Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Bradley
Represented By: Arthur David Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Coast Scrap Producers, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur David Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert A. Binion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?