Health Care Service Corporation v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Health Care Service Corporation
Defendant: Inc Pfizer, Mitchell Gandelman, Mark Brown, Rick Burch, Jake Friedman, Matthew Lustig and Pharmacia & Upjohn, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00310
Filed: January 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/3/2012. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting (43) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:11-cv-00310-CRB; granting (3608) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:05-md-01699-CRB. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER extending time fo file motion to dismiss re (38 in 3:11-cv-00310-CRB) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to File Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Inc Pfizer, (3601 in 3: 05-md-01699-CRB) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to File Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Pfizer Inc.. Motion to Dismiss due by 5/14/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/1/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER regarding briefing schedule and page limits re (26 in 3:11-cv-00310-CRB) Stipulation filed by Inc Pfizer, (3567 in 3:05-md-01699-CRB) Stipulation filed by Pfizer Inc. Sur reply due 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/21/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Health Care Service Corporation v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc Pfizer
Represented By: Katherine Armstrong
Represented By: John H Beisner
Represented By: Jessica Miller
Represented By: Nicholas H Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Gandelman
Represented By: Nicholas H Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brown
Represented By: Nicholas H Patton
Represented By: John H Beisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Burch
Represented By: Nicholas H Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Friedman
Represented By: Nicholas H Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lustig
Represented By: Nicholas H Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Armstrong
Represented By: John H Beisner
Represented By: Nicholas H Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Care Service Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Walsh Yung
Represented By: John Barret Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?