Poquez v. Suncor Holdings - COPII LLC et al
Plaintiff: Evelyn Poquez
Defendant: GSM Partners LLC, Tower Energy Group and Suncor Holdings - COPII LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00328
Filed: January 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER Substituting Freedman & Taitelman in place of Wendel Rosen Black & Dean for defendant Tower Energy Group. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/20/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY RE: 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by GSM Partners LLC, Suncor Holdings - COPII LLC (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendant Tower Energy Groups time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint to 3/24/11. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/10/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER Defendant Tower Energy Group has to 3/10/11 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/25/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poquez v. Suncor Holdings - COPII LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSM Partners LLC
Represented By: Bryan Joel Freedman
Represented By: Bradley Howard Kreshek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower Energy Group
Represented By: Matthew F. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncor Holdings - COPII LLC
Represented By: Bradley Howard Kreshek
Represented By: Bryan Joel Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Poquez
Represented By: Ronald D. Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?