Brik v. Wells Fargo
Plaintiff: Alexander V. Brik
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Case Number: 3:2011cv00347
Filed: January 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/18/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/11/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/1/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011) Modified on 8/1/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISCHARGING OSC, Motions terminated: 8 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Alexander V. Brik. Case Management Statement due by 8/11/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/20/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/16/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/7/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/5/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/2/2011 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5/19/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/29/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brik v. Wells Fargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander V. Brik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?