Hendricks v. AT&T Mobility LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff: Patrick Hendricks
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00409
Filed: January 27, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2012 66 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re 65 . (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 5, 2012 65 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 62 Notice of Appeal filed by Patrick Hendricks. Appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
December 14, 2011 64 USCA Case Number 11-17852 USCA for the Ninth Circuit for 62 Notice of Appeal filed by Patrick Hendricks. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
November 28, 2011 63 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 62 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Notification Form)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2011: # 2 docket sheet) (ys, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2011 62 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 61 Order on Motion to Compel by Patrick Hendricks. Filing fee $ 455, receipt #34611067347. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011) Modified on 12/16/2011 - USCA Case Number 11-17852 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2011 61 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 35 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Case. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 24, 2011 60 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (A Parasharami) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 21, 2011 59 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2011 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 10/21/2011) re 35 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and To Stay Case filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/21/2011)
October 20, 2011 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Archis Parasharami) ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066052.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 20, 2011 57 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 53 Motion for Leave to File response to objection to reply evidence (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 19, 2011 56 ERRATA re 53 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Objections to Declaration of Jan Mendel CORRECTED DECLARATION OF JAN MENDEL (WITH EXHIBITS) by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Ranlett, Kevin) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 19, 2011 55 Featured Case STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION in support of 35 Motion to Compel and to Stay pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Ranlett, Kevin) (Filed on 10/19/2011) Modified on 10/20/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2011 54 RESPONSE (re 51 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Addressing Judicial Estoppel ) Non-Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Addressing Judicial Estoppel, and Motion for Leave to File Response filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Supplement Response to Supplemental Brief Addressing Judicial Estoppel, # 3 Declaration of Kevin S. Ranlett)(Ranlett, Kevin) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 19, 2011 53 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Objections to Declaration of Jan Mendel filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Supplement Response to Objections to Declaration of Jan Mendel, # 3 Declaration of Jan Mendel (Supplemental), # 4 Declaration of Kevin S. Ranlett)(Ranlett, Kevin) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 14, 2011 52 Proposed Order re 51 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Addressing Judicial Estoppel by Patrick Hendricks. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 51 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Addressing Judicial Estoppel filed by Patrick Hendricks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief Addressing Judicial Estoppel, # 2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice)(Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 3, 2011 50 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lawrence Timothy Fisher Notice of Change of Firm Address and Telephone Number (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 19, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 35 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and To Stay Case. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 19, 2011 49 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 45 Motion for Adjustment of Hearing Date (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 16, 2011 48 OBJECTIONS to re 42 Reply to Opposition/Response, L.R. 7-3(d) by Patrick Hendricks. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 47 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (A. J. Pincus) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 15, 2011 46 Proposed Order re 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Andrew J. Pincus) ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064544.) by AT&T Mobility LLC. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
September 14, 2011 45 Amended MOTION for Hearing (Adminstrative Relief) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Falk, Donald) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 14, 2011 44 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** MOTION for Hearing Administrative Relief: Request for Adjustment of Hearing Date filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Ranlett, # 2 Proposed Order)(Falk, Donald) (Filed on 9/14/2011) Modified on 9/15/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2011 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Andrew J. Pincus) ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064544.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 9, 2011 42 REPLY (re 35 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and To Stay Case ) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Wilder, # 2 Declaration of Mendel, # 3 Declaration of Ranlett, # 4 Exhibit 1-16, # 5 Exhibit 17-39, # 6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cornehl, Lisa) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (K Ranlett) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 1, 2011 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Kevin Rainlett) ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064221.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 24, 2011 39 Featured Case ORDER for extension of time to file reply re 38 Stipulation filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Set/Reset Deadlines 35 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and To Stay Case. ATTM's Reply due by 9/9/2011. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/24/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 23, 2011 38 STIPULATION and Proposed Order For Extension of Time To File Reply by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Cornehl, Lisa) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 8, 2011 37 RESPONSE (re 35 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and To Stay Case ) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to AT&T Mobility LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Case filed byPatrick Hendricks. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott A. Bursor, # 2 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher, # 3 Declaration of Plaintiff Patrick Hendricks, # 4 Declaration of Colin B. Weir)(Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
July 13, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated 7/21/11 (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 7, 2011 Set Deadlines as to 35 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and To Stay Case. Responses due by 8/8/2011. Replies due by 8/29/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Mobility LLC re 35 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and To Stay Case (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 35 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and To Stay Case filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/21/2011. Replies due by 7/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Lilian L. Chan, # 2 Affidavit Chenell Cummings (Part 1 of 2), # 3 Affidavit Chenell Cummings (Part 2 of 2), # 4 Affidavit Adam Gill, # 5 Affidavit Senthil Kumar, # 6 Affidavit Romi Manchanda, # 7 Affidavit Theodore Weiman, # 8 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against AT&T Mobility LLC. Filed byPatrick Hendricks. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 1, 2011 33 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/27/2011 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 6/1/2011). Motion Hearing set for 9/23/11 at 10:00 am. (Court Reporter - Not Reported.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/1/2011) Modified on 6/2/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2011 32 Featured Case ORDER DENYING re 31 Stipulation filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/23/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 23, 2011 31 STIPULATION To Vacate Case Management Conference by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 11, 2011 30 STATUS REPORT Joint by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
March 25, 2011 29 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/25/2011 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 3/25/2011) re 25 MOTION to Stay Unopposed filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel filed by Patrick Hendricks. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/25/2011)
March 11, 2011 28 REPLY (re 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel ) filed byPatrick Hendricks. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 4, 2011 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Patrick Hendricks. AT&T Mobility, LLC served on 2/8/11. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/4/2011) Modified on 3/7/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2011 26 RESPONSE (re 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel ) Opposition filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit In Support Of Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC'S Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Appoint Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cornehl, Lisa) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 1, 2011 25 MOTION to Stay Unopposed filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Lisa W. Cornehl In Support Of Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC'S Motion To Stay, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cornehl, Lisa) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 23, 2011 24 Featured Case CORRECT ORDER to 21 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (A. Davis)(be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 22, 2011 23 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (B. L. Davis) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 22, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (D. R. Lever) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 22, 2011 21 Featured Case *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (A. Davis) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011) Modified on 2/23/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2011 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Standing Order by Patrick Hendricks. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/17/2011) Modified on 2/18/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2011 19 Proposed Order re 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel by Patrick Hendricks. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 17, 2011 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel filed by Patrick Hendricks. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 16, 2011 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Mobility LLC re 16 Notice of Appearance of John Nadolenco (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 16, 2011 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John Nadolenco for AT&T Mobility LLC (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 16, 2011 12 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 15, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/15/11. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 14, 2011 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Barry L. Davis) ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611056374.) filed by Patrick Hendricks. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Daniel R. Lever) ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611056372.) filed by Patrick Hendricks. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Aaron P. Davis) ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611056371.) filed by Patrick Hendricks. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 ***EMC Deadlines terminated. 10 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 11, 2011 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by AT&T Mobility LLC (Cornehl, Lisa) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 8 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Cornehl, Lisa) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Walgenbach Cornehl (Cornehl, Lisa) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 8, 2011 6 Proposed Order re 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to FRCP 23(g)(3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to FRCP 23(g)(3) by Patrick Hendricks. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 8, 2011 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to FRCP 23(g)(3) filed by Patrick Hendricks. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 8, 2011 4 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Patrick Hendricks.. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 2, 2011 3 CLERKS NOTICE re consent or declination to proceed before magistrate judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
January 27, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; summons issued against AT&T Mobility LLC (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611006357). Filed by Patrick Hendricks. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendricks v. AT&T Mobility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Hendricks
Represented By: Aaron P. Davis
Represented By: Barry L. Davis
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Daniel R. Lever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Lisa Walgenbach Cornehl
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?