Clark et al v. United States Of America et al
Plaintiff: Michael R. Clark and Susan C. Clark
Defendant: United States Of America and Department of the Treasury
Case Number: 3:2011cv00471
Filed: January 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/26/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/6/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Continuing 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Of America. Signed by Judge Seeborg on 07/23/12. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 32 TO EXTEND BRIEFING DEADLINES. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/22/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. United States Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Clark
Represented By: Bryant Whitney Smith
Represented By: Martin Aaron Schainbaum
Represented By: Andrew DePue Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan C. Clark
Represented By: Andrew DePue Allen
Represented By: Martin Aaron Schainbaum
Represented By: Bryant Whitney Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Cynthia Lewis Stier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?