Ottolini v. Bank of America et al
Plaintiff: Jay L. Ottolini
Defendant: Bank of America, BAC Homeloans LP, Recon Trust N A and All Persons Unknow, Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right, Title Estate, Lien, or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiffs' Title, or Any Cloud on Plaintiffs Tite
Case Number: 3:2011cv00477
Filed: February 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 59 Stipulation filed by BAC Homeloans LP, Recon Trust N A, Bank of America, N.A.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 31 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Judge Edward M. Chen's FINAL STANDING ORDER (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER re 14 Order on Motion to Dismiss (with Judge's signature). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/14/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/6/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ottolini v. Bank of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay L. Ottolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Robert Alan Padway
Represented By: Thomas Simmons Lee
Represented By: Deborah Anne Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Homeloans LP
Represented By: Deborah Anne Goldfarb
Represented By: Thomas Simmons Lee
Represented By: Robert Alan Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recon Trust N A
Represented By: Deborah Anne Goldfarb
Represented By: Thomas Simmons Lee
Represented By: Robert Alan Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknow, Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right, Title Estate, Lien, or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiffs' Title, or Any Cloud on Plaintiffs Tite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?