Pragmatus AV, LLC v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Pragmatus AV, LLC alleged that Defendants Facebook, Inc., YouTube, LLC, LinkedIn Corporation and Photobucket.com, INc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 7.730,132, 7,822,813, 7,831,663, all entitled "Storing and Accessing Media Files"

Plaintiff: Pragmatus AV, LLC
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., YouTube, LLC, Linkedin Corporation and Photobucket.com, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00494
Filed: February 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2011 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefani Elise Shanberg , Richard G. Frenkel and Robin L. Brewer on behalf of YouTube, LLC (Shanberg, Stefani) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/2/11. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 2, 2011 Filing 61 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:10-cv-01288. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 2, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Defendants' 38 Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) [Dkt. No. 38] is GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that this civil action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/27/2011. (stas)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 38 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Facebook, Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Photobucket.com, Inc., YouTube, LLC. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/27/2011. (stas)
January 27, 2011 Per LMB Chambers motions set for 1/28/2011 will be decided on papers. (stas)
January 26, 2011 Filing 58 Discovery Plan by Facebook, Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Photobucket.com, Inc., Pragmatus AV, LLC, YouTube, LLC.(Finkelson, David)
January 26, 2011 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a more Definite Statement filed by YouTube, LLC. (Ascarrunz, Veronica)
January 25, 2011 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re 38 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Facebook, Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Photobucket.com, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Scott Cole, # 2 Exhibit 15, # 3 Exhibit 16)(Wilcox, Justin)
January 21, 2011 Filing 55 Memorandum in Opposition re 38 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) Pragmatus' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(a) filed by Pragmatus AV, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Wasserman, Mark)
January 20, 2011 Filing 54 Memorandum in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a more Definite Statement, 30 MOTION to Dismiss, 34 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement Pragmatus' Memorandum in Opposition to YouTube, LLC's, LinkedIn Corporation's, and Photobucket.com, Inc.'s Rule 12(b)(6) Motions to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Pragmatus AV, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wasserman, Mark)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2011 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Discovery due by 5/13/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2011 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice, # 2 Alexandria Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(stas)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting application of Miriam Latorre Quinn to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683018783. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt, # 2 Cover Letter)(stas)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting application of Dan Duncan Davison to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683018783. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(stas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2011: # 2 Cover Letter) (stas, ).
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting application of Heidi Lyn Keefe to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683018704. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(stas)
January 12, 2011 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Patrick Daniel Wilcox on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Wilcox, Justin)
January 11, 2011 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by David Marion Foster on behalf of Photobucket.com, Inc. (Foster, David)
January 11, 2011 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Cole, Scott)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting application of Clement Seth Roberts to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683018745. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt, # 2 Cover Letter)(stas)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting application of Daralyn Jean Durie to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683018745. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt, # 2 Cover Letter)(stas)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting application of Stefani Elise Shanberg to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683018742. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(stas)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting application of Robin Lynn Brewer to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683018742. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(stas)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING Pro hac vice of Larry L. Shatzer; Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 14683018688. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/10/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(tche)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that the January 14, 2011 and January 21, 2011 hearings on defts' motions to dismiss be and are rescheduled to Friday, January 28, 2011 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema so that all motions may be heard at the same time. The Clerk is directed to remove the hearings from the January 14, 2011 and January 21, 2011 dockets. (See order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/10/2011. (stas)
January 10, 2011 Set Deadlines as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2011 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
January 10, 2011 Set Deadlines as to 38 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2011 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
January 7, 2011 Filing 40 Notice of Hearing Date set for 1/28/2011 re 38 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Cole, Scott)
January 7, 2011 Filing 39 Memorandum in Support re 38 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Facebook, Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Photobucket.com, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Facebook Declaration, # 2 LinkedIn Declaration, # 3 YouTube Declaration, # 4 Photobucket Declaration, # 5 Declaration of Scott A. Cole, # 6 Exhibit 1 to the Cole Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 2 to the Cole Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 3 to the Cole Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 4 to the Cole Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 5 to the Cole Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 6 to the Cole Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 7 to the Cole Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 8 to the Cole Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 9 to the Cole Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 10 to the Cole Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 11 to the Cole Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 12 to the Cole Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 13 to the Cole Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 14 to the Cole Declaration)(Cole, Scott)
January 7, 2011 Filing 38 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Facebook, Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Photobucket.com, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott)
January 7, 2011 Filing 37 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Walker, Kimberly)
January 7, 2011 Filing 36 Notice of Hearing Date re 34 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement (Walker, Kimberly)
January 7, 2011 Filing 35 Memorandum in Support re 34 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement filed by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Walker, Kimberly)
January 7, 2011 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement by Photobucket.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Kimberly)
January 6, 2011 Set Deadline as to 30 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2011 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (stas)
January 6, 2011 Set Deadline as to 25 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a more Definite Statement. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2011 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (stas)
January 6, 2011 Filing 33 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by LinkedIn Corporation. (Finkelson, David)
January 6, 2011 Filing 32 Notice of Hearing Date set for January 21, 2011 re 30 MOTION to Dismiss (Finkelson, David)
January 6, 2011 Filing 31 Memorandum in Support re 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Finkelson, David)
January 6, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss by LinkedIn Corporation. (Finkelson, David)
January 6, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by David Evan Finkelson on behalf of LinkedIn Corporation (Finkelson, David)
January 6, 2011 Filing 28 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by YouTube, LLC. (Ascarrunz, Veronica)
January 6, 2011 Filing 27 Request for Hearing by YouTube, LLC re 25 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a more Definite Statement (Ascarrunz, Veronica)
January 6, 2011 Filing 26 Memorandum in Support re 25 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a more Definite Statement filed by YouTube, LLC. (Ascarrunz, Veronica)
January 6, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a more Definite Statement by YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ascarrunz, Veronica)
January 6, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Veronica Susana Ascarrunz on behalf of YouTube, LLC (Ascarrunz, Veronica)
January 6, 2011 Notice of Correction re: 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Pragmatus AV, LLC. The filing user selected the wrong event. Response in Opposition to Motion was selected, and Memorandum in Opposition should have been selected. The docket has been corrected.(stas)
January 5, 2011 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 15 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Pragmatus AV, LLC. (Wasserman, Mark) Modified on 1/6/2011 to correct docket text (stas).
January 5, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Ryan Gary on behalf of Pragmatus AV, LLC (Gary, Brent)
December 23, 2010 Set eset Deadlines as to 15 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2011 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that the Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant Photobucket.com, Inc. shall file its response to the Complaint by January 7, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/22/2010. (tche)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for LinkedIn to move, answer or otherwise respond to Pragmatus's Complaint for Patent Infringement be extended to January 7, 2011. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/22/2010. (tche)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for YouTube, LLC to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Pragmatus's Complaint for Patent Infrigement be extended to January 7, 2011. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/22/2010. (tche)
December 22, 2010 Filing 18 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Facebook, Inc.. (Cole, Scott)
December 22, 2010 Filing 17 Notice of Hearing Date set for 01/14/2011 re 15 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement (Cole, Scott)
December 22, 2010 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re 15 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott A. Cole, # 2 Exhibit A to the Cole Declaration)(Cole, Scott)
December 22, 2010 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott)
December 22, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Allen Cole on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Cole, Scott)
December 22, 2010 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 7 Certificate of Compliance, 1 Complaint, as to YouTube, LLC by Pragmatus AV, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Matthew)
December 22, 2010 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 8 Certificate of Compliance, 1 Complaint, as to Photobucket.com, Inc. by Pragmatus AV, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Matthew)
December 22, 2010 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, 6 Certificate of Compliance as to LinkedIn Corporation by Pragmatus AV, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sheldon, Matthew)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the deadline for Facebook to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Pragamatus's Complaint for Patent Infringement be extended to December 22, 2010. Facebook, Inc. answer due 12/22/2010. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/16/2010. (stas)
December 16, 2010 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, 5 Summons Returned Executed Facebook, Inc. by Pragmatus AV, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wasserman, Mark)
December 2, 2010 Filing 8 Certificate of Compliance from the Secretary of the Commonwealth as to Photobucket.com, Inc.; Photobucket.com, Inc. served on 12/2/2010, answer due 12/23/2010. (stas)
December 2, 2010 Filing 7 Certificate of Compliance from the Secretary of the Commonwealth as to YouTube, LLC; YouTube, LLC served on 12/2/2010, answer due 12/23/2010. (stas)
December 2, 2010 Filing 6 Certificate of Compliance from the Secretary of the Commonwealth as to LinkedIn Corporation; LinkedIn Corporation served on 12/2/2010, answer due 12/23/2010. (stas)
November 19, 2010 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Facebook, Inc.; Facebook, Inc. served on 11/17/2010, answer due 12/8/2010. (stas)
November 17, 2010 Filing 4 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) 7,730,132; 7,822,813; and 7,831,663. (stas)
November 15, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued and given to pltf's atty for service by SPS as to defts., Facebook, Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Photobucket.com, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (stas)
November 15, 2010 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Pragmatus AV, LLC. (stas)
November 15, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Facebook, Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Photobucket.com, Inc., YouTube, LLC (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 14683017666), filed by Pragmatus AV, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Receipt, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(stas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pragmatus AV, LLC v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pragmatus AV, LLC
Represented By: Brent Ryan Gary
Represented By: David Thomas Pollock
Represented By: Matthew Robertson Sheldon
Represented By: Mark Wayne Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Allen Cole
Represented By: Matthew P Gubiotti
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Represented By: Justin Patrick Daniel Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Represented By: Veronica S. Ascarrunz
Represented By: Veronica Susana Ascarrunz
Represented By: Robin Lynn Brewer
Represented By: Stefani Elise Shanberg
Represented By: Larry L. Shatzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linkedin Corporation
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Clement S. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Photobucket.com, Inc.
Represented By: Dan D. Davison
Represented By: David Marion Foster
Represented By: Aaron Damion Gopen
Represented By: George Washington Jordan, III
Represented By: John Anthony O'Malley
Represented By: Miriam Latorre Quinn
Represented By: Kimberly Sullivan Walker
Represented By: Richard Stephen Zembek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?