Parham v. McDonald's Corporation et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Monet Parham
Defendant: McDonald's Corporation and McDonalds USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00511
Filed: February 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2011 Filing 76 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re #75 USCA Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER of USCA: The petition for permission to appeal is denied. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 74 USCA Case Number 11-80188 (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 73 RECEIPT OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT from the Superior Court of California, City & County of San Francisco. Re #71 Order to Remand (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 21, 2011 Filing 72 CLERKS NOTICE: Sent by U.S. Mail a certified copy of #71 Order to Remand, a certified copy of the civil docket to the Superior Court of California, City & County of San Francisco. Re #71 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND. Granting #31 Motion to Remand. The case is remanded to California Superior Court. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 70 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2011 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 7/15/2011) re #31 MOTION to Remand filed by Monet Parham. (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/15/2011)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to stipulation, the Case Management Conference scheduled for July 29, 2011 is continued to November 4, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/12/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011) Modified on 7/12/2011 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING MCDONALD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO PREVENT DISCLOSURE OF INFORMATION FILED UNDER SEAL DURING THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 67 STIPULATION / Stipulated Request For Revised Scheduling Order by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC, Monet Parham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elder, Scott) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 66 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Counsel and Parham (Rattan, Seema) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 65 RESPONSE (re #64 MOTION / McDonald's Administrative Motion to Prevent Disclosure of Information Filed Under Seal During The Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand ) filed byMonet Parham. (Gardner, Stephen) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 64 MOTION / McDonald's Administrative Motion to Prevent Disclosure of Information Filed Under Seal During The Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. Responses due by 7/21/2011. Replies due by 7/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Elder, Scott) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 63 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) / McDonalds & Monet Parham's Notice of Need For ADR Phone Conference (Elder, Scott) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 62 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options / McDonald's ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Elder, Scott) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING RENEWED APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE BY STEPHEN H. GARDNER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 60 Second MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Stephen H. Gardner ( Re #35 Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611059045.) filed by Monet Parham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rattan, Seema) (Filed on 7/6/2011) Modified on 7/7/2011 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Henry Gardner Steven Sherman (Gardner, Stephen) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 58 REPLY (re #31 MOTION to Remand ) in support filed byMonet Parham. (Rattan, Seema) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 57 Declaration of Chip Carmody in Support of #54 Opposition/Response to Motion, / [Public Version] Declaration of Chip Carmody in Support of McDonald's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed byMcDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #54 ) (Thorpe, Jane) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 56 Declaration of Kristin Ferschinger in Support of #54 Opposition/Response to Motion, / [Public Version] Declaration of Kristin Ferschinger in Support of McDonald's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed byMcDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #54 ) (Thorpe, Jane) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 55 Declaration of Peter Sterling in Support of #54 Opposition/Response to Motion, / [Public Version] Supplemental Declaration of Peter Sterling In Support Of McDonald's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Remand filed byMcDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #54 ) (Thorpe, Jane) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 54 RESPONSE (re #31 MOTION to Remand ) / [Public Version] McDonald's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed byMcDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thorpe, Jane) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 53 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #45 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, / Declaration of Chip Carmody in Support of McDonald's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thorpe, Jane) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 52 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #45 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, / Declaration of Kristin Ferschinger in Support of McDonald's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thorpe, Jane) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 51 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #45 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, / Supplemental Declaration of Peter Sterling In Support of McDonald's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Thorpe, Jane) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 50 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #45 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, / McDonald's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thorpe, Jane) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 49 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #53 . *** DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #45 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, / Declaration Of Chip Carmody In Support Of McDonald's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Remand by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thorpe, Jane) (Filed on 6/6/2011) Modified on 6/8/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2011 Filing 48 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #52 . *** DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #45 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, / Declaration Of Kristin Ferschinger In Support Of McDonald's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Remand by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thorpe, Jane) (Filed on 6/6/2011) Modified on 6/8/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2011 Filing 47 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #51 . *** DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #45 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, / Supplemental Declaration of Peter Sterling In Support Of McDonald's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Remand by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Thorpe, Jane) (Filed on 6/6/2011) Modified on 6/8/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2011 Filing 46 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #50 . *** DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #45 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, McDonald's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Remand by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Thorpe, Jane) (Filed on 6/6/2011) Modified on 6/8/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING MCDONALD'S AMENDED STIPULATED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF MCDONALD'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND AND CERTAIN SUPPORTING PAPERS UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Pursuant to stipulation #44 , the documents described therein may be filed under seal. The declarations filed in support of the administrative motion, however, were improperly filed under seal, and shall be filed in the public record. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 44 MOTION to Amend/Correct /McDonald's Amended Stipulated Administrative Motion to File Portions of McDonald's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Certain Supporting Papers Under Seal, Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Elder, Scott) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal /Stipulated Administrative Motion to File Portions of McDonald's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Certain Supporting Papers Under Seal filed by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC, Monet Parham. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Elder, Scott) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 42 REDACTION to #40 Order, Directing Plaintiff To Electronically File Transcript, Redacted by Monet Parham. (Rattan, Seema) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 41 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #39 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Deposition of Peter Sterling by Monet Parham. (Rattan, Seema) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL. Plaintiff is directed to electronically file, no later than May 6, 2011, the unredacted version of the transcript under seal. Plaintiff is further directed to electronically file in the public record, no later than May 6, 2011, a version of the transcript, redacted in accordance with the Courts April 28, 2011 order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/3/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE DESIGNATED PORTIONS OF DEPOSITION OF PETER STERLING UNDER SEAL. Granting #30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 38 REPLY (re #30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Deposition of Peter Sterling, ) filed byMonet Parham. (Gardner, Stephen) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE BY STEPHEN H. GARDNER. Denying #35 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2011)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/26/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 25, 2011 Filing 34 Declaration of Scott A. Elder in Support of #33 Opposition/Response to Motion, / Declaration of Scott Elder in Support of McDonald's Response to Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File the Deposition of Peter Sterling Under Seal filed byMcDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #33 ) (Elder, Scott) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 25, 2011 Filing 33 RESPONSE (re #30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Deposition of Peter Sterling, ) / McDonald's Response to Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File the Deposition of Peter Sterling Under Seal and Plaintiff's Motion to Unseal the Administrative Motion to File the Deposition of Peter Sterling Under Seal filed byMcDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elder, Scott) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 22, 2011 Filing 35 MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney Stephen H. Gardner to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611059045.) filed by Monet Parham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION to Unseal Document #30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Deposition of Peter Sterling, filed by Monet Parham filed by Monet Parham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gardner, Stephen) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 31 MOTION to Remand filed by Monet Parham. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gardner, Stephen) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Deposition of Peter Sterling, filed by Monet Parham. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (Gardner, Stephen) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 20, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #31 MOTION to Remand. Motion Hearing Continued for 7/15/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Re #29 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER; DEEMING MOTION TO DISMISS WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Pursuant to stipulation, plaintiff's deadline to file a motion to remand is April 25, 2011. Defendant's deadline to file a motion to dismiss will be the date of the order on plaintiff's motion to remand + 21 days. Defendant's motion to dismiss filed April 18, 2011 is deemed withdrawn. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 18, 2011 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint For Violations of The Unfair Competition Law, The Consumers Legal Remedies Act and Declaratory and Injunctive Relief; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thorpe, Jane) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 Filing 27 STIPULATION Stipulated Request For Revised Scheduling Order by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC, Monet Parham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elder, Scott) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 12, 2011 Filing 26 STIPULATION / Stipulated Protective Order by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR PAGE LIMIT EXTENSION. The parties' stipulated request is denied for failure to show good cause. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/12/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 24 STIPULATION / Stipulated Request and Proposed Order for Page Limit Extension by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE: STIPULATED REQUEST FOR REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER. Defendants' deadline to file a motion to dismiss is April 18, 2011. The Case Management Conference scheduled for May 20, 2011 is continued to July 29, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/25/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 23, 2011 Filing 22 STIPULATION / Stipulated Request for Revised Scheduling Order by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Granting admission of Scott A. Elder pro hac vice #18 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Granting admission of Jane Fugate Thorpe pro hac vice #17 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 16, 2011 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monet Parham identifying Other Affiliate Monet Parham for Monet Parham. Certifying no other parties (Gardner, Stephen) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING MCDONALD'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF ITS NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND THE DECLARATION OF PETER STERLING IN SUPPORT OF MCDONALD'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL UNDER SEAL. Ordered without prejudice to plaintiff's seeking appropriate discovery should the redacted information, or any part thereof, become material to plaintiff's challenge to federal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/10/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 9, 2011 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Scott A. Elder ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611056090.) filed by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jane Fugate Thorpe ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611056089.) filed by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. McDonald's deadline to respond is March 28, 2011. Plaintiff's deadline to oppose McDonald's motion to dismiss, if any, is May 12, 2011. McDonald's deadline to reply in support of its motion to dismiss, if any, is June 1, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/9/11. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/13/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/9/2011. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition re #2 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byMonet Parham. (Gardner, Stephen) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time To Answer or Respond To Amended Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Henry Gardner as Lead Counsel for Plaintiff (Gardner, Stephen) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC re #5 ADR Scheduling Order / Certificate of Service of Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines and Related Documents (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC re #2 MOTION, #3 Proposed Order, #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on February 4, 2011. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011) Modified on 2/4/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (aaa, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2011 Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 2, 2011 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC identifying Other Affiliate McDonald's Holdings Company (Japan) Ltd. for McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2011 Filing 3 Proposed Order re #2 Administrative MOTION to File Portions of its Notice of Removal and the Declaration Declaration of Peter Sterling in Support of Notice of Removal Under Seal by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2011 Filing 2 Administrative MOTION to File Portions of its Notice of Removal and the Declaration Declaration of Peter Sterling in Support of Notice of Removal Under Seal filed by McDonald's Corporation, McDonalds USA, LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (jury demand by plaintiff) (no process) from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-10-506178. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611055800). Filed by McDonalds USA, LLC, McDonald's Corporation. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2011: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (jury demand by plaintiff) (no process) from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-10-506178. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611055800). Filed by McDonalds USA, LLC, McDonald's Corporation. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2011: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011) Modified on 2/4/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parham v. McDonald's Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's Corporation
Represented By: Jane Fugate Thorpe
Represented By: Scott Austin Elder
Represented By: Randall Lee Allen
Represented By: Palani Pradeep Rathinasamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonalds USA, LLC
Represented By: Jane Fugate Thorpe
Represented By: Scott Austin Elder
Represented By: Randall Lee Allen
Represented By: Palani Pradeep Rathinasamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monet Parham
Represented By: George Richard Baker
Represented By: Seema Rattan
Represented By: Stephen Henry Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?