Corazon v. Aurora Loan Services LLC
Plaintiff: Estiva Corazon
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00542
Filed: February 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Expunging Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/7/2011. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 19 Motion to Dismiss (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Dismiss (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/14/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corazon v. Aurora Loan Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estiva Corazon
Represented By: Ekaterina Kashlinsky
Represented By: Kenneth Raymond Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?