Results ByIQ, LLC v. Fanning et al
Plaintiff: Results ByIQ, LLC
Defendant: NetCapital.com LLC, NetWire Inc. and NetMovies Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00550
Filed: February 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE JOHN FANNING BY FILING ON MISCELLANEOUS DOCKET IN DISTRICT OF MASSACHUSETTS: Re 185 Proposed Order filed by Results ByIQ, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/17/2016. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor NetCapital.com.LLC; Judgment Debtor NetWire, Inc,; Judgment Debtor NetMovies, Inc.; in the amount of $167,050.00. Re 158 Declaration (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor NetCapital.com LLC; Judgment Debtor NetWire, Inc., ; Judgment Debtor NetMovies, Inc., in the amount of $167,050.00. Re 158 Declaration (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor NetCapital, LLC & Judgment Debtor NetWire, Inc., in the amount of 167,050.00. Re 155 Declaration (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 134 Motion for Attorney Fees.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/25/2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER RE: RICO INSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on June 7, 2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 31, 2013. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 86 Motion for Reconsideration re 82 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Continue.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 85 Motion to Continue.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 78 Motion to Continue (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 JURY TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 04/29/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE OF REFERENCE; ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/23/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 42 Motion to Set Aside Default.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 17 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 18 Motion to Dismiss (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Results ByIQ, LLC v. Fanning et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Results ByIQ, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Bruce Neustadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetCapital.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetWire Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetMovies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?