Vineyard Brands Inc v. Vina Dona Paula S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Vineyard Brands Inc
Defendant: Vina Dona Paula S.A. and Vina Santa Rita S.A.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00589
Filed: February 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RETAINING JURISDICTION re 60 Stipulation filed by Vineyard Brands Inc. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 5, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND ALLOWING JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by Judge Alsup denying 20 Motion to Dismiss; denying 23 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE RE JUNE 16 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 16, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST TO STAY ACTION re 15 Stipulation filed by Vineyard Brands Inc. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 5, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vineyard Brands Inc v. Vina Dona Paula S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vineyard Brands Inc
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Glickman
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Represented By: Timothy Kevin Roake
Represented By: Frederick Richard Yarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vina Dona Paula S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vina Santa Rita S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?