Conquista Consultoria e Assessoria Empresarial Ltda v. Iguacu, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Conquista Consultoria e Assessoria Empresarial Ltda
Defendant: Iguacu, Inc., Goldengate Solutions Inc and Shobha Seturam
Case Number: 3:2011cv00602
Filed: February 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 89 relief from dismissal. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION; ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, AND; OVERRULING OBJECTION TO NONDISPOSITIVE SANCTION AWARD. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/26/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Re: Challenges to Magistrate Judge's Ruling. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/6/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Denying 75 Motion to defer briefing and hearing of Motion for Summary Judgment. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/5/2015. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/16/2014. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014) Modified on 12/16/2014 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Notice of Further Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Further Settlement Conference set for 12/17/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/25/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CLARIFY COURT ORDER, CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND REFERRING MATTER FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/9/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 27 TO CONTINUE STANDBY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Standby Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/24/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR AN ESCROW AND TO STAY THE LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/22/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conquista Consultoria e Assessoria Empresarial Ltda v. Iguacu, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conquista Consultoria e Assessoria Empresarial Ltda
Represented By: Lawrence S. Bazel
Represented By: Peter Stanley Prows
Represented By: Melanie Louise Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iguacu, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Reeves Cross
Represented By: Constance Jiun-Yee Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldengate Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shobha Seturam
Represented By: Robert Reeves Cross
Represented By: Constance Jiun-Yee Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?