Vollmar v. International Business Machines Corporation
Plaintiff: Doaa Vollmar
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv00629
Filed: February 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of International Business Machines Corporation against Doaa Vollmar; IBM's Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 28, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. The Court grants the stipulation and dismisses the Fourth, Seventh and Eighth Causes of Action and the request for punitive damages with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 2, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING re 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Pretrial Preparation Order, filed by Doaa Vollmar. Non-Expert Discovery cutoff shall be May 31, 2012; Dispositive Motions shall be filed no later than June 29, 2012, and shall be noticed for hearing 35 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/13/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/27/2011. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vollmar v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Mitchell F. Boomer
Represented By: Cortney Lynn McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doaa Vollmar
Represented By: H. Larry Elam, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?