Rhinehart v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: Michael L. Rhinehart
Defendant: Matthew Cate, A. Hedgpeth and K. Harrington
Case Number: 3:2011cv00812
Filed: February 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 110 STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)). Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 16, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 108 Letter filed by Michael L. Rhinehart. Dismissal or Statement due by 1/13/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING JOINT CMC filed by Michael L. Rhinehart. Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 9, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 2/28/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; GRANTING MOTION FOR RULING; SCHEDULING ANSWER AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/28/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER PROVIDING PLAINTIFF NOTICE AND WARNING; SCHEDULING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting extension of time; denying motion to compel. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/9/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SCHEDULING DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/26/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO LIFT STAY; GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT; INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhinehart v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Rhinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Hedgpeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?