Elite Skin Care LLC v. Skin Pro International Inc
Plaintiff: Elite Skin Care LLC
Defendant: Timothy J. Schmidt, South Beach Herbals, Inc. and Skin Pro International Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv00824
Filed: February 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 34 Stipulation filed by Elite Skin Care LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/30/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Judge Edward M. Chen's FINAL STANDING ORDER (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER BY 4/14/11 re 8 Stipulation filed by Skin Pro International Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/5/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elite Skin Care LLC v. Skin Pro International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Beach Herbals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skin Pro International Inc
Represented By: Brett E. Lewis
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Rodenbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Skin Care LLC
Represented By: Marina Alexandra Lewis
Represented By: Manali V. Dighe
Represented By: Todd Andrew Noah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?