Arechiga v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Melissa Arechiga
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv00844
Filed: February 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER for DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT and for WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS BY PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/18/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER to continue CMC re (17 in 3:11-cv-01274-CRB) Stipulation filed by Target Corporation, (23 in 3:11-cv-00844-CRB) Stipulation filed by Target Corporation, (15 in 3:11-cv-02208-CRB) Stipulation filed by Target Corporation Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/24/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re (21 in 3:11-cv-00844-CRB) Stipulation filed by Target Corporation, (12 in 3:11-cv-02208-CRB) Stipulation filed by Target Corporation, (9 in 3:11-cv-02784-CRB) Stipulation filed by Target Corporation, (13 in 3:11-cv-01274-CRB) Stipulation filed by Target Corporation Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/22/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to continue CMC re 12 Stipulation filed by Target Corporation Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/10/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to extend time to respond to complaint re 4 Stipulation filed by Target Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/22/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arechiga v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Arechiga
Represented By: Arthur William Lazear
Represented By: H. Tim Hoffman
Represented By: Chad A Saunders
Represented By: Newman Guthrie Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: David Frank McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?