Groupion, LLC v. Groupon, Inc. et al Featured Case

The law that governs the privacy of cloud computing was written 25 years ago, when the concept of storing emails and other data away from the personal computer wasn't the norm. Some big-name tech companies are asking Congress to step in and clarify Americans' online privacy rights.

Plaintiff: Groupion, LLC
Defendant: Groupon, Inc., The Point, Inc. and Google, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00870
Filed: February 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2011 Filing 78 RESPONSE (re 77 MOTION for Administrative Relief to Expedite Hearing re 63 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaims MOTION for Administrative Relief to Expedite Hearing re 63 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaims ) filed byGroupion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration)(Russo, Jack) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 2, 2011 Filing 77 MOTION for Administrative Relief to Expedite Hearing re 63 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaims filed by Groupon, Inc.. Responses due by 12/6/2011. Replies due by 12/10/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jedediah Wakefield In Support of Groupon's Motion for Administrative Relief to Expedite Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Counterclaims, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
November 29, 2011 Filing 76 JUDGMENT ENTERED IN WRONG CASE - PLEASE DISREGARD JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011) Modified on 11/29/2011 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ENTERED IN WRONG CASE - PLEASE DISREGARD ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011) Modified on 11/29/2011 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING GROUPIONS MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 22, 2011 Filing 73 NOTICE by Groupion, LLC Groupion's Certification re: Supplemental Discovery (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 21, 2011 Filing 72 NOTICE by Groupon, Inc. of Certification of Supplementation of Initial Disclosures and Discovery Responses Pursuant to Rule 26(e) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 14, 2011 Filing 71 REPLY (re 63 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaims ) filed byGroupon, Inc.. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 7, 2011 Filing 70 RESPONSE (re 66 MOTION Leave to Submit Supplemental Evidence On Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION Leave to Submit Supplemental Evidence On Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byGroupon, Inc.. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 69 RESPONSE (re 63 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaims ) Declaration of Jack Russo in support of Groupion's Opposition to Defendant Groupon's Motion for Leave to File Counterclaims filed byGroupion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Russo, Jack) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 68 RESPONSE (re 63 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaims ) filed byGroupion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Russo, Jack) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 67 Declaration of Jack Russo in Support of 66 MOTION Leave to Submit Supplemental Evidence On Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION Leave to Submit Supplemental Evidence On Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 66 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 66 MOTION Leave to Submit Supplemental Evidence On Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Groupion, LLC. Responses due by 11/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Russo, Jack) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 3, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
October 24, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 63 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaims. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 21, 2011 Filing 64 Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield in Support of 63 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaims filed byGroupon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 63 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 21, 2011 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaims filed by Groupon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Groupon, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Counterclaims)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 62 RESPONSE (re 57 MOTION to Strike 51 Declaration in Support,,, MOTION to Strike 51 Declaration in Support,,, ) Defendant Groupon, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Groupion, LLC's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Nick Cioffi (and Associated Opposition Brief Based Thereon) filed byGroupon, Inc.. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 14, 2011 Filing 61 RESPONSE (re 58 MOTION Objection to Reply Evidence and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 54 Reply to Opposition/Response MOTION Objection to Reply Evidence and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 54 Reply to Opposition/Response MOTION Objection to Reply Evidence and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 54 Reply to Opposition/Response MOTION Objection to Reply Evidence and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 54 Reply to Opposition/Response ) Declaration of Jack Russo in Support of Groupion, LLC's Opposition to Defendant Groupon, Inc's Objections to Reply Evidence and Administrative Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition of Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction filed byGroupion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Russo, Jack) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 14, 2011 Filing 60 RESPONSE (re 58 MOTION Objection to Reply Evidence and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 54 Reply to Opposition/Response MOTION Objection to Reply Evidence and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 54 Reply to Opposition/Response MOTION Objection to Reply Evidence and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 54 Reply to Opposition/Response MOTION Objection to Reply Evidence and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 54 Reply to Opposition/Response ) filed byGroupion, LLC. (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 13, 2011 Filing 59 Declaration of CLIFFORD WEBB in Support of 58 MOTION Objection to Reply Evidence and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 54 Reply to Opposition/Response MOTION Objection to Reply Evidence and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 54 Reply to Opposition/Response MOTION Objection to Reply Evidence and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 54 Reply to Opposition/Response MOTION Objection to Reply Evidence and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 54 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byGroupon, Inc.. (Related document(s) 58 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 13, 2011 Filing 58 MOTION Objection to Reply Evidence and Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction re 54 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by Groupon, Inc.. Responses due by 9/19/2011. Replies due by 9/23/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Defendant Groupon Inc.'s [Proposed] Supplemental Brief In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory Judgment, Summary Judgment and Request for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Clifford Webb In Support of Groupon, Inc.'s [Proposed] Supplemental Brief and Exhibits 1 through 6, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Groupon Inc.'s Objection to Reply Evidence and Administrative Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 6, 2011 Filing 57 MOTION to Strike 51 Declaration in Support,,, filed by Groupion, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 9/20/2011. Replies due by 9/27/2011. (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 Filing 56 Declaration of Thomas Kuhlenhamp in Support of 54 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byGroupion, LLC. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 Filing 55 Declaration of Benjamin Coutu in Support of 54 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byGroupion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 54 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 Filing 54 REPLY (re 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byGroupion, LLC. (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 53 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Administrative Relief to Set Briefing Schedule on Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. # 49 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 52 Declaration of JEDEDIAH WAKEFIELD in Support of 50 Opposition/Response to Motion, for Declaratory Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Request for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. # 31 ) filed byGroupon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32)(Related document(s) 50 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 51 Declaration of NICK CIOFFI in Support of 50 Opposition/Response to Motion, for Declaratory Judgment, Motion for Summary Judgment, and Request for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. # 31 ) filed byGroupon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27)(Related document(s) 50 ) (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 50 RESPONSE (re 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byGroupon, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory Judgment, Motion for Summary Judgment, and Request for Preliminary Injunction)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 22, 2011 Filing 49 MOTION for Administrative Relief to Set Briefing Schedule on Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. # 31 ) re 48 Order, filed by Groupon, Inc.. Responses due by 8/26/2011. Replies due by 9/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jedediah Wakefield In Support of Groupon, Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to Set Briefing Schedule on Motion for Summary Judgment Dkt. # 31 , # 2 Exhibit 1 to Wakefield Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Groupon, Inc.'s Motion for Administrative Relief to Set Briefing Schedule on Motion for Summary Judgment)(Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING 47 Stipulation re 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment to Set Briefing Schedule for Hearing on November 4, 2011, 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/22/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 19, 2011 Filing 47 STIPULATION re 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment to Set Briefing Schedule for Hearing on November 4, 2011, 9:00 a.m., and [Proposed] Order by Groupion, LLC, Groupon, Inc.. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 46 Declaration of Darius Abde-Yazdani in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 45 Declaration of Hendrik Wermser in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 44 Declaration of Vera Stelkens in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 43 Declaration of Michael Stettner in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 42 Declaration of Huy Hoang Nguyen in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 41 Declaration of Christoph Muller in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 40 Declaration of Johannes Meindl in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 39 Declaration of Walter Mayer in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 38 Declaration of Matthias Landmesser in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 37 Declaration of Robert Ippenberger in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 36 Declaration of Jack Russo in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 31 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 35 Declaration of Christian Dirner in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 34 Declaration of Ansel Halliburton in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. 1 to A. Halliburton Decl. Supp. Mot. Summ. J. & Inj., # 2 Exhibit Exh. 2 to A. Halliburton Decl. Supp. Mot. Summ. J. & Inj., # 3 Exhibit Exh. 3 to A. Halliburton Decl. Supp. Mot. Summ. J. & Inj.)(Related document(s) 31 ) (Sargent, Christopher) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 33 Declaration of Benjamin Coutu in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 31 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 32 Declaration of Peter-Christoph Haider in Support of 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGroupion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) 31 ) (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 31 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Groupion, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 8/29/2011. Replies due by 9/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Russo, Jack) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 29 STIPULATED Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/20/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 18, 2011 Filing 29 STIPULATION re Protective Order by Groupon, Inc.. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 28 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Google, Inc., Groupon, Inc.. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 25 Stipulation Regarding Assignment to a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/22/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/20/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011) Modified on 6/21/2011 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2011 Filing 25 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Assignment to a Magistrate Judge by Groupon, Inc.. (Webb, Clifford) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 24 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/10/2011 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 6/10/2011). Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 8/6/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/10/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 23 Renotice motion hearing re 22 MOTION to Strike 10 Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike 10 Amended Complaint filed byGoogle, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated: COUNSEL HAS BEEN NOTIFIED THAT THE DATE NOTICED IS UNAVAILBLE AND COUNSEL SHALL RE-NOTICE THEIR MOTION ON AN OPEN AND APPROPRIATE DATE re: 22 MOTION to Strike 10 Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike 10 Amended Complaint filed by Google, Inc.. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION to Strike 10 Amended Complaint filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl. of Mark Paskin, # 2 Affidavit Decl. of Joelle Perry, # 3 Exhibits A-D to Perry Decl., # 4 Exhibits E-R to Perry Decl., # 5 Proposed Order)(Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 6/3/2011) Modified on 6/6/2011 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2011 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Groupion, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Groupion Software Inc., Other Affiliate Groupion GmbH & Co. KG for Groupion, LLC. (Russo, Jack) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Groupion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 Groupon Trademark Certificate, # 2 Exhibit 1 Groupion Trademark Certificate)(Russo, Jack) (Filed on 6/3/2011) Modified on 6/7/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/3/2011.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/22/11. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 17 Answer to Amended Complaint 10 Amended Complaint for: (1) Declaratory Relief; (2) Trademark Infringement; and, (3) Unfair Competition; Jury Trial Demanded CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 14 byGroupon, Inc.. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google, Inc. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE by Groupon, Inc. Re Defendant Groupon, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 14 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 17 . *** Defendant Groupon, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint for: (1) Declaratory Relief; (2) Trademark Infringement; and, (3) Unfair Competition byGroupon, Inc.. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 4/21/2011) Modified on 4/22/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2011 Filing 13 GOOGLE INC.'S ANSWER to Amended Complaint byGoogle, Inc.. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 21, 2011 ***Judge Chen's deadlines terminated. 12 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 13, 2011 Filing 11 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Google, Inc.. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 4, 2011 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., Groupon, Inc., The Point, Inc.. Filed byGroupion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Russo, Jack) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER by 4/15/11 re 8 Stipulation filed by Groupon, Inc., The Point, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/29/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 28, 2011 Filing 8 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond To Complaint by Groupon, Inc., The Point, Inc.. (Wakefield, Jedediah) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 6 Stipulation filed by Google, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/21/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 18, 2011 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC., TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Google, Inc.. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE re consent or declination to proceed before magistrate judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 28, 2011 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademarks (cc: form mailed to register). (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 24, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc., Groupon, Inc., The Point, Inc. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order for all Judges, # 3 Case Management Conference Order, # 4 Notice of Assignment, # 5 Consent to Proceed, # 6 Declination to Proceed, # 7 Order of the Chief Judge re: Electronic Filing)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Google, Inc., Groupon, Inc., The Point, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611009153.). Filed by Groupion, LLC. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2011: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (slh, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groupion, LLC v. Groupon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Groupion, LLC
Represented By: Jack Russo
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupon, Inc.
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Point, Inc.
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Margret Mary Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?