Richard Earl George v. R Reynoso et al
Plaintiff: Richard Earl George
Defendant: R Reynoso, D Tapia, J Xiong and G E Biaggini
Case Number: 3:2011cv00876
Filed: February 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Request for continuance granted. Telephonic Status Conference continued to 10/22/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 09/04/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/20/13. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/25/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER vacating status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/4/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Earl George v. R Reynoso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Earl George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Reynoso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Tapia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Xiong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G E Biaggini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?