Provine v. Office Depot, Inc.
Plaintiff: Howard David Provine
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00903
Filed: February 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 71 Motion for Settlement (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 USCA Mandate (12-80218): In the absence of a timely motion for reinstatement, each party shall bear itsown fees and costs on appeal. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of thiscourt. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 42 31 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER BRIEFING REGARDING DE MINIMIS DEFENSE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Motions terminated: 46 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Office Depot, Inc.., ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/30/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY AND RESCHEDULING CLASS CERTIFICATION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS TO APRIL 20, 2012 43 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Entry of Protective Order. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/12/2011. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting shortening time (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: response to amended complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting request to amend complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Provine v. Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lea Bradford
Represented By: Barbara Jean Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard David Provine
Represented By: Gregory N. Karasik
Represented By: Alexander Isaac Dychter
Represented By: Dennis Frank Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?