Rickman v. Budzik & Dynia, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Baron J Rickman
Defendant: Budzik & Dynia, LLC, Jeffrey J Budzik and Alfred Stanley Dynia
Case Number: 3:2011cv00952
Filed: March 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/17/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER VACATING re 44 Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/15/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/18/2011 01:30 PM. Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement, and further case management conference set for 11/18/11 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/18/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 27 Stipulation for Continuance of Case Management Conference filed by Jeffrey J Budzik, Alfred Stanley Dynia, Baron J Rickman, Budzik & Dynia, LLC. Case Management Conference re-set for 6/24/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/1/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Joint cmc statement due by 5/27/11. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/2/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rickman v. Budzik & Dynia, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baron J Rickman
Represented By: Fred W. Schwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budzik & Dynia, LLC
Represented By: Aimee Robson Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey J Budzik
Represented By: Aimee Robson Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Stanley Dynia
Represented By: Aimee Robson Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?