Swanson v. GMR Marketing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eileen Swanson
Defendant: GMR Marketing LLC, Nestle USA, Inc. and Gerber Products Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv00971
Filed: March 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 16 Motion to Remand and DENYING Request for Attorneys' Fees. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/8/2011.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/4/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson v. GMR Marketing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Swanson
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Represented By: Michael D Burstein
Represented By: Emily Knoles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMR Marketing LLC
Represented By: Shannon B. Nakabayashi
Represented By: L. Julius M. Turman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerber Products Company
Represented By: Gregory Clement Cheng
Represented By: Robert Allen Jones
Represented By: Danielle Ochs-Tillotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?