Bacchus Management Group, LLC v. Talisker Canyons (WA Dakota), LLC
Plaintiff: Bacchus Management Group, LLC
Defendant: Talisker Canyons (WA Dakota), LLC
Mediator: James Gilliland
Case Number: 3:2011cv00987
Filed: March 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Of Dismissal filed by Bacchus Management Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/9/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING 56 STIPULATION RE: Notice of Settlement and Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 54 Stipulation TO EXTEND COURT MEDIATION DEADLINE TO MARCH 16, 2012. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacchus Management Group, LLC v. Talisker Canyons (WA Dakota), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: James Gilliland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bacchus Management Group, LLC
Represented By: Jia-Ming Shang
Represented By: Matthew A. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talisker Canyons (WA Dakota), LLC
Represented By: Sterling Arthur Brennan
Represented By: Kirk R. Harris
Represented By: Tyson Keith Hottinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?