Schecter v. SAP America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Todd Schecter
Defendant: SAP America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00993
Filed: March 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2011 Filing 30 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session multiple sessions by phone, email through 11/2/2011. Signed by mediator, Sue J. Stott, dated 11/2/2011. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Each party shall be responsible for bearing its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011) Modified on 11/18/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2011 Filing 28 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Action With Prejudice by SAP America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing Action with Prejudice Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation and Settlement)(Warner, Adelmise) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
September 19, 2011 Filing 27 PROTECTIVE ORDER re #26 Stipulation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011) Modified on 9/20/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2011 Filing 26 STIPULATION Amended Confidentiality Agreement and Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order by SAP America, Inc.. (Warner, Adelmise) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 25 PROTECTIVE ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 23, 2011 Filing 24 STIPULATION Confidentiality Agreement and Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order by SAP America, Inc.. (Warner, Adelmise) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 23 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Sue J. Stott as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 3, 2011 CASE REFERRED to Mediation ADR Program for court-sponsored mediation #22 . (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
July 19, 2011 Filing 22 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference HELD 7/15/11 (Date Filed: 7/19/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2011 03:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 5/21/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 5/21/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2012 03:30 PM before Hon. Susan Illston. () (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 Filing 21 PRETRIAL ORDER (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 13, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by GDB on 7/13/11. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 20 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Rule 26(f) Report and [Proposed] Order filed by SAP America, Inc.. (Warner, Adelmise) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 19 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 7/13/11 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 712-775-7300 and use access code 847955 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Todd Schecter , Plaintiff (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Plaintiff (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Warner, Adelmise) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Warner, Adelmise) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Adelmise Roseme Warner (Warner, Adelmise) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2011 02:30 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
March 16, 2011 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2011 02:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on March 10, 2011. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 8, 2011 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 8, 2011 Filing 9 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by SAP America, Inc.. (Steenhoek, Sacha) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 8 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Todd Schecter.. (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Todd Schecter. (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP America, Inc. re 1 Notice of Removal, (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 5 Declaration of Isabelle Finberg in Support of 1 Notice of Removal, filed by SAP America, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by SAP America, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SAP AG, Other Affiliate SAP Nederland Holding B.V. for SAP America, Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by SAP America, Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) bySAP America, Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011) Modified on 3/7/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schecter v. SAP America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Schecter
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Creitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAP America, Inc.
Represented By: Adelmise Roseme Warner
Represented By: Melinda S. Riechert
Represented By: Sacha Marie Steenhoek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?