Yount -v- City and County of San Francisco
Plaintiff: Kathy Yount and Estate of Dylan Yount
Defendant: San Francisco Fire Department, City and County of San Francisco and San Francisco Police Department
Case Number: 3:2011cv01141
Filed: March 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court shall close the file. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER VACATING HEARING RE: DKT NO. 26 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/10/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FOURTH ORDER RE: JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/3/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 THIRD ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/30/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SECOND ORDER TO FILE JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/16/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/23/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE: STATUS. Motions due by 4/15/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/21/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - Status Report due by 9/20/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/7/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE AVAILABLE DATES FOR DISCOVERY MEET AND CONFER re 17 Statement filed by Estate of Dylan Yount, Kathy Yount. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/25/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER VACATING CMC, ADOPTING PARTIES' JOINT CMC STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/9/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yount -v- City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Fire Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Yount
Represented By: Gregory S. Walston
Represented By: Orestes Alexander Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Dylan Yount
Represented By: Orestes Alexander Cross
Represented By: Gregory S. Walston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?