J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Magat
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Narciso Magat
Case Number: 3:2011cv01149
Filed: March 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 WRIT of Execution issued (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 WRIT of Execution issued (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO SHOW GOOD CAUSE AND VACATE HEARING re 32 MOTION to Alter Judgment or Amend Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 8, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff for $4,999.75. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/12/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS by Judge William Alsup [denying 13 Motion to Quash]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO QUASH re 13 MOTION to Quash filed by Narciso Magat. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 1, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Magat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narciso Magat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?