Akaosugi et al v. Benihana, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tetsuo Akaosugi and Hieu Nguyen
Defendant: Benihana, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01272
Filed: March 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER RE FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Hon. William Alsup granting 287 Motion for Settlement.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER RE MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ALTER JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup denying 268 Motion to Alter Judgment.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER FOR JURY COMMISSIONER to furnish refreshments for members of the jury. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/5/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER re 221 Letter filed by Tetsuo Akaosugi, Rinko Donahue, Hieu Nguyen, 222 Brief, filed by Benihana National Corp. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF RE ORDER OF PROOF AT TRIAL by Judge Alsup (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 171 Motion for Summary Judgment (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER RE REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF EXPERT CLASS DAMAGES REPORT by Hon. William Alsup granting 162 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER RE NOTICE OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT OF VACATION PAY CLASS CLAIMS by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 160 Stipulation.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER CERTIFYING CLASSES, APPOINTING CLASS COUNSEL AND APPOINTING CLASS REPRESENTATIVE by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 147 Motion to Certify Class.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion to Certify Class.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S DAUBERT MOTION TO STRIKE DR. JOHANSON'S REPLY EXPERT DECLARATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 122 Motion to Strike.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER REQUESTING CORRECTED CITATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS re 84 Amended MOTION to Certify Class per Docket No. 76 filed by Tetsuo Akaosugi. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 20, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS DUE TO SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE AND SELF-HELP DISCOVERY by Judge William Alsup [denying 88 Motion for Sanctions]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING [re 88 MOTION for Sanctions Due to Spoliation of Evidence and Self-Help Discovery by Plaintiff Hieu Nguyen, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Benihana National Corp]. Please respond by noon on March 13, 2012. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/7/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 110 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Tetsuo Akaosugi, Hieu Nguyen]. Response due by noon on 2/27/2012. Meet-and-confer set for 3/1/2012 from 10:30 a.m. and continuing to 2:00 p.m . Discovery Hearing set for 3/1/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Hearing on motion to certify class set for 3/1/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/22/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 61 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY LETTERS re 70 Letter filed by Benihana National Corp., 69 Letter filed by Tetsuo Akaosugi, Hieu Nguyen. Signed by Judge Alsup on January10, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ENLARGE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND TO ALLOW 35-PAGE BRIEFS by Hon. William Alsup denying 57 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2011)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANT FROM FILING A MOTION TO DENY CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion preclude defendant from filing motion to deny class certification.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting 44 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ON MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED CLASS LETTER re 46 Order, 42 Letter filed by Benihana National Corp., 41 Letter filed by Tetsuo Akaosugi, Hieu Nguyen (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 35 Letter filed by Tetsuo Akaosugi, Hieu Nguyen]. Defendant's response due by noon on 9/30/2011. Meet-and-confer starting from 10:00 a.m. through 2:00 p.m. on 10/3/2011 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 10/3/2011 at 2:00 p.m. before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/28/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 29, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 24, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 9, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akaosugi et al v. Benihana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tetsuo Akaosugi
Represented By: Lindsay Elizabeth Nako
Represented By: Daniel Mark Feinberg
Represented By: Kevin Robert Allen
Represented By: Brad Yamauchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hieu Nguyen
Represented By: Kevin Robert Allen
Represented By: Daniel Mark Feinberg
Represented By: Lindsay Elizabeth Nako
Represented By: Brad Yamauchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benihana, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Hart Edwards
Represented By: Constance Elizabeth Norton
Represented By: Robert Louis Zaletel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?