Delson v. Warszawa Building Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Walter Delson
Defendant: Warszawa Building Partnership and Cafe Gratitude LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv01280
Filed: March 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/17/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/1/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISCHARGING OSC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/10/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/23/2011 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/9/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/26/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delson v. Warszawa Building Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Delson
Represented By: Catherine M. Cabalo
Represented By: Paul Leslie Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warszawa Building Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cafe Gratitude LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?