Hurst v. Buczek Enterprises, LLC

Plaintiff: Brad Hurst
Defendant: Buczek Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv01379
Filed: March 22, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2012 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JULY 3, 2012 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/2/2012. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 25, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PARTIES' PRETRIAL FILINGS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 06/25/2012. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 18, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Defendant's Counterclaims Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/18/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
May 2, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 39 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
April 5, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Defendant's Letter of April 3, 2012 and Parties' Joint Letter of April 4, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/5/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 3, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 41 Parties' Joint Letter of March 26, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/3/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
March 14, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Motions for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56(a)] filed by Buczek Enterprises, LLC, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Motions for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56(a)], 39 First MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication, 35 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgmen t . Responses due by 4/3/2012. Replies due by 4/13/2012. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/14/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
November 3, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 12/16/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Status Report due by 12/9/2011.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/3/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
October 12, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 19 Stipulation filed by Buczek Enterprises, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/12/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
June 8, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Edward M. Chen's FINAL STANDING ORDER (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurst v. Buczek Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buczek Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Huss Geronimo
Represented By: Alden John Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Hurst
Represented By: Mark Christopher Peters
Represented By: Thomas E. Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?