Friends of Oceano Dunes, Inc. v. Salazar et al
Plaintiff: Friends of Oceano Dunes, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior, United States Fish And Wildlife Service, Rowan Gould and Ken Salazar
Case Number: 3:2011cv01476
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice and [Proposed] Order filed by Ken Salazar, United States Fish And Wildlife Service, U.S. Department of the Interior. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/29/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING MOTION re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees filed by Ken Salazar, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, 42 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Responses due by 4/13/2012. Replies due by 4/20/2012. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 43 Notice (Other), filed by United States Fish And Wildlife Service, U.S. Department of the Interior. Signed by Judge Edwward M. Chen on 1/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying 28 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDERS (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, etc. re 13 Stipulation filed by Ken Salazar. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/9/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Oceano Dunes, Inc. v. Salazar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish And Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowan Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Represented By: Juan Dion Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Oceano Dunes, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Denney Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?