Banga v. Chevron USA et al

Plaintiff: Kamlesh Banga
Defendant: Chevron USA, Household Bank, Capital One, Direct Lending Source and Echostar
Case Number: 3:2011cv01498
Filed: March 29, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2012 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE A SUR-REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CHEVRON U.S.A., INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; STRIKING ALL REFERENCE TO THE MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on December 17, 2012. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
March 5, 2012 84 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CHANGING TIME TO FILE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motions due by 8/27/2012. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/5/12. (Attachments: # 1 Cert Serve)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
January 24, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 70 Notice (Other) filed by Chevron USA Requesting to Appear at the 1/27/12 Further Case Management Conference Telephonically. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/23/12. (Attachments: # 1 Cert Serve)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
December 9, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Updated Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/8/11. (Attachments: # 1 Cert Serve)(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
November 21, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/21/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
October 14, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF 10/21/11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference reset for 12/16/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Updated joint cmc statement due 12/9/11. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/13/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 12, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 42 Stipulation Requesting Continuance of Mediation Cutoff Date filed by Kamlesh Banga. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/12/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banga v. Chevron USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamlesh Banga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Household Bank
Represented By: Gregory Scott Korman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One
Represented By: Hunter Randolph Eley
Represented By: Hemmy W So
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Lending Source
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echostar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?