Optimum Power Solutions LLC v. Apple Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Optimum Power Solutions LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc., Dell Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Lenovo (United States) Inc. and Sony Electronics, Inc.
Mediator: Diane DeVasto
Case Number: 3:2011cv01509
Filed: March 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/1/11. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/1/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
April 1, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated; the 7/5/2011 cmc is vacated, 96 Order of Recusal. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 94 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:10-cv-00061. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 29, 2011 Filing 95 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/28/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/5/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order re Case Management Conference, # 3 Standing Order for all Judges)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 21, 2011 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (mll, )
March 16, 2011 Filing 93 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company of Withdrawal of Appearance of James F. Valentine (Alexander, Paul)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 46 Motion to Change Venue. This case shall be transferred to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/22/11. cc:attys 2-22-11 (mll, )
February 22, 2011 This civil action will be transferred to the Northern District of California on or after 03-14-2011 per Local Rule CV-83(b). (mll, )
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATED ESI DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/11. cc:attys 2-01-11(mll, )
January 31, 2011 Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Discovery ESI Order by Apple Inc., Dell Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Optimum Power Solutions LLC, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (ESI Discovery Order))(Hassett, Shaun)
January 31, 2011 Filing 89 SEALED RESPONSE by Optimum Power Solutions LLC to 82 Sealed Document, filed by Optimum Power Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of W. Andrew McNeil, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of W. Andrew McNeil, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of W. Andrew McNeil, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of W. Andrew McNeil)(Hill, Jack)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 87 Motion for Extension of Time. Defts have through 2-04-2011 to comply with Local Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/12/11. cc:attys 1-12-11 (mll, )
January 11, 2011 Filing 87 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Comply with Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 by Apple Inc., Dell Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Adam A Biggs terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/7/2011. (gsg)
January 6, 2011 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Adam A. Biggs as Counsel of Record by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 5, 2011 Filing 84 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney R Scott Roe for Sony Electronics, Inc. (mll, )
January 5, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 2/13/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (NOTE: THIS DATE WAS INADVERTENTLY LEFT OFF THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER 74 )(rlf, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 81 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing. Pltf is granted leave to file a response to defts' supplemental briefing by 1-31-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/04/11. cc:attys 1-05-11 (mll, )
January 3, 2011 Filing 82 Sealed Document. Defendants' Supplement to Briefing and Notice of New Authority on Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit W, # 2 Exhibit X, # 3 Exhibit Y, # 4 Exhibit Z, # 5 Exhibit AA, # 6 Exhibit BB, # 7 Exhibit CC, # 8 Exhibit DD, # 9 Exhibit EE, # 10 Exhibit FF, # 11 Exhibit GG)(Dacus, Deron)
January 3, 2011 Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Briefing and Notice of New Authority on Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 U.S.C § 1404(a) by Apple Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
November 24, 2010 Filing 80 AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Dell Inc.. (Hassett, Shaun)
November 19, 2010 Filing 79 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company of Withdrawal of Appearance of Ryan J. Moran (Valentine, James)
November 9, 2010 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John P Fry on behalf of Optimum Power Solutions LLC (Fry, John)
October 22, 2010 Filing 77 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and Witnesses filed by Optimum Power Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Michael Shin, # 2 Exhibit 1 MacPherson to Shin Aff., # 3 Exhibit 2 Intel Offices US to Shin Aff., # 4 Exhibit 3 Intersil locations to Shin Aff., # 5 Exhibit 4 ON Semi Austin to Shin Aff., # 6 Exhibit 5 BIPC to Shin Aff.)(Harrison, Bryan)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and Witnesses; Sur-Reply due by 10/22/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/19/10. cc:attys 10-19-10 (mll, )
October 15, 2010 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and Witnesses Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply by Optimum Power Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
October 6, 2010 Deadlines set per 74 Docket Control Order: Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2011; Respond to Amended Pleadings by 4-28-2011. Discovery due by 10/3/2011. Expert Witness List due by 8/24/2011; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses designated by 9-02-2011. Identify trial witnesses by 10/17/2011; Rebuttal Trial Witnesses identified by 10-28-2011. Joinder of Parties due by 9/13/2010, for pltf; 1-21-2011 for defts. Jury instructions due by 11/22/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2011; Response to Dispositive Motions due 11-15-2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/22/2011. Motions in Limine due 1-09-2012; Responses to Motions in Limine due 1-12-2012. Diane DeVasto is appointed as Mediator in this cause. Jury Selection set for 2/6/2012 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis; Jury Trial Date to be assigned by the Court at a later date. Markman Hearing set for 6/30/2011 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Expected Length of Trial is five days. (mll, )
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/06/10. cc:attys 10-06-10(mll, )
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/06/10. cc:attys 10-06-10(mll, )
October 1, 2010 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Support re 46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and Witnesses filed by Apple Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T, # 2 Exhibit U, # 3 Exhibit V - Declaration of Shaun Hassett)(Dacus, Deron)
September 28, 2010 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Gunter, Debra)
September 28, 2010 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Yarbrough, Herbert)
September 22, 2010 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and Witnesses filed by Optimum Power Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) Modified on 9/22/2010 (kls, ).(Corrects Docket Nos. 67 and 68)
September 22, 2010 Filing 68 ***Filed in Error. Please disregard.*** RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and Witnesses filed by Optimum Power Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) Modified on 9/22/2010 (kls, ).
September 21, 2010 Filing 67 ***Filed in Error. Please Disregard.***RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and Witnesses filed by Optimum Power Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) Modified on 9/22/2010 (gsg).
September 21, 2010 Filing 66 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Optimum Power Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (proposed Docket Control Order), # 2 Text of Proposed Order (proposed Discovery Order))(Hill, Jack)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/10. cc:attys 9-21-10(mll, )
September 20, 2010 Filing 64 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Apple Inc., Dell Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Optimum Power Solutions LLC, Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Protective Order))(Alexander, Paul)
September 16, 2010 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shaun William Hassett on behalf of Dell Inc. (Hassett, Shaun)
September 15, 2010 Filing 62 NOTICE of Disclosure by Optimum Power Solutions LLC of Local Patent Rule Disclosures (Harrison, Bryan)
September 15, 2010 Filing 61 ***Filed in Error. Please Disregard. See Entry 62 For Correction.*** NOTICE of Disclosure by Optimum Power Solutions LLC of Initial Disclosures (Harrison, Bryan) Modified on 9/15/2010 (gsg).
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 09-21-2010. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 09-21-2010 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus plaintiff's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 09-13-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/10/10. cc:attys 9-10-10(mll, )
September 8, 2010 Filing 59 NOTICE of Disclosure by Apple Inc. Apple's Notice of Disclosures regarding Paragraph 1 (Albritton, Eric)
September 8, 2010 Filing 58 NOTICE of Disclosure by Optimum Power Solutions LLC (Harrison, Bryan)
September 7, 2010 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Status Conference held on 9/7/2010. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 56 NOTICE of Disclosure by Hewlett-Packard Company (Alexander, Paul)
September 7, 2010 Filing 55 NOTICE of Disclosure by Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Hill, Russell)
September 7, 2010 Filing 54 NOTICE of Disclosure by Dell Inc. (Hassett, Shaun)
September 7, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam A Biggs on behalf of Apple Inc. (Biggs, Adam)
September 2, 2010 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Craft, Roger)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and Witnesses; Responses due by 9/21/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/25/10. cc:attys 8-25-10 (mll, )
August 19, 2010 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and Witnesses by Optimum Power Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
August 17, 2010 Filing 49 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul T Qualey for Sony Electronics, Inc. (mll, )
August 17, 2010 Filing 48 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John R Hutchins for Sony Electronics, Inc. (mll, )
August 17, 2010 Filing 47 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard S Gresalfi for Sony Electronics, Inc. (mll, )
August 2, 2010 Filing 46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California for the Convenience of the Parties and Witnesses by Apple Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
August 2, 2010 Filing 45 ANSWER to 41 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Sony Electronics Inc. by Optimum Power Solutions LLC.(Harrison, Bryan)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER setting Status Conference for 9/7/2010 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/29/10. cc:attys 7-29-10(mll, )
July 14, 2010 Filing 43 NOTICE by Optimum Power Solutions LLC re 32 Order, Notification for Scheduling Conference (Harrison, Bryan)
July 7, 2010 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Electronics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation for Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Dacus, Deron)
July 7, 2010 Filing 41 SONY ELECTRONICS' ANSWER to 1 Complaint, AND, Joint COUNTERCLAIM against Optimum Power Solutions LLC by Sony Electronics, Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
June 7, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 40 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sony Electronics, Inc. to 7/7/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
June 4, 2010 Filing 40 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sony Electronics, Inc..( Dacus, Deron)
May 27, 2010 Filing 39 Plaintiff Optimum Power Solutions, LLC's ANSWER to 34 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Defendant Hewlett-Parkard Company by Optimum Power Solutions LLC.(Harrison, Bryan)
May 26, 2010 Filing 38 Return of Service Executed as to Sony Electronics, Inc. on 5/17/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 6/7/2010. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2010: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ).
May 14, 2010 Filing 37 Plaintiff Optimum Power Solutions, LLC's ANSWER to 27 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Defendant Apple Inc. by Optimum Power Solutions LLC.(Harrison, Bryan)
May 6, 2010 Filing 36 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 24 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Lenovo (USA) Inc.'s by Optimum Power Solutions LLC.(Harrison, Bryan)
May 3, 2010 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hewlett-Packard Company (Valentine, James)
May 3, 2010 Filing 34 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM for Invalidity, Noninfringement, and Unenforceability against Optimum Power Solutions LLC by Hewlett-Packard Company.(Valentine, James)
April 28, 2010 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clayton C James on behalf of Apple Inc. (James, Clayton)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/26/10. cc:attys 4-27-10(mll, )
April 26, 2010 Filing 31 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph Raffetto for Apple Inc. (mll, )
April 26, 2010 Filing 30 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Celine Jimenez Crowson for Apple Inc. (mll, )
April 20, 2010 Filing 29 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark L Blake for Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (mll, )
April 20, 2010 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
April 20, 2010 Filing 27 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Optimum Power Solutions LLC by Apple Inc..(Albritton, Eric)
April 12, 2010 Filing 26 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Russell B Hill for Lenovo (United States) Inc. (mll, )
April 12, 2010 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lenovo Holding Company, Inc. for Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
April 12, 2010 Filing 24 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Optimum Power Solutions LLC by Lenovo (United States) Inc..(Findlay, Eric)
April 12, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 20 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hewlett-Packard Company to 5/3/2010. 20 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 12, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 23 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Lenovo (United States) Inc. to 4/12/2010. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 8, 2010 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
April 8, 2010 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell Inc. (Newton, Michael)
April 8, 2010 Filing 21 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Dell Inc..(Newton, Michael)
April 7, 2010 Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hewlett-Packard Company.( Moran, Ryan)
April 7, 2010 Filing 19 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul Alexander for Hewlett-Packard Company. (mll, )
April 7, 2010 Filing 18 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James F Valentine for Hewlett-Packard Company. (mll, )
March 23, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 17 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hewlett-Packard Company to 4/12/2010. 20 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
March 23, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 14 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Dell Inc. to 4/8/2010. 20 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
March 22, 2010 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hewlett-Packard Company.( Moran, Ryan)
March 22, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan James Moran on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Moran, Ryan)
March 22, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Dell Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
March 18, 2010 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dell Inc..( Newton, Michael)
March 18, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Newton on behalf of Dell Inc. (Newton, Michael)
March 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 12 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 4/21/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
March 10, 2010 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Albritton, Eric)
March 10, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Apple Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
March 8, 2010 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Hewlett-Packard Company on 3/1/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/22/2010. (mll, )
March 8, 2010 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Dell Inc. on 2/26/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/19/2010. (mll, )
March 8, 2010 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Apple Inc. on 3/1/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/22/2010. (mll, )
March 8, 2010 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Lenovo (United States) Inc. on 3/1/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/22/2010. (mll, )
February 24, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Guy Harrison on behalf of Optimum Power Solutions LLC (Harrison, Bryan)
February 24, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Optimum Power Solutions LLC (Hill, Jack)
February 24, 2010 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc., Dell Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
February 24, 2010 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Optimum Power Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Other Affiliate Acacia Patent Acquisition LLC for Optimum Power Solutions LLC. (Ward, Thomas)
February 24, 2010 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas)
February 24, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., Dell Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002370614.), filed by Optimum Power Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas)
February 24, 2010 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Optimum Power Solutions LLC v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optimum Power Solutions LLC
Represented By: John P Fry
Represented By: Bryan G Harrison
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: W. Andrew McNeil
Represented By: Matthew Rutledge Schultz
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: Celine Jimenez Crowson
Represented By: Clayton C James
Represented By: Joseph Raffetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Shaun William Hassett
Represented By: Michael John Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: Paul Alexander
Represented By: Paul Alexander
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Represented By: Mark L. Blake
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Russell B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: John R Hutchins
Represented By: Megan Rae Whyman Olesek
Represented By: Paul T Qualey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Diane DeVasto
Represented By: Diane DeVasto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?