Provident Funding Associates, L.P. v. Lydian Private Bank et al
Plaintiff: Provident Funding Associates, L.P.
Defendant: Lydian Private Bank and VirtualBank
Case Number: 3:2011cv01538
Filed: March 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/29/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AND ADJOURNING DEADLINES. Case stayed. Case Mgmt Conference date of 10/21/11 at 1:30 PM VACATED.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/05/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER Substituting Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver, for Defendant Lydian Private Bank. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/14/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Provident Funding Associates, L.P. v. Lydian Private Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydian Private Bank
Represented By: Joel M. Miller
Represented By: Charles R. Jacob, III
Represented By: Jeremy M. Sher
Represented By: Robert John Stumpf
Represented By: Martin Daniel White
Represented By: Martin Daniel White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VirtualBank
Represented By: Charles R. Jacob, III
Represented By: Joel M. Miller
Represented By: Jeremy M. Sher
Represented By: Robert John Stumpf
Represented By: Martin Daniel White
Represented By: Martin Daniel White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provident Funding Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Neil Richard O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?