United States of America v. Wolff et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: George Wolff, George William Wolff, CBSJ Financial Corp., San Francisco County Tax Collector and State of California Franchise Tax Board
Case Number: 3:2011cv01579
Filed: March 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1340
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 31 STIPULATION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/12/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 26 REQUEST TO DISMISS SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR AND THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD; CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Report due by 9/14/2012. Status Conference set for 9/21/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/6/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 24 Stipulation to Set Status Conference. Terminating: 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE DEADLINE and terminating 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Status Conference set for 6/8/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 23, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 22 STIPULATION EXTENDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/10/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Wolff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Cynthia Lewis Stier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBSJ Financial Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco County Tax Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Franchise Tax Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?