Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al v. Impax Laboratories, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals LLC and Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.,
Case Number: 3:2011cv01610
Filed: April 1, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 365 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/2/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 REDACATED ORDER re 167 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc.,, 169 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,, filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc.,, 203 Document E-Filed Under Seal, filed by Takeda Pha rmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals LLC, 174 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Infringement of the '058, '276, and '971 Patents [PUB LIC VERSION] filed by Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 04/08/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER GRANTING re 299 Proposed Order RE: Proposed Redactions of the 4/8/13 Order re:Summary Judgment filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/28/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER [Docket No. 241] UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 8, 2013. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
December 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting Administrative Motion to Seal confidential material in support of Takeda's Opposition to Impax's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/31/2012. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re 50 Stipulation of Dismissal of Count XI (False Marking) without prejudice filed by Impax Laboratories, Inc. Motions terminated: 20 MOTION to Dismiss Count XI of Impax's Counterclaims filed by Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/13/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for extention of time to answer re 12 Stipulation, filed by Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/3/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENC/STANDING ORDERS (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al v. Impax Laboratories, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Weinberger
Represented By: Heather E. Takahashi
Represented By: Ted G. Dane, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America, Inc.
Represented By: Ted G. Dane, Esq.
Represented By: Heather E. Takahashi
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Ted G. Dane, Esq.
Represented By: Heather E. Takahashi
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Represented By: Ted G. Dane, Esq.
Represented By: Heather E. Takahashi
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.,
Represented By: Brian Francis McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?