Pinoli v. OneWest Bank F.S.B. et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Pinoli
Defendant: OneWest Bank F.S.B., Federal National Mortgage Association and Quality Loan Service Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv01645
Filed: April 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/2/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/21/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard Philip Sax terminated. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER to continue CMC and Motion to Dismiss re 36 Stipulation filed by Wayne Pinoli, Set/Reset Deadlines 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/1/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 19 Ex Parte Application. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinoli v. OneWest Bank F.S.B. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Pinoli
Represented By: Richard Philip Sax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank F.S.B.
Represented By: Robert Betuel Norum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Robert Betuel Norum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Charles Edward Bell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?