Gaudin v. Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Marie Gaudin
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01663
Filed: April 6, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2016 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER NOTING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re 155 to Suspend Entry of Final Judgment Pending Compliance with Class Action Fairness Act Notice Requirements. Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2016. Final Accounting Hearing set for 8/10/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 22, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
December 11, 2015 155 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 154 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Suspend Entry of Final Judgment Pending Compliance with Class Action Fairness Act Notice Requirements filed by Marie Gaudin. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 11, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
November 23, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 143 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 147 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
July 21, 2015 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 132 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
May 21, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING re 132 MOTION for Settlement , Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, filed by Marie Gaudin. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
April 27, 2015 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 132 MOTION for Settlement , Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, filed by Marie Gaudin. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 27, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
November 3, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 124 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 123 Stipulation and Order; Stipulation and [Proposed] to Approve Form of Corrective Notice filed by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 14, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 122 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR MAILING CORRECTIVE NOTICES filed by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 14, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
August 28, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 117 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR ONE WEEK filed by Marie Gaudin. Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 28, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 22, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 22, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
January 10, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 114 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO MAIL CLASS NOTICE filed by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 10, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
November 18, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIES' STIPULATIONS; ORDERING SAXON TO PROVIDE HOME TELEPHONE AND SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER INFORMATION FOR CLASS MEMBERS TO PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL; VACATING NOVEMBER 25, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 109 Stipulation filed by Marie Gaudin. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 18, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
August 5, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL, SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 81 Motion to Certify Class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
June 11, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 86 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
December 4, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 66 CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND RELATED DEADLINES. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/4/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
May 10, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ADDENDUM TO STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY MATERIAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/10/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
November 17, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT. Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/17/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
August 31, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 37 CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEALINES AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/31/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
July 22, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 23 REGARDING FURTHER BRIEFING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/22/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
June 1, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 15 CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO DISMISS, INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaudin v. Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Gaudin
Represented By: Peter B. Fredman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?