Chie et al v. Reed Elsevier, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Semmantha Chie and Jennifer Dessin
Defendant: Reed Elsevier, Inc., Lexis/Nexis, Inc. and Matthew Bender & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01784
Filed: April 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/5/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 21 Proposed Order re 19 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Semmantha Chie, Jennifer Dessin. (Lohr, Jason) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 20 Declaration of Jason Lohr in Support of 19 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed bySemmantha Chie, Jennifer Dessin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A., # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 19 ) (Lohr, Jason) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 19 RESPONSE (re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss ) filed bySemmantha Chie, Jennifer Dessin. (Lohr, Jason) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 18 Proposed Order re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Lexis/Nexis, Inc., Matthew Bender & Company, Inc., Reed Elsevier, Inc.. (Dacre, Catherine) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 17 Renotice motion hearing re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byLexis/Nexis, Inc., Matthew Bender & Company, Inc., Reed Elsevier, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (Related document(s) 13 ) (Knight, Cody) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 15, 2011 MOTIONS REFERRED to Judge Edward M. Chen Re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on June 15, 2011. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 15 [Proposed] Order Granting 13 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Lexis/Nexis, Inc., Matthew Bender & Company, Inc., Reed Elsevier, Inc. (Dacre, Catherine) (Filed on 6/14/2011) Modified on 6/15/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2011 Filing 14 Declaration of Ashleigh Owens In Support of 13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Lexis/Nexis, Inc., Matthew Bender & Company, Inc., Reed Elsevier, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Dacre, Catherine) (Filed on 6/14/2011) Modified on 6/15/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6); and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Lexis/Nexis, Inc., Matthew Bender & Company, Inc., Reed Elsevier, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 6/28/2011. Replies due by 7/5/2011. (Dacre, Catherine) (Filed on 6/14/2011) Modified on 6/15/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2011 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 11 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Lexis/Nexis, Inc., Matthew Bender & Company, Inc., Reed Elsevier, Inc.. (Knight, Cody) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 8, 2011 Filing 10 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Semmantha Chie, Jennifer Dessin.. (Lohr, Jason) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 24, 2011 Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE re Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 23, 2011 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Semmantha Chie, Jennifer Dessin. Service waived by Lexis/Nexis, Inc. waiver sent on 4/15/2011, answer due 6/14/2011; Matthew Bender & Company, Inc. waiver sent on 4/15/2011, answer due 6/14/2011; Reed Elsevier, Inc. waiver sent on 4/15/2011, answer due 6/14/2011. (Lohr, Jason) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
April 20, 2011 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Semmantha Chie, Jennifer Dessin as to Reed Elsevier, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 20, 2011 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Semmantha Chie, Jennifer Dessin as to Matthew Bender & Company, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 20, 2011 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Semmantha Chie, Jennifer Dessin as to Lexis/Nexis, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 12, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
April 12, 2011 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
April 12, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lexis/Nexis, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011) (cjl, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2011 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Semmantha Chie, Jennifer Dessin. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011) (cjl, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Lexis/Nexis, Inc., Matthew Bender & Company, Inc., Reed Elsevier, Inc. (Filing fee $350, receipt number 34611058599). Filed by Semmantha Chie, Jennifer Dessin. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2011: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chie et al v. Reed Elsevier, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Semmantha Chie
Represented By: Jason Shelton Lohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Dessin
Represented By: Jason Shelton Lohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Elsevier, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine M. Dacre
Represented By: Cody Dane Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexis/Nexis, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine M. Dacre
Represented By: Cody Dane Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Bender & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine M. Dacre
Represented By: Cody Dane Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?