Peinado v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Rene Peinado
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco and Elias Georgopoulos
Case Number: 3:2011cv01799
Filed: April 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 93 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order filed by Rene Peinado, PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/22/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION DEADLINE to 10/31/14 filed by Rene Peinado Status Report due by 11/13/2014. Status Conference reset for 11/20/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/9/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 RECUSAL ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 06/3/14. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 48 Extending mediation deadline, filed by Elias Georgopoulos, City and County of San Francisco. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/13/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 3/1/13.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 selecting Mediation by City and County of San Francisco filed by City and County of San Francisco, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/24/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND RESETTING CMC TO 7/6/12 re 11 Request filed by Rene Peinado Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peinado v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Peinado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elias Georgopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?