Davis v. Cole Haan, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tammie Davis
Defendant: Cole Haan, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01826
Filed: April 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, 104 Renewed Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Incentive Awards. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 12, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON 104 MOTION for Attorney Fees, Costs and Incentive Awards. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/9/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING and Requiring Supplemental Briefing on 104 Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Incentive Awards. Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief due by 10/7/2015. Responses due by 10/21/2015. Replies due by 10/28/2015. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 16, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 FINAL ORDER APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/14/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013) Modified on 11/14/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/14/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS FOR FINAL APPROVAL AND FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, LITIGATION COSTS, AND INCENTIVE AWARDS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/21/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/13/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 68 STIPULATION to Vacate the Case Management Conference set for March 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/12/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER SETTING CONFERENCE CALL ON DISCOVERY LETTER: Discovery Hearing set for 8/2/2012 AT 11:00 A.M. If this date is not convenient the parties may contact courtroom deputy Lashanda Scott at 415-522-3140 to reschedule the hearing to either August 8, 2012, at 10:30 a.m. or Friday, August 10, 2012, at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler.Counsel to provide the courtroom deputy with dial-in phone numbers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/31/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/17/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 57 STIPULATION Extending Time On Deadlines and Dates Related to All Deadlines. Jury Trial set for 7/8/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion for Class Certificatio n Hearing set for 11/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012) Modified on 6/4/2012 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 55 STIPULATION To Reschedule the CMC from June 8, 2012. Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED (52 in 3:11-cv-01826-JSW) Joint Stipulation Rescheduling The Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/10/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting as modified 49 STIPULATION Extending Time on Deadlines and Dates Related to Motion for Class Certification. Motion for Class Certification set for 8/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Cross Dispositive Motions set for 10/12/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/9/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING (46 in 3:11-cv-01826-JSW) STIPULATION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING (42 in 3:11-cv-01826-JSW) Amended Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Consolidation of Action and Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/7/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/1/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE (39 in 3:11-cv-01826-JSW) Stipulation re Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 31, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING (21) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:11-cv-01826-JSW; DENYING (16) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:11-cv-02187-JSW. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation Regarding Allegations. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 17, 2011. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Cole Haan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Davis
Represented By: James R. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Haan, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Carrie Doolin
Represented By: Jennifer Michele French
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?