Portcullis Computer Security Ltd et al v. Portcullis Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Portcullis Inc. and Portcullis Computer Security Ltd
Defendant: Portcullis Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02023
Filed: April 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/15/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE FOR FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND STIP TO VENUE AND PERSONAL JURIS. OF THIS COURT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/4/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE FOR FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND STIPULATION TO VENUE AND PERSONAL JURISDICTION IN THIS COURT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/4/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE FOR FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND STIPULATION TO VENUE AND PERSONAL JURISDICTION IN THIS COURT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/1/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portcullis Computer Security Ltd et al v. Portcullis Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portcullis Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Coffino
Represented By: Jaime J. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portcullis Computer Security Ltd
Represented By: Jaime J. Santos
Represented By: Michael J. Coffino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portcullis Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?